Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: MT.Sepinggan - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-13 - 2020-12-15 (1 year)
Dining Room Waiter: Oasis of the seas - Cruise Liner / 2019-09-06 - 2020-12-15 (1 year)
Waiter: Allure of the seas - Cruise Liner / 2018-12-10 - 2019-06-18 (6 months)
Dining Room Waiter: Allure of the seas - Cruise Liner / 2018-03-18 - 2018-10-07 (7 months)
Oiler: SSL kutcn - Container Ship / 2020-02-10 - 2020-12-02 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Training Ship / 2020-09-28 - 2020-12-02 (2 months)
2nd Officer: OMSKIY-138 - General cargo / 2020-08-18 - 2020-11-30 (3 months)
2nd Officer: BOKE - Fishing vessel / 2019-08-01 - 2020-01-16 (5 months)
2nd Officer: IVAN PODDUBNY - Bunkering Vessel / 2016-05-11 - 2019-06-11 (3 years)
OS: Alexandr Kosarev - Fishing vessel / 2020-06-09 - 2020-11-26 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Prabhu Vidya - Training Ship / 2020-02-03 - 2020-11-23 (10 months)
Cook: Arctic Shipping "Russia" - Reefer / 2019-06-14 - 2020-11-02 (1 year)
Cook: Fortuna - Dry Cargo / 2018-02-25 - 2018-06-14 (4 months)
Cook: Crona - Fishing vessel / 2017-10-28 - 2017-11-25 (1 month)
Cook: Bornholm - Fishing vessel / 2017-01-20 - 2017-06-22 (5 months)
Cook: Leader - Fishing vessel / 2016-01-28 - 2016-09-09 (7 months)
Wiper: Yerupaja - Container Ship / 2020-07-17 - 2020-10-31 (3 months)
Wiper: Carnival Elation - Passenger vessel / 2020-02-08 - 2020-06-26 (5 months)
OS: Afina - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-29 - 2020-10-29 (3 months)
OS: Alina - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-10 - 2018-11-11 (3 months)
Motorman: SOFRON DANILOV - Tug boat / 2020-05-19 - 2020-10-25 (5 months)
Wiper: Tilos - LPG / LNG / 2020-03-13 - 2020-10-18 (7 months)
Wiper: Antikithira - LPG / LNG / 2019-02-01 - 2019-11-03 (9 months)
Wiper: Alonissos - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-02-07 - 2017-10-27 (9 months)
3rd Engineer: Tankers - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-16 - 2020-10-16 (11 months)
2nd Officer: Alaid - Reefer / 2020-01-04 - 2020-10-03 (9 months)
Chief Officer: MT.RAHMAT - Bunkering Vessel / 2016-02-15 - 2020-09-30 (4 years)
3rd Officer: DEEPWATER ASGARD - Drilling platform / 2014-01-09 - 2015-01-22 (1 year)
3rd Officer: SKS MOSEL - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-10-18 - 2020-08-31 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: СПК-2 «Одесса» - Other vessels / 2020-06-01 - 2020-08-30 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: СПК-2 «Одесса» - Other vessels / 2019-06-03 - 2019-08-25 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Oya Star - Cement Carrier / 2020-03-05 - 2020-08-27 (6 months)
OS: Oya Star - Cement Carrier / 2019-06-13 - 2020-03-04 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Beccaria - General cargo / 2018-11-29 - 2019-03-09 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Lviv - Tug boat / 2017-01-03 - 2018-05-17 (1 year)
OS: Lviv - Tug boat / 2015-10-20 - 2016-11-01 (1 year)
AB Seaman: MT VOLANTE - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-07 - 2020-08-14 (8 months)
AB Seaman: SRI VISHNU - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-09-27 - 2019-07-13 (10 months)
AB Seaman: HANSA PREM - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-09-03 - 2018-05-24 (9 months)
AB Seaman: PROPELL PROGRESS - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-11 - 2017-03-03 (2 months)
AB Seaman: ROYAL SESA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-13 - 2016-08-22 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Mirzaga Khalilov - General cargo / 2020-07-04 - 2020-08-12 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: EF Ava - Container Ship / 2019-07-10 - 2019-11-20 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Paul - General cargo / 2019-03-11 - 2019-04-04 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: Paul - General cargo / 2018-08-03 - 2018-12-02 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Konstantin - General cargo / 2017-10-26 - 2018-05-15 (7 months)