Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Nilofar - General cargo / 2021-02-01 - 2021-06-01 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Kourosh - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-05-01 - 2020-09-01 (4 months)
Motorman: Captain Michalis - Tug boat / 2021-03-15 - 2021-05-15 (2 months)
Chief Officer: ALEXANDRA - Container Ship / 2020-10-15 - 2021-05-05 (7 months)
Chief Officer: KRISTINA - Container Ship / 2019-10-26 - 2020-06-05 (7 months)
Chief Officer: ALEXIS - Container Ship / 2019-02-13 - 2019-06-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: UASC BUBIYAN - Container Ship / 2018-06-10 - 2018-10-03 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Mary - Container Ship / 2017-08-13 - 2018-01-18 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Меркурий - High Speed Craft / 2020-09-01 - 2021-04-30 (8 months)
Utility: Norwegian Spirit - Cruise Liner / 2020-12-13 - 2021-04-21 (4 months)
Utility: Norwegian Jewel - Cruise Liner / 2019-05-27 - 2020-02-04 (8 months)
Motorist: Gerda s - General cargo / 2020-06-02 - 2021-04-17 (10 months)
Motorist: m/s"DNIPRO" - Passenger vessel / 2019-04-10 - 2019-10-31 (7 months)
OS: Lana - Container Ship / 2020-10-01 - 2021-04-16 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Lana - Container Ship / 2019-05-19 - 2020-02-15 (9 months)
AB Seaman: First Delta - Mining Vessel / 2019-10-02 - 2021-04-03 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Professor Khlyustin - Dry Cargo / 2021-01-17 - 2021-03-26 (2 months)
OS: M. V. Sirrah - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-23 - 2021-03-18 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Mv Cindy - General cargo / 2019-05-14 - 2021-03-12 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Trewenna - Tug boat / 2021-01-09 - 2021-03-08 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Taymyr - Icebreaker / 2020-10-02 - 2020-12-10 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Bumi Naryan Mar - MRSV / 2016-11-29 - 2020-07-25 (3 years)
AB Seaman: Topaz Jurong - AHTS / 2016-06-01 - 2016-10-06 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Mekhanik Belov - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-11-30 - 2016-04-06 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Enasco DS-10 - Drilling platform / 2016-12-06 - 2021-03-04 (4 years)
OS: Thanasis - Chemical tanker / 2020-08-19 - 2021-03-03 (6 months)
OS: REYD 10 - Dry Cargo / 2019-07-02 - 2019-11-30 (5 months)
OS: Nevskiy 23 - General cargo / 2016-05-11 - 2016-11-08 (6 months)
OS: M T SEA PRINCESS - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2020-01-10 - 2021-02-24 (1 year)
Pumpman: M/T Mount Fuji - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-12-31 - 2021-02-02 (1 year)
Pumpman: M/T Tataki - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-06-16 - 2019-04-22 (10 months)
AB / Motorman: Гандуринский - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-07-01 - 2021-02-01 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: KILIYA - General cargo / 2020-05-15 - 2021-01-31 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: KILIYA - General cargo / 2019-04-23 - 2019-08-31 (4 months)
Motorman: Mt-3 - Bunkering Vessel / 2020-01-27 - 2021-01-27 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: comoros stream - Reefer / 2020-11-05 - 2021-01-08 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: TANJA - General cargo / 2019-06-01 - 2019-10-09 (4 months)