Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Officer: UTRISH - Tug boat / 2019-09-02 - 2022-01-19 (2 years)
Chief Officer: GZS-1 - Other vessels / 2019-05-01 - 2019-06-15 (1 month)
Chief Officer: LEO-1 - General cargo / 2017-09-12 - 2018-01-17 (4 months)
3rd Officer: NIKOLAY GAMAYUNOV - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-01 - 2017-07-10 (3 months)
OS: FRONT COMMODORE - VLCC / 2008-05-13 - 2008-11-13 (6 months)
Boatswain: Moskovsky Prospect - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-10 - 2022-01-19 (5 months)
Boatswain: Primorsky Prospect - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-08-22 - 2021-02-26 (6 months)
Boatswain: Primorsky Prospect - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-09-15 - 2020-03-14 (6 months)
AB Seaman: yapen II - Tug boat / 2020-07-15 - 2022-01-10 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Maju daya 25 - Tug boat / 2019-10-17 - 2020-06-25 (8 months)
El. Engineer: Ksv-67 - General cargo / 2020-05-23 - 2022-01-02 (1 year)
El. Engineer: Seapower - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-31 - 2019-06-05 (4 months)
Arts and Crafts Instructor: Нет опыта на корабле - Cruise Liner / 2022-01-01 - 2022-01-01 (0 days)
3rd Officer: Sea icon - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-22 - 2021-12-12 (7 months)
Doctor: no experience on the ship - Cruise Liner / 2021-12-01 - 2021-12-02 (1 day)
Deckhand: F/VKAPITAN SUKHONDYAYEVSKIY - Fishing vessel / 2021-06-28 - 2021-11-29 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: F/VKAPITAN SUKHONDYAYEVSKIY - Fishing vessel / 2019-09-23 - 2020-03-04 (5 months)
Cook Assistant: Academic Cherskiy - Pipe laying vessel / 2021-08-01 - 2021-11-29 (4 months)
OS: ORION - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-17 - 2021-11-26 (2 months)
OS: Volgo-Balt 195 - Dry Cargo / 2021-08-09 - 2021-08-17 (8 days)
OS: STK-1007 - Dry Cargo / 2020-07-30 - 2020-11-05 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2019-07-09 - 2019-09-08 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: NN ALGEIBA - Crew boat / 2021-08-24 - 2021-11-26 (3 months)
Motorman: Bataysk - General cargo / 2021-07-21 - 2021-11-15 (4 months)
ETO: Star Pegasus - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-24 - 2021-11-05 (5 months)
ETO: S’hail al rayan - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-04 - 2021-01-18 (6 months)
Cook: DGB Jugend - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-11-01 - 2021-11-01 (2 years)
Cook: Yacht - Yacht / 2015-05-03 - 2019-05-03 (4 years)
Deck Cadet: NIKOLAY TELENKOV - Fishing vessel / 2021-04-25 - 2021-10-30 (6 months)
Engineer: Cmm cordobes - Tug boat / 2021-01-04 - 2021-10-28 (10 months)
Boatswain: Балтийский исследователь - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-08-20 - 2021-10-27 (2 months)
Boatswain: Омский 157 - General cargo / 2021-01-05 - 2021-05-11 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Eemslift Nelli - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-07-25 - 2021-10-20 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Onego Rio - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-01-13 - 2021-05-16 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Marmalaita - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-12-16 - 2020-07-05 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: TIP Bremen - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-02-15 - 2019-07-03 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: TIP Bremen - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-05-27 - 2018-11-28 (6 months)
Oiler: CREST GOLD 1 / 472 - Tug boat / 2021-02-05 - 2021-10-13 (8 months)
Oiler: SD VICTORIA - AHTS / 2020-07-27 - 2020-12-18 (5 months)
Oiler: CREST GOLD 2 - Tug boat / 2019-12-11 - 2020-06-03 (6 months)
Oiler: INTER BREEZE - AHTS / 2019-02-19 - 2019-10-26 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Nathan Earl - General cargo / 2021-08-04 - 2021-10-07 (2 months)