Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB / Motorman: m/v Capella - General cargo / 2020-07-06 - 2021-01-31 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: M/Y SUNDANCER - Sailing Vessel / 2019-10-28 - 2021-01-08 (1 year)
Rigger: FPSO LAYANG - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-05-01 - 2021-01-04 (8 months)
El. Engineer: NS POINT - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-09 - 2020-12-24 (4 months)
El. Engineer: SCF ALTAI - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-20 - 2020-02-25 (4 months)
El. Engineer: SCF ALTAI - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-02-04 - 2019-06-06 (4 months)
El. Engineer: SCF ALTAI - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-05-27 - 2018-10-10 (4 months)
El. Engineer: SCF ALTAI - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-09-03 - 2018-01-14 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Mt. Golden gulf - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-11-26 - 2020-12-23 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: Longdijke - General cargo / 2020-06-12 - 2020-12-22 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Adelia - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-08-16 - 2019-11-27 (3 months)
4th Engineer: ECE NURK - Chemical tanker / 2019-07-04 - 2019-08-04 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: Adelia - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-10-14 - 2019-04-12 (6 months)
Oiler: Carmelia - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-07-04 - 2018-01-19 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Viet Hai Sun - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-01 - 2020-12-21 (1 year)
3rd Officer: Karakuz - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-31 - 2020-12-13 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Karakuz - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-13 - 2020-03-30 (4 months)
3rd Officer: African sprinter - Chemical tanker / 2018-11-29 - 2019-02-24 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Melampus - LPG / LNG / 2016-11-10 - 2017-04-20 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Indigo Ray - Chemical tanker / 2020-09-19 - 2020-12-10 (3 months)
3rd Officer: STI Acton - Chemical tanker / 2019-12-19 - 2020-06-16 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Banda Sea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-06-05 - 2019-10-28 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Flagship Violet - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-05-30 - 2018-11-14 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Flagship Privet - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-09-10 - 2018-01-04 (4 months)
Electric Cadet: Mir - Passenger vessel / 2020-09-28 - 2020-11-29 (2 months)
Electric Cadet: Mir - Passenger vessel / 2019-09-09 - 2019-11-25 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Norddolphin - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-04-19 - 2020-11-28 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Nordrose - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-05-03 - 2019-10-21 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Energy R - VLCC / 2018-08-14 - 2018-12-16 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Nordorchid - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-07-22 - 2017-11-22 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Nordbay - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-11-18 - 2017-03-20 (4 months)
ETO: Coral Fraseri - LPG / LNG / 2020-09-27 - 2020-11-27 (2 months)
ETO: Coral Fraseri - LPG / LNG / 2019-12-07 - 2020-05-06 (5 months)
ETO: Coral Fraseri - LPG / LNG / 2019-07-01 - 2019-07-14 (13 days)
ETO: Norgas Innovation - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-15 - 2019-06-30 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Etagas - LPG / LNG / 2020-06-06 - 2020-11-15 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: EPIC BALTA - LPG / LNG / 2019-09-06 - 2020-01-12 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: EPIC ST. VINCENT - LPG / LNG / 2019-02-22 - 2019-07-11 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: DL ZINNIA - LPG / LNG / 2018-10-24 - 2019-01-09 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: DL LOTUS - LPG / LNG / 2018-02-11 - 2018-09-12 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: wilson finnfjord - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-08-02 - 2020-11-13 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: STS MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2019-09-09 - 2019-11-25 (3 months)
Messman: Jonathan swift - Container Ship / 2020-01-03 - 2020-11-03 (10 months)
Winch Operator: Akademic Chersky - Pipe laying vessel / 2020-07-23 - 2020-11-01 (3 months)
Winch Operator: Giant 7 - Cable laying vessel / 2019-01-10 - 2020-07-08 (1 year)
Anchor Foreman: Giant 7 - Cable laying vessel / 2018-05-17 - 2018-12-19 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Stanislav Yudin - Construction vessel / 2017-01-18 - 2018-03-14 (1 year)
AB Seaman: MV.MARIA DISCOVEREY - Container Ship / 2019-12-08 - 2020-10-28 (11 months)
Pumpman: Sperchios - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-03-12 - 2020-10-27 (7 months)
Pumpman: Xanthos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-03-14 - 2019-09-29 (6 months)
Pumpman: Aliakmon - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-05-19 - 2018-11-15 (6 months)
Mechanical Technician: senior - Fishing vessel / 2018-11-14 - 2020-10-21 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Professor Khlystin - General cargo / 2020-08-12 - 2020-10-20 (2 months)