Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Trainee Wiper: Balaji - Bunkering Vessel / 2022-01-11 - 2022-06-15 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Wilson Brugge - General cargo / 2021-10-29 - 2022-06-09 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Wilson Brugge - General cargo / 2020-10-10 - 2021-02-14 (4 months)
Stewardess: Yaguar, Firat, Kanysh Satpayev, Mangystau 1 Ледокол - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-06-29 - 2022-06-05 (11 months)
Pumpman: Chem neon - Chemical tanker / 2021-10-16 - 2022-05-30 (7 months)
Pumpman: Chem polaris - Chemical tanker / 2020-11-29 - 2021-07-23 (8 months)
Pumpman: Chem gallium - Chemical tanker / 2019-10-08 - 2020-07-09 (9 months)
Pumpman: Chem Rotterdam - Chemical tanker / 2019-02-22 - 2019-08-17 (6 months)
OS: Ester - Fishing vessel / 2022-01-11 - 2022-05-27 (5 months)
Chief Officer: CLARA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-03 - 2022-05-22 (5 months)
Chief Officer: PAPUA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-27 - 2021-09-20 (7 months)
Chief Officer: PANDA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-04-27 - 2020-11-06 (6 months)
Chief Officer: PALAU - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-18 - 2020-01-29 (5 months)
Chief Officer: ANNA-BARBARA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-08 - 2019-05-12 (6 months)
Motorman: Volgo-Don 5011 - General cargo / 2021-09-24 - 2022-05-20 (8 months)
Motorman: MINISTR ISHKOV - Fishing vessel / 2021-06-07 - 2021-08-26 (3 months)
4th Engineer: Dukeship - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-10 - 2022-05-20 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: LaTonda - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-23 - 2021-09-12 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: LaStella - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-20 - 2020-06-30 (7 months)
Wiper: Cape Pioneer - Container Ship / 2018-03-26 - 2018-10-26 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: MSC ALIYA - Container Ship / 2021-12-17 - 2022-05-17 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Druzhba - Other vessels / 2020-07-20 - 2020-08-16 (1 month)
3rd Officer: UMM LAQHAB - LPG / LNG / 2021-11-16 - 2022-05-15 (6 months)
Messman: M/V CALIXTA VII - RO-RO / 2021-05-10 - 2022-05-10 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Izar Argia - Reefer / 2021-12-27 - 2022-05-05 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Monte Urquiola - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-08 - 2021-07-08 (3 months)
OS: Nikolas - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-09 - 2022-05-01 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: St. Peter - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-15 - 2022-04-20 (6 months)
OS: VINOGRADNOYE - Fishing vessel / 2021-09-28 - 2022-04-18 (7 months)
OS: Soley - Fishing vessel / 2020-06-16 - 2020-11-24 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: River Mas - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-09-23 - 2022-04-14 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: PLUTON - General cargo / 2022-04-07 - 2022-04-11 (4 days)
Boatswain: ZEALAND ZARIA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-10 - 2022-04-06 (7 months)
Boatswain: GOLDEN ARION - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-16 - 2021-06-06 (8 months)
Boatswain: STAR GYDRUS - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-14 - 2020-07-21 (9 months)
Boatswain: MADISON EAGLE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-12 - 2019-09-09 (6 months)
Boatswain: ROWATION EAGLE - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-22 - 2018-12-13 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: Amet University - Training Ship / 2021-12-11 - 2022-03-24 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: M/V NAVI STAR - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-08 - 2022-03-09 (4 months)
4th Engineer: M/V EYLEM - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-01 - 2021-10-30 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: M/V EYLEM - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-29 - 2019-06-10 (8 months)