Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Fitter / Welder: MS ROTTERDAM - Passenger vessel / 2019-10-19 - 2020-06-27 (8 months)
Fitter / Welder: MS WESTERDAM - Cruise Liner / 2018-12-18 - 2019-08-17 (8 months)
Fitter / Welder: MS EURODAM - Cruise Liner / 2018-01-21 - 2018-10-21 (9 months)
Fitter / Welder: MS ZUIDERDAM - Cruise Liner / 2017-10-20 - 2017-11-05 (1 month)
Fitter / Welder: MS PRINSENDAM - Cruise Liner / 2016-11-19 - 2017-09-07 (10 months)
2nd Officer: Nevskiy Prospect - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-03-11 - 2020-06-27 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Nevskiy Prospect - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-06-29 - 2019-11-11 (4 months)
OS: Princess Nicole - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-12 - 2020-06-09 (3 months)
OS: Atlantic Runner II - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-12-15 - 2020-03-09 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Warnow Jupiter - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-05-22 - 2019-11-19 (6 months)
OS: Pallada - Sailing Vessel / 2019-10-17 - 2020-06-05 (8 months)
OS: Wolf - General cargo / 2019-11-26 - 2020-06-03 (6 months)
Master: Rubyn - Coaster / 2019-07-26 - 2020-03-26 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Volcan de Tinamar - Passenger vessel / 2020-01-11 - 2020-03-19 (2 months)
Receptionist: Saga Sapphire - Passenger vessel / 2019-11-06 - 2020-03-18 (4 months)
Receptionist: Saga Sapphire - Passenger vessel / 2019-06-12 - 2019-09-27 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: M/S ISABELLE - Cruise Liner / 2020-01-16 - 2020-03-16 (2 months)
4th Engineer: M.V.Shohjin - RO-RO / 2019-09-12 - 2020-03-10 (6 months)
Pilot: Nikolay Urvantsev - LPG / LNG / 2020-01-08 - 2020-02-13 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Eduard Toll - LPG / LNG / 2019-09-05 - 2019-10-19 (1 month)
Pilot: Nikolay Yevgenov - LPG / LNG / 2019-05-11 - 2019-06-20 (1 month)
Pilot: Rudolf Samoylovich - LPG / LNG / 2019-01-12 - 2019-03-18 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Kapitan Evdokimov - Icebreaker / 2018-11-12 - 2018-12-21 (1 month)
Messman: KRISTINA P. - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-25 - 2020-01-31 (4 months)
Messman: VERA P. - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-22 - 2019-08-21 (2 months)
Messman: TATIANA P. - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-27 - 2019-04-14 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Volgo - Balt 242 - General cargo / 2019-08-20 - 2020-01-27 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Dmitry Donskoi - General cargo / 2019-05-10 - 2019-08-05 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Hadzhibey - Passenger vessel / 2018-06-15 - 2018-08-15 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: POSH CONCORDE - AHTS / 2019-11-16 - 2020-01-20 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: т/х Хаджибей - Passenger vessel / 2019-07-29 - 2019-12-29 (5 months)
Motorman: m/v Ediniy - Dry Cargo / 2019-04-29 - 2019-10-04 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Gas courage - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-24 - 2019-09-30 (6 months)
3rd Officer: GAS COURAGE - LPG / LNG / 2018-02-11 - 2018-09-05 (7 months)
Junior officer: GAS COMMERCE - LPG / LNG / 2017-07-01 - 2017-10-07 (3 months)
AB Seaman: GAS COMMERCE - LPG / LNG / 2016-12-24 - 2017-06-30 (6 months)
OS: M/V HUDSON LEADER - RO-RO / 2014-03-02 - 2014-12-07 (9 months)
Wiper: Lady Anna - General cargo / 2019-07-22 - 2019-09-22 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Кілія - General cargo / 2013-05-05 - 2013-12-28 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Chongar - Tug boat / 2016-08-16 - 2019-08-31 (3 years)
Electrician: Kiyevska Rus - Fishing vessel / 2012-11-04 - 2013-04-26 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: TSV ”Druzhba” - Training Ship / 2019-07-17 - 2019-08-11 (1 month)