Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: солекс - Passenger vessel / 2013-08-04 - 2013-10-07 (2 months)
AB Seaman: first brother - Bulk Carrier / 2013-03-05 - 2013-09-27 (7 months)
AB Seaman: TREFIN LEADER - Chemical tanker / 2012-01-06 - 2012-06-18 (5 months)
AB / Welder: BRAZILIAN LEDI - Reefer / 2011-05-20 - 2011-11-19 (6 months)
AB Seaman: SOLEY 1 - Chemical tanker / 2009-08-16 - 2009-12-22 (4 months)
AB Seaman: NAVAJO - Chemical tanker / 2009-01-24 - 2009-07-15 (6 months)
El. Engineer: Greifswald - Ferry / 2013-05-21 - 2013-07-17 (2 months)
No Experience
No Experience
Deck Cadet: M T Seamaster - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-10-19 - 2013-06-25 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: M T Seavoyagee - Crude Oil Tanker / 2011-12-17 - 2012-08-10 (8 months)
Chief Engineer: Coal Age - Bulk Carrier / 2012-12-10 - 2013-05-01 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Mary H - Bulk Carrier / 2012-04-26 - 2012-08-06 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Joalmi - Bulk Carrier / 2011-08-21 - 2011-11-22 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Nena C - Bulk Carrier / 2010-11-27 - 2011-04-11 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Almi - Bulk Carrier / 2010-03-29 - 2010-09-25 (6 months)
El. Eng. Assistant: Sagitta - Container Ship / 2012-05-17 - 2012-12-11 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: BBC Pluto - Bulk Carrier / 2010-10-13 - 2011-03-10 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Kamchatskiy Proliv - Other vessels / 2010-04-27 - 2010-09-29 (5 months)
AB Seaman: M/V [Giannisk - Bulk Carrier / 2012-02-29 - 2012-12-06 (9 months)
AB Seaman: M/V [Sena-Tk - General cargo / 2011-06-14 - 2011-11-07 (5 months)
OS: M/V [RM HANTERk - Bulk Carrier / 2009-03-19 - 2009-09-21 (6 months)
OS: M/V [Konkar Georgiosk - Bulk Carrier / 2008-01-23 - 2008-07-20 (6 months)
OS: M/V [AFEAk - Bulk Carrier / 2007-02-02 - 2007-08-25 (7 months)
Master: пар - Container Ship / 2012-07-11 - 2012-09-11 (2 months)
Master: vvv - Container Ship / 2012-07-02 - 2012-08-24 (2 months)
Master: dfsdf - Container Ship / 2011-07-20 - 2011-09-20 (2 months)
Motorman: m/v KALLIROI K - Bulk carrier / 2012-02-03 - 2012-08-10 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v OTRADA - Bulk carrier / 2010-08-10 - 2011-08-20 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: LUCAS - General cargo / 2011-11-01 - 2012-02-02 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: ОКСКИЙ-56 - Dry Cargo / 2011-06-14 - 2011-10-21 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: ОКСКИЙ-56 - Dry Cargo / 2010-06-25 - 2010-08-20 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: АЗОВ - General cargo / 2009-09-02 - 2009-10-25 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: ПС-361 - Tug boat / 2009-05-20 - 2009-08-05 (3 months)
Boatswain: Xenia - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-07-04 - 2010-12-21 (6 months)
Boatswain: Rebecca - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2009-02-12 - 2009-08-10 (6 months)
Boatswain: Anja - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2008-04-19 - 2008-09-16 (5 months)
OS: Tug portovik - Tug boat / 2010-06-11 - 2010-08-11 (2 months)
Boatswain: Kompozitor Gasanov - RO-RO / 2010-01-15 - 2010-05-25 (4 months)
Boatswain: Kompozitor Gasanov - RO-RO / 2009-06-15 - 2009-12-25 (6 months)
Boatswain: Kompozitor Gasanov - RO-RO / 2009-06-15 - 2009-12-25 (6 months)
Boatswain: Kompozitor Gasanov - RO-RO / 2008-09-08 - 2009-02-25 (6 months)
Boatswain: Kompozitor Gasanov - RO-RO / 2008-09-08 - 2009-02-25 (6 months)
Wiper: ELITA - Dry Cargo / 2009-06-08 - 2009-12-08 (6 months)
No Experience
Electrician: ПЖК-415 - Other vessels / 1992-04-22 - 1993-01-22 (9 months)
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience