Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: Avisa 1 - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-10-04 - 2019-11-01 (1 year)
OS: Ocean bright - General cargo / 2018-08-08 - 2018-09-26 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Afri Marine 4 - Tug boat / 2019-03-14 - 2019-10-24 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Olivia - Accomodation barge / 2019-08-09 - 2019-10-17 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Kernigell - AHTS / 2019-04-12 - 2019-07-27 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Adfines Sky - Chemical tanker / 2017-11-11 - 2018-04-29 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Troy - Chemical tanker / 2016-12-13 - 2017-02-16 (2 months)
AB Seaman: San Bernandino - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-12-13 - 2016-06-14 (6 months)
OS: Andrei Osipov - General cargo / 2019-07-02 - 2019-10-08 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: SEDOV - Sailing Vessel / 2015-08-03 - 2015-11-16 (3 months)
Motorman: Mv Anne 1 - NAVY / 2015-09-29 - 2019-09-29 (4 years)
AB / Welder: MT ALI B3 - Chemical tanker / 2018-11-20 - 2019-09-06 (10 months)
Wiper: Emelyan Pugachev - Tug boat / 2019-07-03 - 2019-09-02 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: OM 106 - Passenger vessel / 2019-06-10 - 2019-08-31 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: OM-104 - Passenger vessel / 2018-04-18 - 2019-08-31 (1 year)
AB Seaman: МБ-56 - Tug boat / 2019-06-03 - 2019-08-28 (3 months)
Cook Assistant: M/V Pisti - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-26 - 2019-08-23 (1 month)
Utility: Magellan - Passenger vessel / 2018-05-12 - 2018-12-15 (7 months)
OS: Kentaur - Tug boat / 2016-12-19 - 2017-02-19 (2 months)
2nd Officer: AL GHARIYA - LPG / LNG / 2019-05-06 - 2019-08-18 (3 months)
2nd Officer: AL GHARIYA - LPG / LNG / 2018-09-01 - 2019-01-10 (4 months)
2nd Officer: AL GHARIYA - LPG / LNG / 2017-11-22 - 2018-04-20 (5 months)
2nd Officer: AL SAFLIYA - LPG / LNG / 2017-04-15 - 2017-08-22 (4 months)
2nd Officer: AL RUWAIS - LPG / LNG / 2016-08-30 - 2016-12-20 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Mygan - General cargo / 2019-02-17 - 2019-08-04 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Smn explorer - General cargo / 2018-12-02 - 2019-01-25 (2 months)
AB Seaman: CMA CGM RIGOLETTO - Container Ship / 2017-06-27 - 2018-01-08 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Sunrise - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-22 - 2019-07-24 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Sunrise - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-12 - 2018-09-06 (4 months)
Master: NS BORA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-02-23 - 2019-07-12 (5 months)
Master: NS BORA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-05-27 - 2018-10-02 (4 months)
Master: PETRODVORETS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-11-07 - 2018-03-30 (5 months)
Master: PETRODVORETS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-02-21 - 2017-06-27 (4 months)
Master: PETRODVORETS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-05-16 - 2016-10-22 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: STS MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2019-04-25 - 2019-07-08 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: GKM KAMAKSHI - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-10 - 2019-07-03 (6 months)
2nd Officer: ORMI - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-19 - 2019-07-01 (9 months)
2nd Officer: ORMI - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-04 - 2018-02-19 (7 months)
2nd Officer: SL STAR - Container Ship / 2016-02-29 - 2017-01-29 (11 months)
Master: Lpg - LPG / LNG / 2018-12-26 - 2019-06-13 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Khersones - Sailing Vessel / 2019-04-01 - 2019-05-31 (2 months)