Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: HANSA CLOPPENBURG - Container Ship / 2016-02-15 - 2016-08-28 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Madura - Container Ship / 2014-07-02 - 2015-02-01 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Onyx Arrow - RO-RO / 2013-09-04 - 2014-04-01 (7 months)
Pumpman: HAVEN - Jack-up Platform / 2014-01-01 - 2018-01-30 (4 years)
Deck Cadet: Baltic Spring - Reefer / 2017-10-20 - 2017-12-20 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Veles - General cargo / 2016-06-17 - 2017-01-30 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Surgut - General cargo / 2015-08-20 - 2016-01-16 (5 months)
OS: Prod.oil Tanker Combodia - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-10-10 - 2017-12-10 (2 months)
Master: ice eagle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-01-14 - 2017-10-22 (5 years)
Fitter / Welder: kolomenskoe - Fishing vessel / 2017-04-19 - 2017-09-18 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: IVAN SERGIYENKO - General cargo / 2017-05-09 - 2017-09-14 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Udarnik - Tug boat / 2016-06-01 - 2017-07-07 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: MINERAL NEW YORK - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-28 - 2017-06-15 (7 months)
Boatswain: Азов - Chemical tanker / 2016-12-13 - 2017-05-26 (5 months)
No Experience
No Experience
AB Seaman: LNG Abuja - LPG / LNG / 2012-11-03 - 2013-03-25 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: mv Infinity - General cargo / 2016-08-22 - 2017-02-24 (6 months)
Chief Cook: плллп - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-06 - 2016-02-04 (12 months)
El. Engineer: поплп - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-05 - 2016-02-04 (12 months)
Motorman: Neptune Dynamis - RO-RO / 2016-07-18 - 2017-01-24 (6 months)
Motorman: Clipper kalavryta - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-17 - 2015-12-12 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Comanche - General cargo / 2014-12-20 - 2015-06-26 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Nordic Tianjin - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-15 - 2017-01-15 (6 months)
Motorman: Авиор - General cargo / 2016-10-18 - 2017-01-13 (3 months)
Motorman: KHADZHIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2016-09-29 - 2016-11-29 (2 months)
Motorman: Genco Aqvitaint - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-30 - 2016-11-25 (7 months)
Oiler: Cohrane - Container Ship / 2015-08-06 - 2015-08-12 (6 days)
Oiler: Norasia Alya - Container Ship / 2014-03-08 - 2014-10-18 (7 months)
Motorman: Pucon - Container Ship / 2013-04-22 - 2013-09-16 (5 months)
Motorman: Norasia Alya - Container Ship / 2011-11-30 - 2012-07-18 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Волморе - General cargo / 2016-04-17 - 2016-10-27 (6 months)
3rd Officer: E.R BOSTON - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-27 - 2016-08-11 (4 months)