Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Engineer: Golden top - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-03 - 2022-02-04 (7 months)
1st Engineer: Sopb jelita nadia - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-09-09 - 2021-05-11 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Rila - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-10 - 2022-02-04 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Hansa Limburg - Container Ship / 2020-11-14 - 2021-04-24 (5 months)
Chief Cook: Golar Bear - LPG / LNG / 2021-07-21 - 2022-01-28 (6 months)
Motorman: Kairit - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-09-15 - 2022-01-15 (4 months)
Motorman: Contship Eco - Container Ship / 2020-10-23 - 2021-04-13 (6 months)
Motorman: Tinsdal - Dry Cargo / 2020-02-07 - 2020-02-21 (14 days)
Motorman: Peru - Coaster / 2019-03-19 - 2019-09-21 (6 months)
Motorman: Pascal - Dry Cargo / 2018-04-12 - 2018-11-11 (7 months)
Cook: Doris - Container Ship / 2021-09-24 - 2022-01-13 (4 months)
Cook: Redhead - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-25 - 2021-05-29 (8 months)
Chef de Partie: Meinschiff - Passenger vessel / 2017-02-15 - 2019-12-12 (2 years)
Boatswain: GULF BLUE - General cargo / 2021-06-18 - 2022-01-12 (7 months)
Boatswain: OKEAN - General cargo / 2020-10-27 - 2021-05-30 (7 months)
Boatswain: ATLANTIC - Drilling platform / 2020-07-28 - 2020-09-28 (2 months)
Boatswain: KAGAN BEY - General cargo / 2019-07-01 - 2020-07-22 (1 year)
OS: True Love - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-28 - 2021-12-31 (8 months)
Master: Gazpromneft Zuid - Bunkering Vessel / 2019-06-28 - 2021-12-28 (2 years)
Master: Gazpromneft West - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-06-28 - 2019-05-28 (4 years)
Master: Gazpromneft Nord - Bunkering Vessel / 2009-05-28 - 2014-05-01 (4 years)
3rd Engineer: Port Gdynia - Container Ship / 2021-08-20 - 2021-12-28 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Msc Jeongmin - Container Ship / 2021-03-01 - 2021-06-29 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: ZIM DALIAN - Container Ship / 2020-07-01 - 2020-09-26 (3 months)
4th Engineer: VLADIVOSTOK - Container Ship / 2019-07-10 - 2019-11-29 (5 months)
4th Engineer: VLADIVOSTOK - Container Ship / 2018-11-04 - 2019-03-20 (5 months)
OS: Titan - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-17 - 2021-12-23 (4 months)
OS: Gloria - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-09-11 - 2021-03-30 (7 months)
OS: Gloria - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-05 - 2019-05-01 (1 month)
OS: Maia - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-04-14 - 2018-10-12 (6 months)
3rd Electrical Engineer: Big fish - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-16 - 2021-11-27 (3 months)
3rd Electrical Engineer: Achilleus - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-26 - 2020-12-19 (2 months)
Steward: Viking Herja - Passenger vessel / 2021-07-17 - 2021-11-25 (4 months)
Steward: Viking Hermod - Passenger vessel / 2019-05-07 - 2019-11-15 (6 months)
Steward: Marco Polo - Passenger vessel / 2018-03-18 - 2018-11-10 (8 months)
AB / Motorman: volgoneft 217 - Standby-safety vessel / 2021-04-01 - 2021-11-20 (8 months)
AB / Motorman: KAPITAN BUKAEV - Tug boat / 2020-05-01 - 2020-07-19 (3 months)
OS: Omskiy-7 - General cargo / 2021-08-27 - 2021-11-08 (2 months)
OS: Yaz - Chemical tanker / 2020-05-25 - 2020-09-30 (4 months)
OS: Volgoneft-147 - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-07-02 - 2019-09-30 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Volatis-54 - General cargo / 2018-06-11 - 2018-09-30 (4 months)
Oiler: MT INTEGRITY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-08 - 2021-11-01 (12 months)
Oiler: MT EUROGLORY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-04-02 - 2020-02-03 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: MV NIKI - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-19 - 2017-03-03 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: MV IOLI - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-17 - 2016-04-20 (11 months)
OS: AG valor - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-30 - 2021-10-30 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Harbour winner - Tug boat / 2017-06-18 - 2017-11-05 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Highline 61 - Tug boat / 2016-11-15 - 2017-01-15 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: RZK CONSTANTA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-09-04 - 2021-10-25 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: MIr - Training Ship / 2019-09-04 - 2019-11-24 (3 months)
Oiler: VANIA - Container Ship / 2021-04-03 - 2021-10-19 (7 months)
Wiper: Mv HARBOUR STAR - Container Ship / 2019-01-05 - 2021-01-27 (2 years)
Wiper: Severity-Zapadniy 502 - Dredger / 2021-05-26 - 2021-10-08 (4 months)
OS: Geolog Pechkurov - Research vessel / 2021-06-01 - 2021-10-01 (4 months)
OS: Geolog Pechkurov - Research vessel / 2020-07-13 - 2020-10-14 (3 months)