Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: M/V whilhelmine - Container Ship / 2020-11-09 - 2021-03-05 (4 months)
OS: Steen - Container Ship / 2019-07-28 - 2020-07-09 (11 months)
OS: Hoheweg - Container Ship / 2018-05-24 - 2018-11-26 (6 months)
OS: Karin schepers - Container Ship / 2018-01-27 - 2018-05-23 (4 months)
OS: Maira XL - Container Ship / 2016-06-04 - 2017-02-24 (9 months)
Master: Max Kudo - Container Ship / 2020-08-23 - 2021-03-04 (6 months)
Master: Max Mariner - Container Ship / 2020-06-21 - 2020-07-25 (1 month)
Master: Max Mariner - Container Ship / 2019-11-01 - 2020-03-02 (4 months)
Master: Max Mariner - Container Ship / 2019-03-21 - 2019-07-15 (4 months)
Master: Max Mariner - Container Ship / 2018-06-27 - 2018-11-01 (4 months)
Wiper: Mehmet Bey - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-23 - 2021-03-03 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: C/S HORIZON RELIANCE - Container Ship / 2020-11-15 - 2021-02-14 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: LNG POLAR SPIRIT - LPG / LNG / 2020-03-26 - 2020-09-25 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MT CELSIA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-11-26 - 2020-03-19 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Galileusz - RO-RO / 2020-12-07 - 2021-02-07 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Volaris - 53 - General cargo / 2020-11-28 - 2021-02-07 (2 months)
Boatswain: Saly. Refeer - Reefer / 2020-07-30 - 2021-01-28 (6 months)
OS: MY MERAY - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-30 - 2021-01-16 (1 year)
Oiler: LUKE - LPG / LNG / 2020-06-24 - 2021-01-16 (7 months)
Oiler: MATTHEW - LPG / LNG / 2019-04-03 - 2019-10-20 (7 months)
Oiler: MATTHEW - LPG / LNG / 1918-04-08 - 1918-10-07 (6 months)
3rd Officer: OT-1506 - Tug boat / 2019-07-24 - 2020-12-30 (1 year)
Motorman: Pallada - Other vessels / 2020-10-29 - 2020-12-20 (2 months)
El. Engineer: Bareilly - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-12-20 - 2020-12-20 (4 years)
El. Engineer: Indiga - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-03-20 - 2016-09-03 (5 months)
El. Engineer: M/T Indiga - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-05-20 - 2015-10-19 (5 months)
Motorist: Раньше никогда не ходил на корабле - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-05 - 2020-12-17 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: M.T Orkim Gas Success - LPG / LNG / 2018-07-09 - 2020-12-06 (2 years)
4th Engineer: M.T Stavanger - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-10 - 2020-07-27 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: M.T Orkim Gas Success - LPG / LNG / 2016-09-30 - 2017-05-10 (7 months)
OS: Balt Flot 6 - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-04-12 - 2020-12-04 (8 months)
OS: VISHVA VIKAS - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-23 - 2020-12-02 (1 year)
OS: Manisa hamuto - General cargo / 2018-10-25 - 2019-06-16 (8 months)
Painter: Ns pride - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-09-15 - 2020-11-28 (2 months)
Painter: Ns pride - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-28 - 2020-08-05 (8 days)
Motorman: FAIR WIND - General cargo / 2020-09-25 - 2020-11-25 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Могучий - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-16 - 2020-11-24 (5 months)
AB Seaman: SPARTA II - General cargo / 2020-05-20 - 2020-11-23 (6 months)
AB Seaman: SPARTA III - General cargo / 2019-12-01 - 2020-03-06 (3 months)
AB Seaman: SPARTA III - General cargo / 2019-06-13 - 2019-09-27 (3 months)