Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Trainee Engineer: MV flamboyan - Survey vessel / 2022-11-26 - 2023-04-05 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Cape Moss - Container Ship / 2022-09-12 - 2023-03-29 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Cape Manila - Container Ship / 2022-01-11 - 2022-07-16 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Pride Of Kent - Ferry / 2023-03-07 - 2023-03-21 (14 days)
Chief Officer: Pride Of Kent - Ferry / 2023-02-07 - 2023-02-21 (14 days)
Chief Officer: Pride Of Kent - Ferry / 2023-01-10 - 2023-01-24 (14 days)
Chief Officer: Pride Of Kent - Ferry / 2022-12-13 - 2022-12-27 (14 days)
Chief Officer: Pride Of Kent - Ferry / 2022-11-08 - 2022-11-26 (1 month)
Master: Fortuna - LPG / LNG / 2022-09-10 - 2023-03-17 (6 months)
Master: MCC Batanes - Container Ship / 2022-02-13 - 2022-05-05 (3 months)
Master: MCC Palawan - Container Ship / 2021-03-15 - 2021-07-05 (4 months)
Master: Marianne - LPG / LNG / 2014-01-09 - 2014-01-21 (12 days)
Master: Angela - LPG / LNG / 2012-03-19 - 2013-07-17 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Ostrovnoy-6 - Fishing vessel / 2023-01-22 - 2023-03-15 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Udaygiri - NAVY / 2022-12-12 - 2023-03-14 (3 months)
Master: Maraki - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-19 - 2023-02-16 (4 months)
Master: Alliance - Bulk Carrier / 2022-05-18 - 2022-10-18 (5 months)
Master: Abdulrahman king - Livestock / 2021-02-06 - 2021-07-17 (5 months)
Master: Nabiha - Container Ship / 2018-06-26 - 2019-01-24 (7 months)
Messman: M/V Zamil-65 - Research vessel / 2022-11-11 - 2023-02-16 (3 months)
Messman: ZAMIL LB-1 - Barge / 2022-01-18 - 2022-05-22 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: fedala tug - Tug boat / 2022-09-20 - 2023-02-15 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Mt. Syatt - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-14 - 2023-02-13 (1 year)
2nd Officer: Mt. Artemis - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-01-20 - 2021-06-09 (5 months)
1st Officer: Med. Surveyor - Survey vessel / 2021-11-16 - 2023-02-09 (1 year)
1st Officer: Med. Surveyor - Survey vessel / 2020-11-06 - 2021-07-09 (8 months)
1st Officer: Walvis - Other vessels / 2019-06-14 - 2019-08-06 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Athenian phonenix - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-06 - 2023-02-02 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Legislator - LPG / LNG / 2022-11-01 - 2023-01-27 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Gaz United - LPG / LNG / 2021-05-22 - 2021-10-06 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Gaz Venture - LPG / LNG / 2020-10-05 - 2021-02-05 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Gaz Venture - LPG / LNG / 2019-12-16 - 2020-07-17 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Gaz Explorer - LPG / LNG / 2019-06-11 - 2019-09-09 (3 months)
OS: KMAX PRO - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-10 - 2023-01-19 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Ksp solar - Tug boat / 2022-07-19 - 2023-01-05 (6 months)
Wiper: M V NIUMATH - General cargo / 2022-03-30 - 2022-12-29 (9 months)
Wiper: AURELIA I - General cargo / 2022-06-17 - 2022-12-27 (6 months)
Electrician: Avurskoe - Fishing vessel / 2022-04-15 - 2022-12-26 (8 months)
OS: СБ 36 - Tug boat / 2022-10-28 - 2022-12-26 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Omskiy - 103 - General cargo / 2022-09-09 - 2022-12-17 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Zakamsk - General cargo / 2022-07-08 - 2022-09-08 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Lafjell - General cargo / 2021-09-01 - 2021-12-06 (3 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Milena - General cargo / 2020-07-18 - 2020-10-22 (3 months)