Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Wiper: M/V Kheri 2 - General cargo / 2018-04-13 - 2019-04-15 (1 year)
OS: Team ace - Dry Cargo / 2018-01-26 - 2019-02-15 (1 year)
OS: TAHA Y - General cargo / 2016-10-03 - 2017-07-24 (10 months)
2nd Officer: Mekhanik Semakov - Dry Cargo / 2018-10-02 - 2019-02-13 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Mekhanik Yartsev - Dry Cargo / 2018-02-13 - 2018-06-26 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Mekhanik Pustoshnyy - Dry Cargo / 2017-06-03 - 2017-09-29 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Mekhanik Pustoshnyy - Dry Cargo / 2016-07-14 - 2016-12-21 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Mekhanik Yartsev - Dry Cargo / 2015-08-01 - 2015-12-04 (4 months)
Motorman: FOX - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-24 - 2019-01-22 (9 months)
Motorman: WINNER S - General cargo / 2017-08-22 - 2018-03-13 (7 months)
Motorman: WINNER S - General cargo / 2016-08-12 - 2017-06-18 (10 months)
Boatswain: т/х "Родонит" - Dry Cargo / 2018-04-12 - 2019-01-15 (9 months)
Boatswain: т/х "Гранат" - Dry Cargo / 2017-04-12 - 2017-11-17 (7 months)
Boatswain: т/х "Гранат" - Dry Cargo / 2016-06-27 - 2016-10-30 (4 months)
Boatswain: т/х "Чупа" - Dry Cargo / 2015-05-13 - 2015-10-27 (5 months)
Boatswain: т/х "Циркон" - Dry Cargo / 2014-03-13 - 2014-11-28 (8 months)
AB / Motorman: GELENDJIK - Research vessel / 2015-11-17 - 2018-12-04 (3 years)
Motorman: Adventure II - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-06 - 2018-12-01 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Sea Discovery - General cargo / 2017-03-03 - 2017-07-30 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Oslo Carrier 2 - General cargo / 2016-05-17 - 2016-10-26 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Tini - Container Ship / 2018-09-21 - 2018-11-10 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: Jule - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-03-15 - 2018-06-23 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Thorco Atlantic - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-06-11 - 2017-11-11 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Thorco Atlantic - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-11-23 - 2017-03-17 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Thorco Atlantic - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-04-05 - 2016-07-29 (4 months)
2nd Cook: msc fantasia - Passenger vessel / 2018-02-04 - 2018-11-06 (9 months)
2nd Cook: Royal Caribbean Cruise Line - Cruise Liner / 2015-06-02 - 2017-01-19 (1 year)
OS: Selenga - Fishing vessel / 2018-06-11 - 2018-10-26 (4 months)
Steward: BLUEFORT - ROV Support vessel / 2018-08-01 - 2018-10-23 (3 months)
Steward: BLUEFORT - ROV Support vessel / 2018-03-22 - 2018-07-03 (3 months)
Steward: Britannia - Cruise Liner / 2017-12-15 - 2018-01-06 (1 month)
Administration Assistant: Sharga - LPG / LNG / 2018-06-25 - 2018-10-15 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: abubakar - General cargo / 2018-05-22 - 2018-09-22 (4 months)
Motorman: Alnilam - General cargo / 2017-11-19 - 2018-04-19 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: porada - Dry Cargo / 2010-05-15 - 2011-01-07 (8 months)
Electric Cadet: EVER LOADING - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-14 - 2018-09-19 (3 months)
Electric Cadet: Ударник - Tug boat / 2014-06-01 - 2014-12-20 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: Хаджибей - Crew boat / 2011-05-23 - 2011-08-11 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: STS ,,MIR” - Training Ship / 2018-06-06 - 2018-09-09 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Max Supporter - Container Ship / 2018-07-03 - 2018-08-31 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Max Producer - Container Ship / 2017-08-31 - 2018-04-18 (8 months)
OS: Max Mars - Container Ship / 2016-07-26 - 2017-03-28 (8 months)
OS: Carnival Magic - Passenger vessel / 2016-01-17 - 2016-06-22 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Olga - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-03 - 2018-08-30 (1 month)
Fitter / Welder: AMELIA - Fishing vessel / 2017-10-26 - 2018-03-05 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: ГЕНУЯ - Cruise Liner / 2016-02-08 - 2016-04-08 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Comet - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-12 - 2018-08-02 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Rubella - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-05 - 2016-10-10 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Parshad - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-23 - 2016-05-05 (4 months)
AB Seaman: MV stamas - Other vessels / 2017-02-20 - 2018-07-26 (1 year)
Assistant Shore Excursions Manager: Douce France - Other vessels / 2018-07-13 - 2018-07-23 (10 days)
Animateure/Entertainer: Bell Cadix - Passenger vessel / 2018-04-26 - 2018-05-03 (7 days)
Administration Assistant: Silya Line - Ferry / 2009-05-01 - 2010-12-31 (1 year)