Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: M V VANIA - Container Ship / 2020-11-07 - 2021-08-08 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: "ПУС ХЕРСОНЕС " - Training Ship / 2021-01-21 - 2021-07-31 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Vardberg - Reefer / 2021-05-14 - 2021-07-14 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Vardberg - Reefer / 2020-09-01 - 2021-01-15 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Vardberg - Reefer / 2020-01-15 - 2020-03-14 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Vardberg - Reefer / 2019-05-13 - 2019-09-16 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Pechora - Dredger / 2019-02-27 - 2019-04-29 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Orange Ocean - Reefer / 2021-03-01 - 2021-07-11 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Orange Blossom 2 - Reefer / 2020-05-31 - 2020-11-27 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: Orange Sky - Reefer / 2019-08-15 - 2020-01-15 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Orange Blossom 2 - Reefer / 2019-02-04 - 2019-06-11 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Fenja - Container Ship / 2018-08-01 - 2018-10-03 (2 months)
OS: Balkan1 - General cargo / 2021-01-16 - 2021-07-09 (6 months)
OS: Krilyon - General cargo / 2019-12-18 - 2020-10-07 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: Vallerii Platonov - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-01 - 2021-07-05 (2 months)
Oiler: GSS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-10-21 - 2021-07-04 (8 months)
Oiler: GOLDEN GULF - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-22 - 2020-08-15 (1 year)
OS: BHAGAVATI - Tug boat / 2020-10-02 - 2021-07-02 (9 months)
OS: NP SOHA 3 - Tug boat / 2019-11-20 - 2020-06-20 (7 months)
OS: MV LADY MIRA - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-10-27 - 2021-06-28 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Mir - Sailing Vessel / 2021-04-01 - 2021-05-07 (1 month)
AB Seaman: OFFSHORE ENERGY - AHTS / 2020-12-29 - 2021-04-27 (4 months)
AB Seaman: OFFSHORE ADVENTURE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-11-23 - 2020-07-15 (8 months)
AB Seaman: MV SELAMET - General cargo / 2017-04-14 - 2017-11-26 (7 months)
1st Officer: Crystal Africa - Reefer / 2020-12-14 - 2021-04-07 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Crystal Asia - Reefer / 2020-08-12 - 2020-12-12 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Crystal Asia - Reefer / 2019-10-20 - 2020-04-04 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Crystal Asia - Reefer / 2018-11-19 - 2019-04-05 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Crystal Asia - Reefer / 2018-02-09 - 2018-08-03 (6 months)
OS: ZIM Tarragona - Container Ship / 2020-09-19 - 2021-03-31 (6 months)
OS: Canary - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-13 - 2017-12-27 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Apj kais - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-10 - 2021-03-30 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Bridge water 130 - AHTS / 2020-03-09 - 2020-04-05 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Britoil 41 - AHTS / 2019-12-20 - 2020-03-02 (2 months)
Stewardess: Atlantic prince - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-03 - 2021-03-26 (6 months)
Stewardess: M.T.Seatopz 1 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-15 - 2020-02-14 (6 months)
Stewardess: Hudara - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-10-03 - 2019-03-04 (5 months)
Stewardess: MT Victory - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-09-02 - 2018-05-12 (8 months)
Messman: Mt simone - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-20 - 2021-03-25 (1 year)
Messman: Cap felix - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-27 - 2019-09-03 (7 days)
Oiler: Bitu ocean - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2020-07-30 - 2021-03-25 (8 months)
Oiler: Ocean pride - Chemical tanker / 2014-03-11 - 2015-12-02 (1 year)
OS: KAYALP - General cargo / 2019-12-19 - 2021-03-23 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: FSRU TURQUOISE P - LPG / LNG / 2020-12-26 - 2021-03-20 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: FSRU TURQUOISE P - LPG / LNG / 2020-07-09 - 2020-10-02 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: MSC Antonella - Container Ship / 2018-06-26 - 2019-02-03 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V Virgen De Peñafrancia - Passenger vessel / 2020-03-14 - 2021-03-17 (1 year)