Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Receptionist: Star - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-01 - 2017-07-04 (5 months)
OS: THEIA - SBL Vessel / 2017-06-10 - 2017-06-30 (1 month)
Electric Cadet: ANDROMEDA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-01-11 - 2017-05-29 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Zourva - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-10-27 - 2016-04-03 (5 months)
Motorman: Silver lion - Dry Cargo / 2017-01-01 - 2017-05-02 (4 months)
Motorman: Silver Lion - Dry Cargo / 2017-01-01 - 2017-05-01 (4 months)
Motorman: Astrahan-1 - Crane vessel / 2016-09-01 - 2016-12-07 (3 months)
OS: M/V "BECCARIA" - Livestock / 2016-03-01 - 2017-04-02 (1 year)
OS: Baron - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-10-16 - 2017-02-09 (4 months)
OS: vicount - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-04-08 - 2016-08-18 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Kiliya - General cargo / 2016-05-20 - 2017-01-20 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Бештау - Passenger vessel / 2015-05-14 - 2015-08-31 (4 months)
OS: Max Cooler - Container Ship / 2016-03-27 - 2016-12-06 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: SKIF-V - General cargo / 2016-06-01 - 2016-10-28 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Виктори - Other vessels / 2016-07-18 - 2016-09-19 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Suzie Q - General cargo / 2016-06-18 - 2016-09-10 (3 months)
Roustabout: Atwood Eagle - Drilling platform / 2016-05-09 - 2016-05-13 (4 days)
Roustabout: Deepwater Millennium - Drilling vessel / 2016-03-15 - 2016-04-10 (1 month)
OS: VANESSA 7 - Standby-safety vessel / 2015-09-03 - 2015-12-01 (3 months)
OS: VANESSA 7 - Standby-safety vessel / 2015-05-27 - 2015-08-17 (3 months)
OS: VANESSA 10 - Standby-safety vessel / 2015-01-27 - 2015-04-03 (2 months)
Crane Operator: Go Gleise - Survey vessel / 2015-12-02 - 2016-03-28 (4 months)
OS-Cook: FRI-STREAM - General cargo / 2015-10-04 - 2015-12-10 (2 months)
AB-Cook: hanseatic skout - General cargo / 2011-10-13 - 2015-04-21 (3 years)
AB-Cook: swanland - General cargo / 2010-04-30 - 2011-05-19 (1 year)
3rd Officer: MSC Jordan - Container Ship / 2015-07-10 - 2015-11-26 (5 months)
3rd Officer: MSC MANDY - Container Ship / 2014-09-21 - 2015-03-26 (6 months)
3rd Officer: MSC Shannon - Container Ship / 2013-11-19 - 2014-05-26 (6 months)
No Experience
Motorman: al yasra - Container Ship / 2015-07-15 - 2015-11-18 (4 months)
Motorman: carolina star - Container Ship / 2014-03-14 - 2014-09-26 (6 months)
Motorman: mck accra - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-21 - 2013-09-21 (4 months)
Motorman: m/v 'Flagship Sage' '' - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-05-02 - 2015-11-12 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v ''Great White '' - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-05-14 - 2014-11-10 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v ''Amelia Pacific'' - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-08-30 - 2014-02-17 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v ''Super Servant'' - Heavy lift vessel / 2012-11-06 - 2013-05-12 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v ''Gas Hagi'' - LPG / LNG / 2011-10-06 - 2012-10-10 (1 year)