Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: MV"Barrier" - Container Ship / 2016-05-16 - 2016-12-03 (7 months)
Cook: SPL Princess Anastasia - RO-RO / 2015-04-01 - 2016-10-28 (1 year)
2nd Officer: BRATSK - General cargo / 2016-05-06 - 2016-10-22 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: HUSEYN JAVID - Chemical tanker / 2016-06-04 - 2016-10-16 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: KHANKENDY - Chemical tanker / 2015-02-18 - 2015-08-10 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: LDN Fortuna - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-19 - 2016-10-10 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: LDN Fortuna - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-03 - 2015-08-10 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: NS Stream - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-06-08 - 2016-10-07 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: New Imperial Star - RO-RO / 2014-09-09 - 2015-02-23 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Ocean Grand - RO-RO / 2013-11-12 - 2014-05-30 (7 months)
Messman: La Landrias - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-27 - 2016-09-27 (9 months)
Motorman: Ruta - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-01-15 - 2016-08-30 (7 months)
Motorman: Ruta - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-03-06 - 2015-09-10 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Olimpiada - Ferry / 2016-01-15 - 2016-06-18 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Olimpiada - Ferry / 2015-05-11 - 2015-12-12 (7 months)
Chief Cook: ICE GRACE - Reefer / 2015-12-25 - 2016-05-23 (5 months)
Chief Cook: NORMA 1 - Crane vessel / 2015-11-03 - 2016-03-31 (5 months)
Cook: DAYLIGHT - General cargo / 2015-04-29 - 2015-10-04 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Amadore - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-29 - 2016-03-04 (5 months)
Utility: Magellan - Cruise Liner / 2015-06-03 - 2016-02-16 (8 months)
OS: Danapris 4 - General cargo / 2013-04-15 - 2013-09-20 (5 months)
ETO: Altus Invictus - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-08-31 - 2015-10-21 (2 months)
ETO: Altus Invictus - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-08-31 - 2015-10-21 (2 months)
OS: Рыбинск - Tug boat / 2015-01-18 - 2015-03-31 (2 months)
Chief Officer: evana - General cargo / 2014-05-22 - 2015-02-20 (9 months)
Chief Officer: SHEHAB ALMUHIEDDINE - Bulk Carrier / 2012-06-08 - 2013-11-01 (1 year)
Chief Officer: royal diamond - Bulk Carrier / 2011-04-26 - 2012-02-14 (10 months)
Chief Officer: royal pearl S - Bulk Carrier / 2010-03-28 - 2011-03-20 (12 months)
Master: CS TINA - Container Ship / 2014-10-18 - 2015-02-20 (4 months)
Master: CS TINA - Container Ship / 2014-10-18 - 2015-02-20 (4 months)
Master: CS TINA - Container Ship / 2014-10-18 - 2015-02-20 (4 months)
Master: CS TINA - Container Ship / 2014-10-18 - 2015-02-20 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: AZOV226 - Bulk Carrier / 2014-05-02 - 2015-01-12 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Ruben - Dredger / 2014-03-15 - 2014-12-25 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: Katrine - Tug boat / 2013-08-10 - 2014-03-10 (7 months)