Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Officer: CM Italia - AHTS / 2014-09-05 - 2014-12-10 (3 months)
Chief Officer: CM Italia - AHTS / 2014-05-04 - 2014-08-05 (3 months)
Chief Officer: CM Plover - AHTS / 2014-01-02 - 2014-04-02 (3 months)
Chief Officer: CM Italia - AHTS / 2013-08-28 - 2013-12-01 (3 months)
2nd Officer: CM Italia - AHTS / 2013-04-20 - 2013-07-21 (3 months)
Production Technician: YOHO - FPSO / 2014-05-01 - 2014-12-01 (7 months)
Cook: KAMANGA - Reefer / 2014-01-16 - 2014-07-24 (6 months)
Cook: KAMANGA - Reefer / 2012-12-29 - 2013-07-16 (7 months)
Cook: RAIATEA - Reefer / 2011-12-14 - 2012-07-25 (7 months)
El. Engineer: Princimar Strenght - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-10-20 - 2014-03-21 (5 months)
El. Engineer: Stena Callipso - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-04-23 - 2013-08-19 (4 months)
El. Engineer: Stena Supreme - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-09-15 - 2013-02-12 (5 months)
Stewardess: Oceania - Passenger vessel / 2013-08-28 - 2014-01-23 (5 months)
Stewardess: Oceania - Passenger vessel / 2012-11-20 - 2013-06-28 (7 months)
Stewardess: Ocenia - Passenger vessel / 2012-01-12 - 2012-08-16 (7 months)
Stewardess: Ocenia - Passenger vessel / 2011-05-13 - 2011-09-05 (4 months)
Stewardess: Cunard - Passenger vessel / 2010-09-01 - 2011-02-13 (5 months)
OS: VIKING CONSTANZA - RO-RO / 2012-01-16 - 2012-07-01 (5 months)
Motorman: IZMAIL PORT - 27 - Tug boat / 2011-11-15 - 2012-01-20 (2 months)
No Experience
Messman: Castro 7 - Pipe laying vessel / 2011-09-05 - 2011-12-07 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Pamyat Kirova - Reefer / 2009-12-27 - 2010-08-30 (8 months)
Electrical Technician: Grom - Tug boat / 2010-04-10 - 2010-08-10 (4 months)
OS: Ark Cath - AHTS / 2010-02-02 - 2010-06-27 (5 months)
OS: Ark Cath - AHTS / 2010-02-02 - 2010-06-27 (5 months)
Administration Assistant: Defender - Tug boat / 2009-02-02 - 2010-06-10 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Angelika - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2008-10-21 - 2009-03-24 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Lara - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2008-02-11 - 2008-08-11 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Christina - Dry Cargo / 2007-07-03 - 2007-12-07 (5 months)
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience