Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: vx DRISANA 01 - Crew boat / 2020-02-13 - 2020-06-10 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: fs beach - General cargo / 2019-01-02 - 2019-09-16 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Crest nautilus 2 - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-03-09 - 2020-05-21 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: RCC ASIA - RO-RO / 2019-10-01 - 2020-05-15 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Cap San Marco - Container Ship / 2016-07-03 - 2016-09-29 (3 months)
Stewardess: topaz tiamat - Construction vessel / 2019-02-11 - 2020-05-03 (1 year)
Stewardess: Seafox 7 - Construction vessel / 2018-08-28 - 2018-12-28 (4 months)
Stewardess: JB115 - Jack-up Platform / 2018-05-30 - 2018-06-20 (1 month)
Stewardess: Vole au vent - Jack-up Platform / 2018-03-08 - 2018-04-11 (1 month)
Stewardess: Island Condor - Construction vessel / 2018-02-03 - 2018-03-01 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Mar Bianco - General cargo / 2019-07-02 - 2020-05-03 (10 months)
2nd Officer: AS Petulia - Container Ship / 2019-10-18 - 2020-03-17 (5 months)
2nd Officer: AS Pauline - Container Ship / 2018-07-11 - 2019-03-20 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Hermes - Container Ship / 2017-09-29 - 2018-05-03 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Heinrich Ehler - Container Ship / 2017-02-19 - 2017-07-10 (5 months)
2nd Officer: AS Amalia - Container Ship / 2016-07-22 - 2016-12-10 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Rowangarth - Tug boat / 2020-01-09 - 2020-03-13 (2 months)
Ref. Machinist: Sveaborg - Fishing vessel / 2019-08-26 - 2020-03-07 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Orhan Bey - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-01-01 - 2020-03-06 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Ertugrul bey - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-12-10 - 2019-12-31 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Orhan Bey - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-07-26 - 2019-10-15 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Zamil 57 - AHTS / 2019-03-09 - 2019-05-18 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Akademik Tofig Ismayilov - DSV (Diving Support) / 2017-12-18 - 2018-01-15 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: B/T Urubamba - Chemical tanker / 2020-01-07 - 2020-02-11 (1 month)
AB Seaman: SVYATOY GEORGIY - Dry Cargo / 2019-12-07 - 2020-02-10 (2 months)
OS: Nibulon-4 - Tug boat / 2019-04-17 - 2020-02-10 (10 months)
OS: Xin Zhung Rui 15 - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-17 - 2018-10-19 (6 months)
4th Engineer: M/V Blessed luck - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-29 - 2020-02-06 (6 months)
Oiler: M/V EM spetses - Container Ship / 2018-07-16 - 2019-01-27 (6 months)
Oiler: M/V Blessed luck - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-11 - 2018-03-26 (6 months)
Wiper: M/V "EM Corfu " - Container Ship / 2016-10-20 - 2017-07-05 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: M/V Princess of luck" - Container Ship / 2015-11-19 - 2016-07-24 (8 months)
OS: Sibirski 2101 - General cargo / 2019-10-09 - 2020-01-10 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: SEGERO - Training Ship / 2019-09-06 - 2020-01-05 (4 months)
Motorman: Triumf - Fishing vessel / 2019-07-30 - 2019-12-26 (5 months)
Motorman: Patriot - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-10 - 2019-05-31 (2 months)
Motorman: Kinguk - Fishing vessel / 2018-01-17 - 2018-07-28 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Mv Amu 1 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-03-17 - 2019-12-15 (9 months)
Trainee OS: Могучий - Other vessels / 2019-11-14 - 2019-12-13 (1 month)
3rd Officer: GAS GLORIA - LPG / LNG / 2019-08-07 - 2019-11-17 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: SBI GEMINI - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-27 - 2019-11-15 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: SBI ATHENA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-03 - 2018-11-07 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: SBI ATHENA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-15 - 2017-10-04 (6 months)
4th Engineer: SBI ATHENA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-11 - 2017-02-14 (7 months)
4th Engineer: SAMOS MAJESTY - General cargo / 2014-07-02 - 2015-01-05 (6 months)