Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Officer: SAKHOIL - Bunkering Vessel / 2012-04-17 - 2012-09-03 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Mys Kodosh - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-06-24 - 2011-11-29 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Vladimir Brodyuk - Fishing vessel / 2010-06-11 - 2011-01-05 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Arctik Discovery - Fishing vessel / 2009-12-28 - 2010-04-24 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Kapitan Sukhondyaevsky - Fishing vessel / 2008-06-30 - 2009-04-26 (10 months)
AB Seaman: MV HD BON Accord - DSV (Diving Support) / 2009-08-18 - 2012-09-01 (3 years)
Motorman: ORION - Container Ship / 2011-11-30 - 2012-05-26 (6 months)
Motorman: MOL UNIVERSE - Container Ship / 2011-01-20 - 2011-06-30 (5 months)
Motorman: NADIR - Container Ship / 2010-03-01 - 2010-08-29 (6 months)
Motorman: ORION - Container Ship / 2009-05-06 - 2009-10-05 (5 months)
Motorman: PLUTO - Container Ship / 2008-08-27 - 2009-02-05 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Rio Genoa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2011-12-29 - 2012-04-27 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Rio Genoa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2011-02-22 - 2011-08-31 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Rio Genoa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2010-05-03 - 2010-10-19 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Iran Hengam - Crude Oil Tanker / 2009-05-14 - 2009-12-14 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Iran Susangird - Crude Oil Tanker / 2008-06-21 - 2009-01-21 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Bourbon Interprise - MRSV / 2012-03-20 - 2012-04-10 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Bourbon Liberty 244 - AHTS / 2011-09-21 - 2011-12-25 (3 months)
Junior officer: KONAK - General cargo / 2011-04-07 - 2011-08-14 (4 months)
OS: Solna - Dry Cargo / 2011-01-02 - 2011-09-04 (8 months)
Master: PACIFIC SUN - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-02-05 - 2011-06-22 (5 months)
Master: PACIFIC SUN - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-02-05 - 2011-06-22 (5 months)
Master: BEAUMAIDEN - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-06-05 - 2010-09-24 (4 months)
Master: BEAUMARE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2009-11-22 - 2010-03-30 (4 months)
Motorman: А.Житник - Dry Cargo / 2010-12-01 - 2011-06-01 (6 months)
Motorman: СБ 401 - Bunkering Vessel / 2010-12-01 - 2011-06-01 (6 months)
Motorman: А.Житник - Dry Cargo / 2006-10-12 - 2007-04-04 (6 months)
OS: BBC Bulgaria - Multipurpose / 2008-03-10 - 2008-07-23 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: ST.STEPHAN - Bulk Carrier / 2009-09-15 - 2010-02-02 (5 months)
No Experience
3rd Engineer: SEA ALBATROSS - RO-RO / 2007-10-01 - 2008-05-19 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: LITTLE KID-2 - General cargo / 2006-05-12 - 2006-12-15 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: FLORIKA - Reefer / 2005-07-14 - 2006-01-14 (6 months)
Motorman: "Шахтар" - Bulk Carrier / 2008-07-07 - 2009-01-06 (6 months)
Motorman: "Шахтар" - Bulk Carrier / 2008-07-07 - 2009-01-06 (6 months)
Motorman: Goodwill - Bulk Carrier / 2008-03-08 - 2008-05-26 (3 months)
Motorman: "Дельфин" - Bulk Carrier / 2006-03-03 - 2006-09-16 (6 months)
Motorman: Lartis - Reefer / 2005-03-14 - 2005-12-20 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Beta - Fishing vessel / 2008-05-06 - 2008-08-23 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Bizonas - Tug boat / 2007-10-23 - 2008-04-20 (6 months)
AB-Cook: Kliftrans - Coaster / 2007-01-06 - 2007-05-06 (4 months)
Cook: Fairmount Summit - Tug boat / 2006-06-06 - 2006-12-14 (6 months)
Motorman: nil - AHT / 2004-02-01 - 2007-02-09 (3 years)
4th Engineer: Baltiyskiy-102 - Dry Cargo / 1984-02-02 - 1985-08-01 (1 year)
4th Engineer: Nizhegorodskiy komsomolets - Dry Cargo / 1983-09-01 - 1984-02-01 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Baltiyskiy-27 - Dry Cargo / 1983-03-01 - 1983-08-01 (5 months)
Motorman: Plavdok-450 - Repair Vessel / 1982-03-01 - 1982-10-01 (7 months)
Motorman: Aleksandr Obuhov - Tug boat / 1980-03-01 - 1980-08-01 (5 months)
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience