Зберегти
Закрити
Додати моряка до обраного
Видалити моряків з обраного
Chief Officer: MSC Amanda F - Container Ship / 2017-10-14 - 2018-04-15 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: MSC Amanda F - Container Ship / 2016-11-20 - 2017-05-16 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: MSC Amanda F - Container Ship / 2016-02-10 - 2016-06-24 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: MSC Adele - Container Ship / 2015-04-01 - 2015-09-20 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: MSC Gabriella - Container Ship / 2014-07-03 - 2014-11-13 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordspring - Container Ship / 2018-01-16 - 2018-04-14 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordpuma - Container Ship / 2017-07-16 - 2017-10-17 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordpuma - Container Ship / 2017-01-17 - 2017-04-17 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordpuma - Container Ship / 2016-07-14 - 2016-10-18 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: 3OAK - Container Ship / 2015-08-30 - 2015-11-30 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Malta Cement - Cement Carrier / 2017-11-10 - 2018-01-28 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Rachel - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-08-19 - 2017-09-19 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Eems Dart - General cargo / 2017-02-19 - 2017-06-16 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Eems Delta - General cargo / 2016-09-19 - 2016-12-19 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: SP Venture - General cargo / 2016-04-16 - 2016-07-23 (3 місяця)
Master: Sergey Asyamov - General cargo / 2018-10-27 - 2019-03-05 (4 місяця)
Master: Petr Anokhin - General cargo / 2017-11-23 - 2018-04-28 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Rosewood - General cargo / 2017-06-25 - 2017-09-09 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Ermak - General cargo / 2016-08-24 - 2016-11-14 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Georgiy Ushakov - General cargo / 2016-01-16 - 2016-05-06 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Mac Kestrel - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-06-08 - 2017-08-11 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Mac Kestrel - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-02-04 - 2017-04-11 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Mac Kestrel - Platform Supply vessel / 2016-09-24 - 2016-11-24 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Mac Kestrel - Platform Supply vessel / 2016-04-13 - 2016-08-17 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Felton Tide - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-07-27 - 2015-09-29 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Satigny - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-12 - 2015-06-19 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Simano - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-10 - 2015-04-10 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Paz Navigator - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-06-28 - 2014-10-29 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Malte B - Heavy lift vessel / 2013-09-01 - 2014-02-08 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: BBC Sapphire - Heavy lift vessel / 2012-11-27 - 2013-07-09 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: Samskip Skaftafell - Container Ship / 2024-05-28 - 2024-09-17 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Samskip Endeavour - Container Ship / 2023-09-24 - 2024-03-19 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: RS Lisa - Container Ship / 2023-04-03 - 2023-08-11 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: X-PRESS VESUVIO - Container Ship / 2022-08-31 - 2022-12-23 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Samskip Innovator - Container Ship / 2022-02-19 - 2022-07-07 (5 місяців)
1st Officer: AAVA VG - General cargo / 2024-05-28 - 2024-07-22 (2 місяця)
1st Officer: TRANSMAR - General cargo / 2023-09-11 - 2024-01-17 (4 місяця)
1st Officer: TRANSMAR - General cargo / 2022-12-26 - 2023-05-18 (5 місяців)
1st Officer: TRANSMAR - General cargo / 2022-04-10 - 2022-08-30 (5 місяців)
1st Officer: TRANSMAR - General cargo / 2021-07-11 - 2021-11-19 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: BOS Prime - Platform Supply vessel / 2024-05-10 - 2024-07-19 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: VOS Prime - PSV / 2023-08-04 - 2023-10-23 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: VOS Principle - PSV / 2023-02-14 - 2023-04-30 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: VOS Theia - AHTS / 2022-09-23 - 2022-12-06 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: VOS Prime - PSV / 2021-12-06 - 2022-01-09 (1 місяць)
2nd Officer: ALPHA PRIDE - Bulk Carrier / 2024-01-14 - 2024-06-21 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: ALPHA OPTIMISM - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-09 - 2023-09-28 (8 місяців)
2nd Officer: NAUTICAL ANNE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-16 - 2022-09-08 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: NAUTICAL ANNE - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-09 - 2021-10-25 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: ORMOS - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-08 - 2024-05-15 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: ORMOS - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-16 - 2023-07-03 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: ORMOS - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-28 - 2023-05-15 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Freedom - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-17 - 2022-05-13 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: Balos - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-03 - 2021-06-17 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: MMPL Merlin - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-11-16 - 2024-05-10 (4 року)
Senior DPO: MAC Kestrel - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-06-25 - 2019-08-26 (2 місяця)
Senior DPO: INW-10 - AHTS / 2018-10-21 - 2018-12-13 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: FUGRO ADVENTURER - MRSV / 2012-10-21 - 2018-07-25 (5 років)
Chief Officer: Stanford Buzzard - Platform Supply vessel / 2012-02-15 - 2012-09-05 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: RIO GRANDE - Container Ship / 2023-12-19 - 2024-04-27 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: C HAMBURG - Container Ship / 2023-03-26 - 2023-08-28 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: KOTA MANZANILLO - Container Ship / 2022-01-27 - 2022-08-21 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: ZIM LUANDA - Container Ship / 2021-06-13 - 2021-10-17 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: ZIM SAO PAOLO - Container Ship / 2020-09-18 - 2021-01-29 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Izabella M - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-14 - 2024-04-24 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Marvel I - Bulk Carrier / 2023-10-23 - 2024-02-12 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: GALATEA - Yacht / 2023-05-01 - 2024-01-17 (9 місяців)
Chief Officer: GALATEA - Yacht / 2022-07-14 - 2023-03-31 (9 місяців)
Chief Officer: PORTO LEONE - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-21 - 2022-05-28 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: OLYMPIC GLORY - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-24 - 2021-08-09 (1 рік)
2nd Officer: OLYMPIC HARMONY - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-14 - 2020-01-14 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: FRIGG W - Container Ship / 2023-08-29 - 2023-12-12 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: FRIGG W - Container Ship / 2023-02-20 - 2023-05-30 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Frigg W - Container Ship / 2022-09-05 - 2022-11-15 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Frigg W - Container Ship / 2022-05-16 - 2022-06-28 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Frigg W - Container Ship / 2022-01-11 - 2022-05-03 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: MSC ENGLAND - Container Ship / 2023-07-04 - 2023-12-05 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: MSC STAR R - Container Ship / 2022-07-30 - 2023-02-27 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: MSC ALICE - Container Ship / 2021-09-10 - 2022-02-24 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Miro - Container Ship / 2021-02-14 - 2021-06-02 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Spero - Container Ship / 2019-10-19 - 2020-09-16 (11 місяців)
Chief Officer: HAFNIA ACHROITE - Chemical tanker / 2023-08-04 - 2023-11-27 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: HAFNIA ACHROITE - Chemical tanker / 2023-01-26 - 2023-05-10 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: HAFNIA AZURITE - Chemical tanker / 2022-07-09 - 2022-10-05 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: CAROLINE THERESA - Chemical tanker / 2022-01-20 - 2022-05-02 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: SUSANNE THERESA - Chemical tanker / 2021-05-30 - 2021-10-09 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: NS leader - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-04-24 - 2023-11-15 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: Carvounis - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-08-25 - 2022-12-25 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: SCF ALPINE - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-12-10 - 2022-05-12 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: SCF ALPINE - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-04 - 2021-07-30 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: SCF ALPINE - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-02-16 - 2020-10-25 (8 місяців)
Chief Officer: FRANZISKA - Heavy lift vessel / 2023-06-06 - 2023-10-11 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: JOSEF - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-03-17 - 2021-09-17 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: JOSEF - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-03-08 - 2020-10-12 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: KINGFISHER - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-09-22 - 2019-04-19 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: KINGFISHER - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-12-03 - 2018-04-20 (5 місяців)