Зберегти
Закрити
Додати моряка до обраного
Видалити моряків з обраного
Chief Officer: Thun Granite - Chemical tanker / 2023-06-27 - 2023-08-29 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Seacod - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-12-07 - 2023-03-25 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Dumbledore - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-03 - 2022-08-08 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: Thun Liverpool - Chemical tanker / 2021-12-16 - 2022-02-16 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Thun liverpool - Chemical tanker / 2021-10-01 - 2021-11-05 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Investigator - Drilling vessel / 2023-06-16 - 2023-08-18 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Investigator - Drilling vessel / 2023-02-07 - 2023-04-15 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Investigator - Drilling vessel / 2022-10-22 - 2022-12-07 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Investigator - Drilling vessel / 2022-06-10 - 2022-09-15 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Investigator - Drilling vessel / 2022-01-31 - 2022-04-08 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: AQUA III - AHTS / 2022-11-10 - 2023-07-28 (9 місяців)
Chief Officer: M/V TIGER 7 - AHTS / 2021-12-20 - 2022-06-06 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: TB MUTHA RUBY - Tug boat / 2021-04-01 - 2021-11-01 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: TB SUNGFATT 31 - Tug boat / 2018-12-20 - 2019-10-12 (10 місяців)
Chief Officer: TB SONWA PRINCESS - Tug boat / 2018-01-14 - 2018-05-25 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordtokyo - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-05-19 - 2023-07-23 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Atlantica Bell - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-21 - 2022-10-11 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Neutron Sound - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-08 - 2021-10-30 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Baltic Monarch - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-25 - 2021-03-18 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Baltic Monarch - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-30 - 2020-07-09 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Transocean - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-05 - 2023-07-14 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: BBC destiny - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-03-24 - 2022-07-29 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: BBC ECHO - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-08-03 - 2021-12-21 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: BBC Echo - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-10-26 - 2021-02-19 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: BBC Orion - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-11-30 - 2020-06-19 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: M/T Maran Phoebe - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-01-08 - 2023-06-17 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Blue Star 1 - Ferry / 2022-05-05 - 2022-11-19 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Blue Star 1 - Ferry / 2021-09-16 - 2022-03-18 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Universal Innovator - VLCC / 2023-02-26 - 2023-05-15 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Pacific M - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-02-18 - 2022-08-26 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Dolviken - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-28 - 2021-10-22 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Dolviken - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-01 - 2021-04-01 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Dolviken - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-02-01 - 2020-08-06 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Artey - General cargo / 2022-10-30 - 2023-05-10 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Lizori - General cargo / 2021-07-22 - 2022-01-10 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: New Life - General cargo / 2020-08-15 - 2020-12-10 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Svyatoy Georgiy - General cargo / 2019-05-15 - 2019-12-28 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: Svyatoy Georgiy - General cargo / 2018-01-02 - 2018-05-30 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: NEPTUNE ILIAD - RO-RO / 2022-12-12 - 2023-05-08 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: FAUSTINE - RO-RO / 2022-07-12 - 2022-08-27 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: FAUSTINE - RO-RO / 2022-02-23 - 2022-05-25 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: WILHELMINE - RO-RO / 2021-12-18 - 2022-02-15 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: WILHELMINE - RO-RO / 2021-07-16 - 2021-10-20 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: MISS PEGGY - General cargo / 2022-01-22 - 2023-04-10 (1 рік)
Chief Officer: GORDION - General cargo / 2021-10-24 - 2021-11-20 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: SOLIKAMSK - General cargo / 2020-07-18 - 2021-03-05 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: REGA - General cargo / 2017-07-22 - 2018-03-02 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: PAVEL GRABOVSCIY - General cargo / 2016-07-03 - 2016-10-27 (4 місяця)
Master: Desert Oak - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-12-20 - 2024-04-15 (4 місяця)
Master: Dvina - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-04-20 - 2023-09-01 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Kapitan Permyakov - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-01-29 - 2023-03-13 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Urartu - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-06-12 - 2022-10-07 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Urartu - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-12 - 2022-01-21 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Agartha - Chemical tanker / 2022-12-12 - 2023-02-12 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: vemadignity - Bunkering Vessel / 2022-07-11 - 2022-11-01 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Skypower - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2021-10-19 - 2022-03-11 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Vemaharmony - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-09-08 - 2021-02-01 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Vamahope - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-23 - 2020-06-07 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: MT Nemo - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-09-20 - 2023-01-21 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: MT Falcon Maryam - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-11-10 - 2022-04-15 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: MT Falcon Maryam - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-09 - 2021-11-09 (3 місяця)
3rd Officer: MT Falcon Iris - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-08 - 2021-04-22 (6 місяців)
3rd Officer: MT Falcon Sextant - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-09-03 - 2020-03-13 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: EMMA - General cargo / 2022-08-03 - 2022-12-09 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: MANUELA S - Container Ship / 2022-01-20 - 2022-05-02 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: LIFANA - General cargo / 2021-10-06 - 2021-12-21 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: FRI LAKE - General cargo / 2021-04-19 - 2021-07-13 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: FRI LAKE - General cargo / 2020-08-07 - 2020-12-18 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: LHOTSE - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-04-18 - 2024-05-24 (1 місяць)
2nd Officer: LHOTSE - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-04-15 - 2023-09-19 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: LANA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-08-01 - 2022-11-28 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: LANA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-05-11 - 2022-07-31 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: PEGAS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-03-24 - 2022-05-10 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Anwaar alnaser - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-10 - 2022-09-10 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Ebn hawke - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-12 - 2021-12-10 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Anwaar Libya - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-05-21 - 2020-09-15 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Anwaar alnaser - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-25 - 2020-03-19 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: alagaila - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-12-07 - 2019-03-15 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Mykonos - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-01-17 - 2022-08-31 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: Halki - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-03 - 2021-08-15 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Halki - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-01-20 - 2021-04-02 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Halki - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-05 - 2020-11-17 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Halki - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-07-04 - 2020-01-14 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Ariadne - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-19 - 2022-07-16 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Aeolia - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-11 - 2021-06-22 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: Aeolia - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-04 - 2020-07-10 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Ariadne - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-01 - 2019-10-28 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Aurelia - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-20 - 2018-12-05 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Express Spain - Container Ship / 2022-01-31 - 2022-07-15 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Express Spain - Container Ship / 2021-03-05 - 2021-09-21 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: ZIM Dalian - Container Ship / 2020-07-05 - 2020-11-20 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: CMA CGM MUSSET - Container Ship / 2019-11-14 - 2020-03-12 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: SINGAPORE - Container Ship / 2019-03-12 - 2019-07-27 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Mini - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-06 - 2022-07-03 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: Angel II - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-08 - 2021-03-28 (9 місяців)
2nd Officer: Em Athens - Container Ship / 2019-03-29 - 2019-10-05 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Em Spetses - Container Ship / 2017-12-14 - 2018-05-28 (5 місяців)
3rd Officer: Evridiki G - Container Ship / 2016-12-18 - 2017-07-18 (7 місяців)