Зберегти
Закрити
Додати моряка до обраного
Видалити моряків з обраного
Chief Officer: Ampere - General cargo / 2024-07-15 - 2024-09-09 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Vestborg - General cargo / 2023-11-12 - 2024-02-08 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Vestborg - General cargo / 2022-03-08 - 2022-06-04 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Vestborg - General cargo / 2021-10-08 - 2021-12-28 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Vestborg - General cargo / 2021-05-10 - 2021-07-06 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Gas Ambalat - LPG / LNG / 2024-03-13 - 2024-08-20 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: LPG/DF "Kaupang" - LPG / LNG / 2022-09-30 - 2023-04-01 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: LEG "Kalolimnos" - LPG / LNG / 2021-10-02 - 2022-07-03 (9 місяців)
3rd Officer: Gaz Fraternity - LPG / LNG / 2020-06-18 - 2020-09-26 (3 місяця)
Deck Cadet: Gaz Victory - LPG / LNG / 2019-10-02 - 2020-03-04 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Manisa Greta - General cargo / 2024-03-25 - 2024-08-02 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Manisa Camilla - General cargo / 2023-07-20 - 2023-12-04 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: MANISA SOLE - General cargo / 2022-09-09 - 2023-03-23 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: O.T.Ideaal - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-02-19 - 2022-05-31 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: O.T.IDEAAL - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-06-30 - 2021-11-05 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Jay 2 - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-02-21 - 2024-07-28 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Diamond T - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-12-23 - 2024-02-20 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Rayyan 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-03-14 - 2023-09-12 (6 місяців)
3rd Officer: Cape Bradley - Chemical tanker / 2021-07-26 - 2021-12-06 (4 місяця)
3rd Officer: Caribe Ilse - Chemical tanker / 2020-09-27 - 2021-03-12 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Maryam d - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-27 - 2024-07-12 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: Maryam d - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-01 - 2024-02-26 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Toledo carrier - Container Ship / 2022-10-22 - 2023-03-01 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Aracena Carrier - Reefer / 2022-02-02 - 2022-07-30 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Aracena Carrier - Reefer / 2021-05-30 - 2021-10-03 (4 місяця)
Master: Aramis - General cargo / 2024-06-07 - 2024-09-07 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Aramis - General cargo / 2024-01-15 - 2024-06-06 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Aramis - General cargo / 2023-01-01 - 2023-08-31 (8 місяців)
Chief Officer: Schillig - General cargo / 2022-09-26 - 2022-12-30 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Aramis - General cargo / 2022-04-24 - 2022-09-02 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Seastar Hawk - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-20 - 2024-05-28 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Seastar Hawk - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-16 - 2023-08-20 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Seastar Hawk - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-02 - 2022-12-05 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Seastar Explorer - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-01 - 2022-03-16 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Olympic Pride - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-28 - 2021-05-07 (8 місяців)
Chief Officer: BBC Vermont - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2024-03-26 - 2024-05-28 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: BBC NYHAVN - Heavy lift vessel / 2023-07-30 - 2023-11-28 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: BBC NYHAVN - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-10-26 - 2023-03-22 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: BBC Norfolk - General cargo / 2022-02-24 - 2022-07-13 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: BBC Lagos - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-05-31 - 2021-11-22 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Avon Trader - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-29 - 2024-05-20 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Pacific East - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-07 - 2023-07-20 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Kamari - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-31 - 2023-01-27 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Leia - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-16 - 2022-06-03 (8 місяців)
Chief Officer: Cygnus - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-08 - 2021-04-10 (9 місяців)
Chief Officer: Region 87 - Bulk Carrier / 2024-01-16 - 2024-05-15 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Andromeda - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-08 - 2023-05-22 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Helena - Container Ship / 2021-09-25 - 2022-04-08 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Helena - Container Ship / 2020-07-08 - 2021-03-13 (8 місяців)
2nd Officer: Helena - Container Ship / 2019-06-13 - 2020-01-22 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: Allegra - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-16 - 2024-05-02 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Arcadia - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-28 - 2023-09-19 (9 місяців)
Chief Officer: LMZ Phoebe - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-03 - 2021-11-22 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: True Love - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-07 - 2021-02-03 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Atlantica - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-30 - 2020-07-16 (9 місяців)
Chief Officer: NGM Honor - Bulk Carrier / 2023-11-12 - 2024-05-02 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Future - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-28 - 2023-07-30 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Federal Sable - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-21 - 2022-12-21 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Navigare Beatus - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-11 - 2022-02-01 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Navigare Bellus - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-23 - 2021-03-29 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Owl 1 - Chemical tanker / 2023-10-30 - 2024-04-30 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Owl 6 - Chemical tanker / 2023-01-22 - 2023-07-22 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Owl 5 - Chemical tanker / 2022-07-06 - 2022-12-14 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Chem Wolverine - Chemical tanker / 2021-08-16 - 2022-01-19 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: Chem Wolverine - Chemical tanker / 2021-01-16 - 2021-04-16 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Akvamarin - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-10-24 - 2024-04-30 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: Telerig - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-01 - 2023-08-04 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: OXANA-V - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-30 - 2023-02-20 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: EMMAKRIS II - Bulk Carrier / 2022-04-29 - 2022-10-02 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: EMMAKRIS I - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-17 - 2022-04-28 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: FEHU - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-28 - 2024-04-29 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: JOLLY DANUBE - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-08 - 2023-09-09 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: AGALI - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-25 - 2022-11-07 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: LEDA C - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-23 - 2022-03-10 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: IKAN BAWAL - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-10 - 2020-11-24 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Ute - Container Ship / 2023-12-18 - 2024-04-12 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Okee Henri - Container Ship / 2023-05-02 - 2023-08-30 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Northern General - Container Ship / 2022-03-19 - 2022-09-05 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: OOCL St Lawrence - Container Ship / 2021-10-24 - 2022-02-22 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: OOCL St Lawrence - Container Ship / 2021-02-24 - 2021-06-29 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: ULA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-10-28 - 2024-04-05 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Matros Koshka - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-28 - 2023-08-02 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: KAVKAZ III - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-10 - 2022-12-18 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: KAVKAZ IV - Bulk Carrier / 2022-04-01 - 2022-07-08 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: KAVKAZ IV - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-23 - 2021-12-09 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: VISSEL - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-01-11 - 2024-03-19 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: STAVANAGER POSEIDON - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-10-08 - 2022-12-17 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: CAVANE - Chemical tanker / 2022-08-07 - 2022-10-02 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: N.C.C.SAFA - Chemical tanker / 2022-05-17 - 2022-06-02 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: Gulf Jalmuda - Chemical tanker / 2021-05-30 - 2021-09-30 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Fesco Nagaevo - Container Ship / 2023-11-05 - 2024-03-13 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Swift Ace - RO-RO / 2022-09-08 - 2023-02-19 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Sunrise Ace - RO-RO / 2021-09-29 - 2022-03-10 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Prominent Ace - RO-RO / 2020-12-29 - 2021-04-12 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Heroic Ace - RO-RO / 2020-03-02 - 2020-09-01 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Wilson North - Dry Cargo / 2023-10-26 - 2024-03-07 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Wilson North - Dry Cargo / 2023-02-20 - 2023-06-21 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Wilson Ruhr - Dry Cargo / 2022-10-03 - 2023-01-20 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Wilson Ruhr - Dry Cargo / 2022-05-29 - 2022-08-04 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Wilson Ruhr - Dry Cargo / 2022-01-04 - 2022-03-10 (2 місяця)