Зберегти
Закрити
Додати моряка до обраного
Видалити моряків з обраного
Chief Officer: Empire Persia - ROV Support vessel / 2019-09-12 - 2019-11-25 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Empire Persia - ROV Support vessel / 2019-02-28 - 2019-06-18 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Empire Persia - ROV Support vessel / 2018-09-03 - 2018-12-15 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: Empire Persia - ROV Support vessel / 2018-05-19 - 2018-07-23 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Empire Persia - ROV Support vessel / 2017-10-18 - 2018-02-14 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Super Grace - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-13 - 2019-11-24 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Teton - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-24 - 2018-09-10 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Ocean Diamond - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-29 - 2017-07-07 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Rachel - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-21 - 2016-06-14 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Harvest Festival - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-26 - 2015-06-30 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: MSM Dolores - Container Ship / 2019-06-22 - 2019-11-24 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Blue Note - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-09-05 - 2019-02-19 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Anna Chris - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-12-29 - 2018-05-10 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Anna Chris - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-01-11 - 2017-06-11 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Active - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-05 - 2016-08-01 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: THALASSA PISTIS - Container Ship / 2019-07-23 - 2019-11-24 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: CAP SAN MALEAS - Container Ship / 2018-07-27 - 2018-12-14 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: CAP SAN MALEAS - Container Ship / 2017-11-25 - 2018-04-08 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: CAP SAN ARTEMISSIO - Container Ship / 2017-02-10 - 2017-07-09 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: THALASSA PATRIS - Container Ship / 2016-05-03 - 2016-10-08 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Trudy - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-10 - 2019-11-23 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Rio Tamara - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-11 - 2019-04-09 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Asia Opal - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-06 - 2018-08-13 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Asia Emirald I - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-02 - 2017-12-14 (8 місяців)
Chief Officer: Mare Transporter - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-08 - 2017-01-02 (6 місяців)
Master: FMT URLA - Chemical tanker / 2019-11-23 - 2020-03-22 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: FMT URLA - Chemical tanker / 2019-11-09 - 2019-11-22 (13 днів)
Chief Officer: FMT URLA - Chemical tanker / 2019-02-22 - 2019-06-03 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: FTM URLA - Chemical tanker / 2018-06-01 - 2018-10-18 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Caminero - Chemical tanker / 2017-08-23 - 2017-12-04 (3 місяця)
Master: Blue Tune - General cargo / 2021-03-30 - 2021-08-20 (5 місяців)
Master: Blue Antares - General cargo / 2020-06-07 - 2020-12-17 (6 місяців)
Master: MSM Douro - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-11-23 - 2020-01-25 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: MSM Douro - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-06-03 - 2019-11-22 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Blue Tune - General cargo / 2018-09-16 - 2019-02-06 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Nordserena - Container Ship / 2019-07-24 - 2019-11-22 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordspring - Container Ship / 2019-03-01 - 2019-05-25 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordemilia - Container Ship / 2018-08-23 - 2018-11-23 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordemilia - Container Ship / 2018-03-01 - 2018-05-25 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Nordemilia - Container Ship / 2017-06-22 - 2017-10-27 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Ugbana - AHTS / 2019-06-11 - 2019-11-22 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Ugbana - AHTS / 2018-09-25 - 2019-01-28 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: MDPL Conqueror - AHTS / 2017-10-11 - 2018-03-28 (6 місяців)
Master: Alcedo - Standby-safety vessel / 2017-06-18 - 2017-07-15 (1 місяць)
Chief Officer: MDPL Conqueror - AHTS / 2016-12-09 - 2017-04-06 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Murjan2 - Tug boat / 2019-07-21 - 2019-11-21 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Athletic - Tug boat / 2019-04-07 - 2019-05-23 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Jawar Abu Dhabi - Tug boat / 2018-12-04 - 2019-03-12 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: River Wind - General cargo / 2018-04-04 - 2018-07-05 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Bellatrix - General cargo / 2017-10-01 - 2018-01-02 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: FANREACH - Container Ship / 2019-07-10 - 2019-11-19 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: NEW GLORY - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-22 - 2018-12-18 (7 місяців)
2nd Officer: MSC AGATA - Container Ship / 2017-04-20 - 2017-10-15 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: MSC NILGUN - Container Ship / 2016-06-02 - 2016-11-20 (6 місяців)
2nd Officer: KARIN - Container Ship / 2015-12-18 - 2016-04-16 (4 місяця)
2nd Officer: SIVUCH - AHTS / 2019-08-15 - 2019-11-16 (3 місяця)
2nd Officer: SIVUCH - AHTS / 2018-07-09 - 2018-11-27 (5 місяців)
2nd Officer: MURMAN - MRSV / 2017-12-06 - 2018-03-06 (3 місяця)
3rd Officer: Captain Beklemishev - Tug boat / 2017-09-15 - 2017-11-16 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: Kapitan Martyshkin - AHTS / 2016-12-17 - 2017-04-30 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: MAC Centaurus - MRSV / 2019-09-16 - 2019-11-16 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: MAC Centaurus - MRSV / 2019-04-08 - 2019-07-07 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: GSP Centaurus - MRSV / 2018-11-27 - 2019-02-02 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: GSP Centaurus - MRSV / 2018-08-01 - 2018-10-01 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: GSP Centaurus - MRSV / 2018-04-01 - 2018-06-01 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Сrown Topaz - Reefer / 2019-07-12 - 2019-11-15 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Crown Jade - Reefer / 2019-04-29 - 2019-07-10 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Baltic Hollyhock - Reefer / 2018-09-27 - 2019-01-14 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Avelona Star - Reefer / 2018-03-17 - 2018-07-14 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Avelona Star - Reefer / 2017-05-24 - 2017-11-03 (5 місяців)
Master: Asphalt Spirit - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2022-11-03 - 2023-03-07 (4 місяця)
Master: Asphalt Seminole - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2021-11-10 - 2022-04-29 (6 місяців)
Master: Asphalt Carrier - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2020-08-24 - 2021-03-24 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: Star Kestrel - Chemical tanker / 2019-06-13 - 2019-11-15 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Asphalt Seminole - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2018-09-16 - 2019-02-08 (5 місяців)
Master: Fraserborg - General cargo / 2021-10-14 - 2022-01-27 (3 місяця)
Master: Fraserborg - General cargo / 2021-03-19 - 2021-07-05 (4 місяця)
Master: Fraserborg - General cargo / 2020-09-09 - 2020-12-08 (3 місяця)
Master: Fraserborg - General cargo / 2020-01-23 - 2020-05-22 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Fraserborg - General cargo / 2019-08-06 - 2019-11-13 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: TRUEBORN - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-18 - 2019-11-11 (7 місяців)
Chief Officer: LADY CELINE - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-08 - 2019-03-16 (1 рік)
Chief Officer: Haje zainab - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-17 - 2017-07-12 (11 місяців)
2nd Officer: Byblos - General cargo / 2015-05-05 - 2015-06-27 (2 місяця)
2nd Officer: LADY CELINE - Bulk Carrier / 2013-10-04 - 2015-02-20 (1 рік)
Chief Officer: RIIG ANDROMEDA - Research vessel / 2019-09-24 - 2019-11-11 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: MALBURG - Bunkering Vessel / 2018-12-16 - 2019-04-12 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: CORRIB FISHER - Chemical tanker / 2018-08-06 - 2018-11-12 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: ANWAAR AL KHALIJ - Chemical tanker / 2017-06-29 - 2017-11-17 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: ANWAAR ALKHALIJ - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-12-26 - 2017-03-19 (3 місяця)
Master: Kolguev - General cargo / 2021-06-10 - 2021-08-27 (3 місяця)
Master: Belomorskiy-20 - Dry Cargo / 2020-05-12 - 2020-11-03 (6 місяців)
Chief Officer: Belomorskiy-17 - Coaster / 2019-08-30 - 2019-11-10 (2 місяця)
Chief Officer: Kaya - General cargo / 2018-09-27 - 2019-03-18 (6 місяців)
Master: Metel - Other vessels / 2017-07-05 - 2018-08-31 (1 рік)
Chief Officer: CATALONIA - General cargo / 2019-06-19 - 2019-11-07 (5 місяців)
Chief Officer: Ark Royal - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-01 - 2018-12-22 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Frisian Sea - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-02-23 - 2018-06-13 (4 місяця)
Chief Officer: Frisiana - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-08-30 - 2017-12-09 (3 місяця)
Chief Officer: Frisian Spring - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-12-23 - 2017-04-11 (4 місяця)