Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
4th Engineer: Vladimir Velikiy - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-02 - 2021-10-22 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Astrosprinter - Container Ship / 2021-05-07 - 2021-10-21 (5 месяцев)
Chief Cook: RMS BAERL - General cargo / 2021-02-15 - 2021-10-15 (8 месяцев)
Master: MSC Shristi - Container Ship / 2021-05-26 - 2021-10-15 (5 месяцев)
Master: MSC Alicante - Container Ship / 2020-06-26 - 2020-11-02 (4 месяца)
Master: MSC Shristi - Container Ship / 2019-10-29 - 2020-02-28 (4 месяца)
Master: Santa Bettina - Container Ship / 2019-01-17 - 2019-06-07 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Atlantic Supporter - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-09-07 - 2021-10-10 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Tur - AHTS / 2021-05-08 - 2021-05-28 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Tarpan - AHTS / 2021-01-21 - 2021-05-07 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Tur - AHTS / 2020-12-01 - 2021-01-13 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Tur - AHTS / 2020-09-04 - 2020-10-04 (1 месяц)
OS: PAK - Tug boat / 2021-08-06 - 2021-10-09 (2 месяца)
Deck Cadet: SIBERIA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-06 - 2020-12-08 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Maran future - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-01 - 2021-10-09 (1 месяц)
3rd Engineer: Maran elegance - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-26 - 2021-08-31 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Maran Glory - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-12 - 2021-04-25 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Dionisios solomos - Passenger vessel / 2020-07-23 - 2020-10-10 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: Front leopard - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-02-16 - 2021-10-08 (8 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Front Ocelot - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-03-03 - 2020-08-24 (6 месяцев)
OS: Ocean trader - Container Ship / 2020-02-01 - 2021-10-08 (1 год)
Chief Engineer: Adnoc 230 - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-06-16 - 2021-10-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Executive Honour - AHTS / 2020-02-16 - 2020-07-08 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Executive Anthem - AHTS / 2020-01-18 - 2020-01-28 (10 дней)
Chief Engineer: Executive Brilliance - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-08-04 - 2019-11-03 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Executive Accord - AHTS / 2019-07-15 - 2019-07-29 (14 дней)
3rd Engineer: Neptun - Dry Cargo / 2021-07-24 - 2021-10-02 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Oslo bulk 1 - Dry Cargo / 2020-10-13 - 2021-02-02 (4 месяца)
AB Seaman: YunyiBaltiets - Training Ship / 2021-07-12 - 2021-09-30 (3 месяца)
Chief Cook: Sigma - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-13 - 2021-09-25 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: M/T KOLIN4 - Chemical tanker / 2020-09-25 - 2021-05-01 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Mount Kinabalu - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-02 - 2021-09-16 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Mount Kinabalu - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-22 - 2020-08-28 (9 месяцев)
Master: Mobile - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-29 - 2021-09-15 (3 месяца)
Master: Triades - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-14 - 2021-04-23 (8 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Sif W - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-05-11 - 2021-09-14 (4 месяца)
AB Seaman: Sif W - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-10-13 - 2021-01-20 (3 месяца)
OS: Sif W - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-03-02 - 2020-06-28 (4 месяца)
OS: Sif W - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-01-07 - 2019-03-19 (2 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Novator - Tug boat / 2021-07-20 - 2021-09-11 (2 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Stividor - Tug boat / 2021-06-08 - 2021-07-19 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Gloria - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-26 - 2021-09-10 (1 год)
ETO: HAKE - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-02 - 2021-09-03 (7 месяцев)
ETO: Paganini - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-26 - 2020-07-29 (9 месяцев)
ETO: Baltia - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-25 - 2019-08-26 (2 месяца)
ETO: MOONBEAM - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-24 - 2019-04-30 (3 месяца)
ETO: Edwin - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-10 - 2018-09-18 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: MV New Trans - General cargo / 2020-12-09 - 2021-08-20 (8 месяцев)