Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Engine Cadet: VTB 168 - Dry Cargo / 2018-01-30 - 2018-04-15 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Tradewind Hope - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-12-07 - 2018-04-07 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Cape Beira - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-04-01 - 2017-08-01 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Cape Beira - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-07-10 - 2016-12-09 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: FSL New York - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-10-15 - 2016-02-23 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Baltic Sea I - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-01-31 - 2015-07-19 (6 месяцев)
Deck Mechanic: Magtymguly - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-01 - 2018-03-07 (2 года)
2nd Engineer: Paradero - Container Ship / 2017-09-29 - 2018-02-23 (5 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Antje - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-11-16 - 2017-05-08 (6 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Antje - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-02-03 - 2016-07-03 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Industrial Kelly - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-03-27 - 2015-10-22 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Industrial Kennedy - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-09-27 - 2015-01-11 (3 месяца)
Chief Cook: Palembang - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-09-08 - 2018-02-22 (5 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: HANSA CLOPPENBURG - Container Ship / 2016-02-15 - 2016-08-28 (6 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: Madura - Container Ship / 2014-07-02 - 2015-02-01 (7 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: Onyx Arrow - RO-RO / 2013-09-04 - 2014-04-01 (7 месяцев)
Pumpman: HAVEN - Jack-up Platform / 2014-01-01 - 2018-01-30 (4 года)
Deck Cadet: Baltic Spring - Reefer / 2017-10-20 - 2017-12-20 (2 месяца)
AB Seaman: Veles - General cargo / 2016-06-17 - 2017-01-30 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Surgut - General cargo / 2015-08-20 - 2016-01-16 (5 месяцев)
OS: Prod.oil Tanker Combodia - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-10-10 - 2017-12-10 (2 месяца)
Master: ice eagle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-01-14 - 2017-10-22 (5 лет)
Fitter / Welder: kolomenskoe - Fishing vessel / 2017-04-19 - 2017-09-18 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: IVAN SERGIYENKO - General cargo / 2017-05-09 - 2017-09-14 (4 месяца)
Engine Cadet: Udarnik - Tug boat / 2016-06-01 - 2017-07-07 (1 год)
Engine Cadet: MINERAL NEW YORK - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-28 - 2017-06-15 (7 месяцев)
Boatswain: Азов - Chemical tanker / 2016-12-13 - 2017-05-26 (5 месяцев)
No Experience
No Experience
AB Seaman: LNG Abuja - LPG / LNG / 2012-11-03 - 2013-03-25 (5 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: mv Infinity - General cargo / 2016-08-22 - 2017-02-24 (6 месяцев)
Chief Cook: плллп - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-06 - 2016-02-04 (12 месяцев)
El. Engineer: поплп - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-05 - 2016-02-04 (12 месяцев)
Motorman: Neptune Dynamis - RO-RO / 2016-07-18 - 2017-01-24 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Clipper kalavryta - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-17 - 2015-12-12 (3 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Comanche - General cargo / 2014-12-20 - 2015-06-26 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Nordic Tianjin - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-15 - 2017-01-15 (6 месяцев)