Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Steward: No work experience - Crew boat / 2021-12-01 - 2021-12-01 (0 дней)
Chief Officer: Dunay - Dredger / 2021-10-20 - 2021-11-30 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Dunay - Dredger / 2021-06-01 - 2021-10-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ginger - Dredger / 2020-01-06 - 2020-03-25 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Ginger - Dredger / 2019-09-02 - 2019-11-01 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Ginger - Dredger / 2019-06-02 - 2019-08-01 (2 месяца)
OS: MV GAZALLE - RO-RO / 2020-11-26 - 2021-11-26 (1 год)
Deck Cadet: M.T. DAWN MADURAI - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-29 - 2021-11-23 (1 год)
OS: Granit - Tug boat / 2021-09-20 - 2021-11-21 (2 месяца)
OS: Rusich-10 - General cargo / 2021-07-15 - 2021-11-12 (4 месяца)
Motormen / Turner: Blue Ship - Pipe laying vessel / 2021-07-12 - 2021-11-02 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: MV OCEAN MERRY - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-04 - 2021-10-31 (12 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: MT maple - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-09 - 2021-10-30 (1 год)
Cook: Resiliant - Pipe laying vessel / 2021-07-27 - 2021-10-22 (3 месяца)
Cook: Charlotte Antigua and Barbuda - Container Ship / 2020-02-11 - 2020-10-09 (8 месяцев)
ETO: Bulk Sydney - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-21 - 2021-10-14 (7 месяцев)
ETO: Bulk Seoul - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-22 - 2020-07-14 (10 месяцев)
ETO: Crystalia - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-31 - 2019-02-08 (5 месяцев)
ETO: New Orleans - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-19 - 2018-02-25 (5 месяцев)
Electric Cadet: New Orleans - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-14 - 2017-09-18 (1 месяц)
Chief Engineer: PARTHENON TS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-21 - 2021-10-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: STAVANGER PRIDE - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-14 - 2021-01-29 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: BW CHEETAH - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-02 - 2020-05-29 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: BW MYNA - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-05-23 - 2019-08-19 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: STI EXPRESS - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-10-29 - 2019-01-28 (3 месяца)
2nd Engineer: OT - 2425 - Dry Cargo / 2017-01-01 - 2021-10-10 (4 года)
Electric Cadet: MOGUCHIY - Tug boat / 2021-08-01 - 2021-10-01 (2 месяца)
1st Engineer: Despina - MRSV / 2021-05-16 - 2021-09-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: African Worker - Barge / 2018-04-21 - 2020-12-22 (2 года)
Chief Engineer: Tablate Tide - AHTS / 2017-11-02 - 2018-02-07 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: African Installer - Accommodation barge / 2015-06-01 - 2017-06-30 (2 года)
Chief Engineer: Brodospas Sun - AHTS / 2012-04-22 - 2014-08-14 (2 года)
2nd Cook: WB Yeats - RO-RO / 2021-07-03 - 2021-09-16 (2 месяца)
2nd Cook: Oscar Wilde - Cruise Liner / 2015-06-03 - 2015-08-04 (2 месяца)
2nd Cook: Stena Flavia - Passenger vessel / 2015-01-05 - 2015-02-05 (1 месяц)
2nd Cook: Stena Flavia - Passenger vessel / 2014-11-05 - 2014-12-05 (1 месяц)
2nd Cook: Stena Flavia - Passenger vessel / 2014-09-05 - 2014-10-05 (1 месяц)
Fitter / Welder: AS Serena - Container Ship / 2021-03-04 - 2021-09-13 (6 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: Piotr - Fishing vessel / 2020-09-25 - 2020-12-05 (2 месяца)
Fitter / Welder: AS Angelina - Container Ship / 2020-01-11 - 2020-07-18 (6 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: MSC Ishyka - Container Ship / 2018-11-28 - 2019-07-25 (8 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: MSC Caitlin - Container Ship / 2017-12-06 - 2018-07-21 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Piri Reis Universitesi - RO-RO / 2021-08-12 - 2021-09-12 (1 месяц)
Deck Cadet: Eendracht - Yacht / 2020-02-16 - 2020-04-01 (2 месяца)
AB Seaman: iosif shmelkin - Fishing vessel / 2021-04-08 - 2021-09-11 (5 месяцев)
OS: Lazyrny - Fishing vessel / 2018-05-30 - 2018-11-13 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: MMA SKANDI RESPONDER - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-05-05 - 2021-09-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: MWV FALCON - Construction vessel / 2020-10-15 - 2020-11-21 (1 месяц)
Chief Engineer: MWV FALCON - Construction vessel / 2020-02-07 - 2020-07-21 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: MWV FALCON - Construction vessel / 2019-03-13 - 2019-05-26 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: DSV HALUL 41 - DSV (Diving Support) / 2018-12-04 - 2019-01-05 (1 месяц)