Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Cook: Falcona - General cargo / 2018-07-03 - 2019-03-12 (8 месяцев)
Cook: Munzur - General cargo / 2015-03-10 - 2015-10-09 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Sanar-2 - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-10-23 - 2019-03-07 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Anatoly Kolodkin - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-08-31 - 2017-12-15 (3 месяца)
Photographer: Westerdam - Cruise Liner / 2018-09-01 - 2019-03-01 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: JS Ineos Ingenuity - LPG / LNG / 2018-10-17 - 2019-02-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: JS Ineos Independence - LPG / LNG / 2018-03-08 - 2018-07-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: JS Ineos Inspiration - LPG / LNG / 2017-07-09 - 2017-11-22 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: RONALD N - LPG / LNG / 2016-10-30 - 2017-03-04 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Navigator Glory - LPG / LNG / 2016-06-06 - 2016-08-08 (2 месяца)
OS: Sormovskiy-3060 - General cargo / 2018-10-17 - 2019-01-31 (3 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Kizuch - Other vessels / 2017-11-20 - 2018-01-23 (2 месяца)
Fitter / Welder: HORIZON LEADER - RO-RO / 2018-07-02 - 2019-01-29 (7 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: EUROSPIRIT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-10 - 2017-12-01 (8 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: BOWFIN - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-11-25 - 2017-01-23 (2 месяца)
Fitter / Welder: ARCTIC FLOUNDER - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-12-30 - 2016-07-19 (7 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: AMELIA PACIFIC - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-03-01 - 2015-09-13 (6 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: M/w Drawno - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-03 - 2019-01-07 (10 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Chelsea 1 - General cargo / 2018-07-04 - 2019-01-07 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Slv-400 - Tug boat / 2017-04-28 - 2017-08-31 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Bulat - Tug boat / 2016-06-06 - 2016-08-14 (2 месяца)
Engine Cadet: CHAPORA II - Tug boat / 2018-12-26 - 2018-12-31 (5 дней)
Engine Cadet: Antey - Training Ship / 2018-11-25 - 2018-12-26 (1 месяц)
AB Seaman: Lewek Crusader - Accomodation barge / 2018-07-06 - 2018-12-22 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Pasco98 - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-13 - 2018-12-21 (1 месяц)
Deck Cadet: Tan binh 136 - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-11 - 2018-09-19 (11 месяцев)
Cook: AMUR 2507 - General cargo / 2018-08-05 - 2018-12-01 (4 месяца)
Cook: AMUR 2507 - General cargo / 2017-10-19 - 2018-04-12 (6 месяцев)
Cook: Baltimar Notos - General cargo / 2016-08-17 - 2017-03-20 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: MV"MOSTEIN" - General cargo / 2018-04-10 - 2018-11-26 (8 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: MV"DOMBAY" - Passenger vessel / 2017-03-23 - 2017-08-25 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Galiasgar Kamal - Chemical tanker / 2018-07-10 - 2018-11-20 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Naviger-2 - Chemical tanker / 2018-01-15 - 2018-04-25 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Naviger-2 - Chemical tanker / 2017-09-02 - 2018-01-03 (4 месяца)
Boatswain: ARMADA Constractor - Pipe laying vessel / 2016-06-15 - 2017-08-10 (1 год)
Boatswain: ARMADA Installer - Pipe laying vessel / 2011-06-11 - 2016-03-02 (4 года)
Deck Cadet: M/V Boslina - General cargo / 2018-07-09 - 2018-11-06 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Ierax - Chemical tanker / 2018-05-19 - 2018-11-05 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Ice Hawk - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-05-18 - 2017-10-22 (5 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Ierax - Chemical tanker / 2016-09-20 - 2017-02-22 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Ierax - Chemical tanker / 2016-01-17 - 2016-05-16 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Markus - General cargo / 2018-07-05 - 2018-10-31 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Markus - General cargo / 2018-02-19 - 2018-05-05 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Drait - General cargo / 2017-07-04 - 2017-09-09 (2 месяца)
Ship Security Officer: Aquashield 11 - Crew boat / 2016-03-04 - 2018-10-20 (2 года)
OS: Nevskiy 39 - Dry Cargo / 2018-08-25 - 2018-10-16 (2 месяца)
OS: Nevskiy 24 - Dry Cargo / 2017-07-01 - 2017-11-29 (5 месяцев)
OS: Ladozhskiy - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-04-11 - 2014-11-28 (8 месяцев)