Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
4th Engineer: SKS Saluda - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-10-01 - 2018-03-01 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: King Emerald - Chemical tanker / 2017-03-31 - 2017-07-24 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: Baltic Captain - Chemical tanker / 2016-08-12 - 2016-12-03 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: Bow Fin - Chemical tanker / 2015-11-23 - 2016-04-22 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Altai - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-01-16 - 2015-07-26 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Arvin - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-02 - 2018-02-27 (7 месяцев)
AB Seaman: M/y Valerie - Yacht / 2017-03-18 - 2017-04-27 (1 месяц)
AB Seaman: Dunaj - Passenger vessel / 2015-02-15 - 2016-01-08 (11 месяцев)
AB Seaman: M/v UCF - 4 - General cargo / 2013-10-12 - 2014-05-07 (7 месяцев)
OS: ZIM Qingdao - Container Ship / 2012-12-05 - 2013-08-02 (8 месяцев)
Oiler: Shark 55 - Tug boat / 2017-08-15 - 2018-02-06 (6 месяцев)
Trainee OS: MV Sneha 1 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-08-02 - 2017-08-08 (6 дней)
Master: Tasmanic Winter - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-09-13 - 2018-01-28 (4 месяца)
Master: Baltic Winter - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-03-06 - 2017-07-11 (4 месяца)
Master: Pacific Wintet - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-07-31 - 2016-12-14 (4 месяца)
Master: Heino - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-12-20 - 2016-04-26 (4 месяца)
Master: Thorco Amber - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-06-14 - 2015-09-21 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: boffa - Fishing vessel / 2017-07-25 - 2018-01-27 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: ELISA - Other vessels / 2017-01-03 - 2017-02-26 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Cape stork - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-30 - 2016-08-19 (7 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: omskiy143 - General cargo / 2014-10-20 - 2015-05-27 (7 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: Анатолий Пономарев - Fishing vessel / 2014-07-06 - 2014-10-06 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: HERMITAGE BRIDGE - Chemical tanker / 2017-09-11 - 2018-01-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: HERMITAGE BRIDGE - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-11-05 - 2017-04-07 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: HERMITAGE BRIDGE - Chemical tanker / 2016-02-14 - 2016-06-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: HERMITAGE BRIDGE - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-05-29 - 2015-10-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: HERMITAGE BRIDGE - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-08-01 - 2014-12-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Golden Oak - Chemical tanker / 2017-12-14 - 2018-01-02 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Captain Silver - Chemical tanker / 2017-02-01 - 2017-07-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Key Star - Chemical tanker / 2016-10-15 - 2016-11-15 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Key Star - Chemical tanker / 2016-08-13 - 2016-09-17 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Desert Oak - Chemical tanker / 2016-03-17 - 2016-07-17 (4 месяца)
Engine Cadet: Novator - Repair Vessel / 2017-06-07 - 2017-12-31 (7 месяцев)
El. Eng. Assistant: OLYMPIADA - RO-RO / 2016-07-01 - 2017-12-30 (1 год)
El. Eng. Assistant: FEDOR URIUPIN - AHTS / 2016-05-19 - 2016-06-16 (1 месяц)
El. Eng. Assistant: Kruzenshtern - Passenger vessel / 2015-02-17 - 2015-04-27 (2 месяца)
4th Engineer: CHEYENNE - LPG / LNG / 2017-09-17 - 2017-12-26 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: CONCORDE - LPG / LNG / 2017-01-28 - 2017-07-01 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: CHAIENGER - LPG / LNG / 2016-05-30 - 2016-09-28 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: CORSAIR - LPG / LNG / 2015-09-22 - 2016-04-25 (7 месяцев)
Motorman: MSC NORA - Container Ship / 2014-06-30 - 2015-01-22 (7 месяцев)
Pumpman: Domenico Ievoli - Chemical tanker / 2017-07-17 - 2017-12-13 (5 месяцев)
Pumpman: DOMENICO IEVOLI - Chemical tanker / 2016-11-25 - 2017-04-01 (4 месяца)
Pumpman: RHL Nuernber - Chemical tanker / 2016-01-30 - 2016-05-20 (4 месяца)
Pumpman: Wappen von Stuttgart - Chemical tanker / 2015-05-05 - 2015-11-13 (6 месяцев)
Pumpman: Wappen von Nurnberg - Chemical tanker / 2014-10-06 - 2015-01-27 (4 месяца)
Motorman: PACIFIC FUTURE - General cargo / 2017-04-27 - 2017-12-06 (7 месяцев)
Motorman: ALESSANDRA 1 - General cargo / 2015-12-10 - 2016-06-30 (7 месяцев)
Motorman: NORMA - General cargo / 2015-01-09 - 2015-07-03 (6 месяцев)
Ref. Engineer: GREEN BODO - Reefer / 2017-11-03 - 2017-12-01 (1 месяц)
Ref. Engineer: FEGULUS - Reefer / 2017-04-26 - 2017-07-06 (2 месяца)
Ref. Engineer: GREEN MAGNIFIC - Reefer / 2016-12-10 - 2017-04-12 (4 месяца)
Ref. Engineer: CROWN SAPPHIRE - Reefer / 2016-04-18 - 2016-09-06 (5 месяцев)
Ref. Engineer: ICE ROSE - Reefer / 2015-08-08 - 2015-12-05 (4 месяца)
OS: MV Macro Glory - Crew boat / 2017-03-10 - 2017-11-30 (9 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Navios Libra II - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-10 - 2017-11-22 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: PHAEDRA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-04 - 2016-12-03 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: PEACEFUL SEAS - Bulk Carrier / 2015-07-12 - 2016-01-26 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: MARIA - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-27 - 2014-11-24 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Panorama - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-28 - 2014-02-14 (9 месяцев)
Staff Chief Engineer: БАЛТИЙСКИЙ-107 - Dry Cargo / 2017-06-17 - 2017-11-06 (5 месяцев)
Staff Chief Engineer: БАЛТИЙСКИЙ-107 - Dry Cargo / 2016-11-01 - 2017-01-20 (3 месяца)
Staff Chief Engineer: КРИСТАЛЛ - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-02-14 - 2016-08-14 (6 месяцев)
Staff Chief Engineer: НЕФТЕРУДОВОЗ-50М - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-12-03 - 2015-08-15 (8 месяцев)
Staff Chief Engineer: НЕФТЕРУДОВОЗ-50М - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-08-01 - 2014-10-30 (3 месяца)
2nd Engineer: NAVI STAR - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-07-14 - 2017-11-04 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: MYS TARKHANKUT - AHTS / 2016-04-18 - 2016-11-14 (7 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: LADVA - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-01 - 2016-01-30 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: KALITVA - General cargo / 2014-05-03 - 2014-10-19 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Atlantic Tonjer - MRSV / 2017-09-12 - 2017-10-27 (1 месяц)
Chief Engineer: Murjan 2 - AHT / 2017-05-29 - 2017-08-04 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: VOS Principle - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-01-03 - 2017-03-23 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: VOS Principle - Platform Supply vessel / 2016-07-17 - 2016-09-15 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: VOS Challenge - AHTS / 2016-05-23 - 2016-07-16 (2 месяца)
AB Seaman: GB Pacific - General cargo / 2017-06-19 - 2017-10-26 (4 месяца)
AB Seaman: UCF6 - General cargo / 2017-02-07 - 2017-05-08 (3 месяца)
AB Seaman: atlantic runner - General cargo / 2016-01-27 - 2016-07-25 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Anthea - Container Ship / 2015-02-13 - 2015-08-22 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: хирург романов - Tug boat / 2013-09-19 - 2014-11-26 (1 год)
2nd Engineer: Jana - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-07-19 - 2017-10-26 (3 месяца)
2nd Engineer: Jana - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-08-19 - 2017-03-18 (7 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Jana - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-10-15 - 2016-03-06 (5 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Audre - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-03-31 - 2015-05-19 (2 месяца)
2nd Engineer: Venta - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-04-30 - 2014-10-17 (6 месяцев)