Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Master: Lavina - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-03-30 - 2011-07-03 (3 месяца)
Master: Lavina - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-07-26 - 2010-11-28 (4 месяца)
Master: Lavina - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2009-10-22 - 2010-03-18 (5 месяцев)
Master: Mykhailo Synytsia - General cargo / 2009-05-13 - 2009-08-20 (3 месяца)
Master: Kapitan Shyriagin - General cargo / 2008-12-10 - 2009-05-12 (5 месяцев)
Boatswain: GB MED - Dry Cargo / 2011-04-19 - 2011-06-20 (2 месяца)
Boatswain: Mariaburg - Coaster / 2010-04-29 - 2010-09-30 (5 месяцев)
Boatswain: Diana G - RO-RO / 2009-05-15 - 2009-11-05 (6 месяцев)
AB / Crane Operator: Heron - General cargo / 2008-04-01 - 2008-10-03 (6 месяцев)
AB / Crane Operator: Global carrier - Heavy lift vessel / 2007-10-19 - 2008-01-23 (3 месяца)
Junior DP Officer: CASPIAN QALA - Platform Supply vessel / 2011-04-15 - 2011-05-28 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: CASPIAN PROTECTOR - Standby-safety vessel / 2011-03-18 - 2011-03-30 (12 дней)
Junior DP Officer: CASPIAN QALA - Platform Supply vessel / 2011-02-11 - 2011-03-04 (1 месяц)
Junior DP Officer: CASPIAN QALA - Platform Supply vessel / 2010-11-16 - 2011-02-01 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: ISLAY - AHTS / 2010-09-24 - 2010-10-24 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Paul W Murrill / DP2 - Offshore Supply vessel / 2011-02-01 - 2011-05-08 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Paul W Murrill / DP2 - Offshore Supply vessel / 2010-12-12 - 2011-01-12 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: CE Laborde Jr / DP2 - AHTS / 2010-09-08 - 2010-11-03 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Miss Jane Tide / DP2 - Offshore Supply vessel / 2010-08-24 - 2010-09-08 (15 дней)
2nd Officer: Jo Lynn Tide / DP1 - Offshore Supply vessel / 2010-08-10 - 2010-08-24 (14 дней)
Chief Engineer: DUTCH POWER - Tug boat / 2011-02-13 - 2011-04-26 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: DUTCH POWER - Tug boat / 2010-11-25 - 2010-12-10 (15 дней)
Chief Engineer: ARAL - Tug boat / 2010-09-25 - 2010-11-24 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: ARAL - Tug boat / 2010-07-11 - 2010-09-11 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: ARAL - Tug boat / 2010-04-26 - 2010-06-24 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Happy Rover - Heavy lift vessel / 2008-12-15 - 2009-04-21 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Amana - RO-RO / 2008-05-04 - 2008-11-13 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Spectra - Bulk Carrier / 2007-10-14 - 2008-04-22 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Roksolana - Dry Cargo / 2007-06-21 - 2007-09-24 (3 месяца)
OS: LA PALOMA - Container Ship / 2008-10-02 - 2009-01-17 (3 месяца)
Deck Cadet: LA PALOMA - Container Ship / 2007-11-27 - 2008-10-01 (10 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: ANKOBRA - Tug boat / 2006-06-26 - 2006-08-10 (1 месяц)
2nd Engineer: Stolt Eagles, Hawk - Chemical tanker / 1999-08-08 - 2004-01-01 (4 года)
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience