Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Armada Explorer - Chemical tanker / 2021-08-20 - 2021-12-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Armada Explorer - Chemical tanker / 2020-12-24 - 2021-05-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Armada Explorer - Chemical tanker / 2020-03-24 - 2020-08-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Armada Explorer - Chemical tanker / 2019-08-02 - 2019-12-06 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Armada Explorer - Chemical tanker / 2018-09-17 - 2019-03-08 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Janet C - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-08-05 - 2021-12-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Vectis Isle - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-12-13 - 2021-04-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Vectis Falcon - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-12-20 - 2020-06-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Vectis Progress - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-06-23 - 2019-10-31 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Vectis Castle - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-10-11 - 2019-02-26 (4 месяца)
Master: Castor - Bulk Carrier / 2024-06-12 - 2024-10-03 (4 месяца)
Master: Mystic Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-17 - 2024-03-27 (6 месяцев)
Master: NIGHTHAWK - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-17 - 2023-07-17 (5 месяцев)
Master: OWL - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-26 - 2022-11-20 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cabeiro - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-21 - 2021-11-15 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Hatsukari - Reefer / 2021-05-04 - 2021-10-31 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Hatsukari - Reefer / 2020-04-18 - 2020-11-13 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Hatsukari - Reefer / 2019-05-10 - 2019-10-28 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Hatsukari - Reefer / 2018-05-05 - 2018-11-09 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Hatsukari - Reefer / 2017-06-24 - 2018-01-10 (7 месяцев)
Master: MIKHAIL BRITNEV - General cargo / 2023-12-04 - 2024-03-30 (4 месяца)
Master: Mikhail Britnev - General cargo / 2023-03-08 - 2023-07-31 (5 месяцев)
Master: Mikhail Britnev - General cargo / 2022-07-05 - 2022-10-27 (4 месяца)
Master: Mikhail Britnev - General cargo / 2021-10-08 - 2022-02-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mikhail Britnev - General cargo / 2021-06-02 - 2021-08-27 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Altan - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-05-15 - 2021-06-15 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Altan - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-10-17 - 2020-12-17 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Altan - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-07-07 - 2020-08-23 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Altan - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-01-30 - 2020-03-11 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Altan - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-11-08 - 2019-12-18 (1 месяц)
Master: Nevskiy - Reefer / 2021-06-14 - 2021-10-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nevskiy - Reefer / 2021-03-17 - 2021-06-13 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Novaya Zemlya - Reefer / 2020-05-23 - 2020-11-28 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Novaya Zemlya - Reefer / 2019-07-11 - 2019-12-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Novaya Zemlya - Reefer / 2018-07-20 - 2018-12-14 (5 месяцев)
Master: SYMI - Bulk Carrier / 2024-03-29 - 2024-08-09 (4 месяца)
Master: IKAN PARANG - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-13 - 2023-09-14 (4 месяца)
Master: ATLANTIC ALTAMIRA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-11 - 2023-03-20 (5 месяцев)
Master: ANDROMEDA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-27 - 2022-07-04 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: AD ASTRA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-11 - 2021-05-23 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MSC Aurelia - Ferry / 2022-09-05 - 2023-03-06 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Starry Metropolis - Passenger vessel / 2019-10-03 - 2021-04-24 (1 год)
Safety Officer: Saipan Star - Passenger vessel / 2018-11-25 - 2019-04-22 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Saipan Star - Passenger vessel / 2018-04-30 - 2018-10-03 (5 месяцев)
Safety Officer: China Star - Passenger vessel / 2017-01-13 - 2017-11-01 (10 месяцев)
Master: AMS 1 - General cargo / 2022-08-29 - 2023-04-05 (7 месяцев)
Master: German sky - General cargo / 2021-06-10 - 2022-05-02 (11 месяцев)
Chief Officer: River Thames - General cargo / 2020-07-29 - 2021-03-12 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: River Thames - General cargo / 2019-04-17 - 2019-12-26 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Salix - General cargo / 2018-07-14 - 2019-02-02 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Spectrum - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-27 - 2021-02-02 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Spectrum - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-05-23 - 2020-08-23 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Hércules 500 - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-10-23 - 2020-02-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Caribbean Alliance - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-08-10 - 2019-03-06 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Kriti Amethyst - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-02-23 - 2017-12-23 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M.T VER - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-08 - 2021-01-26 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M.T RED SEA 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-10 - 2019-08-19 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: M.T COSMIC - Chemical tanker / 2018-03-10 - 2018-12-23 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M.T COSMIC - Chemical tanker / 2016-09-17 - 2017-02-19 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M.T GARHOUD - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-02-07 - 2016-05-07 (1 год)
Master: ELZA - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-04-22 - 2023-11-15 (7 месяцев)
Master: FORTUNE GALAXY - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-10-02 - 2023-03-24 (6 месяцев)
Master: MOLECULE - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-26 - 2021-09-20 (2 месяца)
Master: SALVADOR - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-06 - 2021-07-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: ELKA NIKOLAS - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-05 - 2020-12-23 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Nordic London - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-31 - 2020-12-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Maliy B.S. - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-12-08 - 2020-05-21 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Aqua Diamond - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-13 - 2019-05-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ocean Marvel - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-27 - 2018-05-14 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Ocean Marvel - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-14 - 2017-08-26 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: MB-31 - Tug boat / 2020-07-16 - 2020-12-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Irtysh - Dredger / 2019-02-07 - 2020-03-17 (1 год)
Chief Officer: Ruza - Reefer / 2018-05-07 - 2018-12-28 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sayany - Research vessel / 2016-03-01 - 2017-03-01 (1 год)
Chief Officer: Auguste Scyhulte - Container Ship / 2014-11-12 - 2015-06-26 (7 месяцев)
Master: Right Whale - Fishing vessel / 2022-09-25 - 2023-01-22 (4 месяца)
Master: Right Whale - Fishing vessel / 2022-01-29 - 2022-06-05 (4 месяца)
Master: Right Whale - Fishing vessel / 2021-08-29 - 2021-09-12 (14 дней)
Chief Officer: Right Whale - Fishing vessel / 2020-06-25 - 2020-11-28 (5 месяцев)
Master: Right Whale - Fishing vessel / 2019-09-28 - 2020-02-18 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: AMARANT - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-09-15 - 2020-11-15 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: AMARANT - Chemical tanker / 2020-05-21 - 2020-07-08 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: AMARANT - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-10-22 - 2020-01-12 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: AMARANT - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-05-22 - 2019-07-29 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: AMARANT - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-12-18 - 2019-03-11 (3 месяца)
Master: Front Loki - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-03-29 - 2022-08-13 (4 месяца)
Master: Front Loki - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-07-15 - 2021-12-01 (5 месяцев)
Master: Front Loki - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-15 - 2021-03-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Front Loki - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-16 - 2020-11-09 (5 месяцев)
Master: Front Queen - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-04 - 2020-01-13 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Maersk Saigon - Container Ship / 2020-06-20 - 2020-10-15 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Maersk Saigon - Container Ship / 2019-10-07 - 2020-02-14 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Maersk Saigon - Container Ship / 2019-01-29 - 2019-05-22 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Maersk Serangoon - Container Ship / 2018-06-18 - 2018-10-20 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Maersk Serangoon - Container Ship / 2017-11-19 - 2018-02-18 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nicolay Aksenenko - Ferry / 2020-06-25 - 2020-10-02 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Capitan Somov - Fishing vessel / 2019-10-18 - 2020-03-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Pobeda - Ferry / 2018-08-02 - 2019-09-06 (1 год)
Chief Officer: Resurgence - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-10 - 2018-06-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: PLATT TIDE - AHTS / 2017-05-20 - 2017-09-25 (4 месяца)