Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
1st Officer: Orinoco - Container Ship / 2023-07-27 - 2023-11-30 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Orinoco - Container Ship / 2023-03-21 - 2023-07-26 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Yerupaja - Container Ship / 2022-08-09 - 2022-12-23 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Orinoco - Container Ship / 2021-09-24 - 2022-02-04 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Orinoco - Container Ship / 2020-11-30 - 2021-05-02 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: DHT LION - VLCC / 2023-05-12 - 2023-11-19 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: DHT LION - VLCC / 2022-07-18 - 2023-01-20 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: DHT HARRIER - VLCC / 2022-01-05 - 2022-06-20 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ataulfo Alves - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-03 - 2021-08-17 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sarak - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-04-14 - 2020-09-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Rising Sun IHI GERA - Barge / 2023-08-04 - 2023-11-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Antey - AHTS / 2023-04-21 - 2023-07-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Antey - AHTS / 2022-11-29 - 2023-02-03 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Yury Topchev - AHTS / 2022-07-11 - 2022-10-27 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Yury Topchev - AHTS / 2022-03-09 - 2022-04-10 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Karewood Pride - General cargo / 2023-03-13 - 2023-08-18 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Karewood Star - General cargo / 2021-08-18 - 2022-02-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Karewood Star - General cargo / 2020-08-14 - 2021-02-19 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Karewood Brave - General cargo / 2019-11-19 - 2020-05-06 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Karewood Glory - General cargo / 2019-02-18 - 2019-08-10 (6 месяцев)
Master: ELIAK - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-11-11 - 2024-05-31 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ABU DHABI III - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-01-14 - 2023-07-22 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ABU DHABI III - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-28 - 2022-09-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: ABU DHABI III - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-11-21 - 2022-02-22 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: OCEAN PEGASUS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-08-13 - 2021-05-30 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: LE HAVRE - Container Ship / 2022-12-26 - 2023-05-11 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Pusan C - Container Ship / 2021-12-13 - 2022-08-13 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Rio Grande - Container Ship / 2021-05-15 - 2021-10-05 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: CMA CGM Melisande - Container Ship / 2020-06-15 - 2021-02-15 (8 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Danae C - Container Ship / 2019-07-31 - 2020-01-12 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Rix Onyx - General cargo / 2022-11-18 - 2023-04-22 (5 месяцев)
Trainee Officer: Cemclipper - Cement Carrier / 2022-09-17 - 2022-09-28 (11 дней)
Chief Officer: Helene G. - Dry Cargo / 2021-11-05 - 2022-03-09 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Beaumaiden - Dry Cargo / 2020-07-05 - 2020-12-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Beaumaiden - Dry Cargo / 2019-10-28 - 2020-02-27 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: GOLDEN FORTUNE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-15 - 2023-02-22 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: GOLDEN FREEZE - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-16 - 2022-03-18 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SBI PISCES - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-03 - 2021-06-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SBI PISCES - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-12 - 2020-07-31 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SBI VIRGO - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-18 - 2019-10-28 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Athena - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-19 - 2023-02-04 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Thor brave - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-13 - 2022-01-19 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Thor Breeze - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-19 - 2021-02-26 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Thor Fortune - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-08 - 2019-12-16 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: KATARIINA - General cargo / 2022-12-25 - 2023-02-02 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: KATARIINA(NAJADA) - General cargo / 2022-08-08 - 2022-10-13 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: PHANTOM - Dry Cargo / 2022-04-20 - 2022-04-25 (5 дней)
Chief Officer: BONITA - Coaster / 2021-04-25 - 2021-08-05 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Mys Kruzenshterna - Fishing vessel / 2022-09-09 - 2022-12-25 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Mys Kruzenshterna - Fishing vessel / 2021-12-13 - 2022-05-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Victoria 1 - Fishing vessel / 2021-02-03 - 2021-04-17 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: MRS-150-087 - Fishing vessel / 2020-04-16 - 2020-09-17 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Mys Kruzenshterna - Fishing vessel / 2019-11-21 - 2020-04-15 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Gefest - Other vessels / 2022-05-10 - 2022-11-30 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Omskiy-136 - General cargo / 2021-08-19 - 2022-01-27 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Omskiy-136 - General cargo / 2021-04-14 - 2021-06-13 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Omskiy-130 - General cargo / 2019-11-14 - 2020-03-25 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Omskiy-130 - General cargo / 2019-01-18 - 2019-06-26 (5 месяцев)
Master: Maersk Incheon - Container Ship / 2023-10-15 - 2024-02-26 (4 месяца)
Master: Maersk Victoria - Container Ship / 2023-03-30 - 2023-07-26 (4 месяца)
Master: Maersk Jaingyin - Container Ship / 2022-06-26 - 2022-08-27 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Maersk Jaingyin - Container Ship / 2022-05-18 - 2022-06-25 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Sealand Los Angeles - Container Ship / 2021-11-27 - 2022-03-22 (4 месяца)
AB Seaman: Meritus - Barge / 2022-04-08 - 2022-05-20 (1 месяц)
AB Seaman: Oberon - General cargo / 2021-12-18 - 2022-03-17 (3 месяца)
AB Seaman: Kefalonia - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-03 - 2021-10-14 (4 месяца)
AB Seaman: Zircone - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-10 - 2021-04-07 (1 месяц)
Motorman-welder: IMANTA - Dredger / 2020-10-09 - 2021-01-22 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Oslo Forest 1 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-08-03 - 2022-01-27 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sea Endurance - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-09-01 - 2021-03-11 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sea Prospect - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-02-04 - 2020-07-27 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sea Discovery - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-03-15 - 2019-08-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sea Endurance - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-07-24 - 2019-01-14 (6 месяцев)
Master: Aral - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-29 - 2023-02-17 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Aral - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-06 - 2021-10-07 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Aral - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-19 - 2020-07-23 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Aral - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-03-15 - 2019-10-13 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Aral - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-04-15 - 2018-10-06 (6 месяцев)
Master: Naviger - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-01-06 - 2024-05-06 (4 месяца)
Master: Naviger - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-03-23 - 2023-09-20 (6 месяцев)
Master: BW Lara - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-20 - 2022-09-07 (4 месяца)
Master: Ocean Sunrise - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-10-01 - 2022-01-28 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ocean Sunrise - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-24 - 2021-09-30 (5 месяцев)
Master: GSL CHLOE - Container Ship / 2023-10-19 - 2024-03-03 (4 месяца)
Master: Contship Ice - Container Ship / 2023-01-26 - 2023-06-03 (4 месяца)
Master: Contship Ice - Container Ship / 2022-05-19 - 2022-10-14 (5 месяцев)
Master: Contship Ice - Container Ship / 2021-08-29 - 2022-01-13 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Contship Ice - Container Ship / 2021-06-21 - 2021-08-28 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Tsimlyansk - General cargo / 2021-04-14 - 2021-08-14 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: EKATERINA - General cargo / 2020-07-11 - 2020-11-05 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: GAMMA - General cargo / 2019-10-11 - 2020-03-20 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: CAPTAIN IVAN VIKULOV - General cargo / 2018-08-18 - 2019-01-20 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: AZOV - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-12-10 - 2018-05-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Quartz - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-21 - 2021-08-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Silver Ellie - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-02-26 - 2020-09-29 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cape Gavi - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-06-21 - 2019-10-29 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Quartz - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-11-13 - 2019-03-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Security - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-12-14 - 2018-04-25 (4 месяца)