Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Kashima Maru - Fishing vessel / 2009-01-16 - 2013-04-16 (4 года)
Chief Officer: Mys Datta - Fishing vessel / 2005-01-01 - 2008-04-16 (3 года)
Master: Mys Chuprova - Fishing vessel / 2001-01-01 - 2004-01-16 (3 года)
Chief Officer: Mys Sheltinga - Fishing vessel / 1995-02-16 - 2000-01-16 (4 года)
Mechanic: BT-435 - Tug boat / 2020-09-30 - 2022-05-25 (1 год)
Mechanic: BT-435 - Tug boat / 2017-03-16 - 2019-06-01 (2 года)
Mechanic: BT-435 - Tug boat / 2016-04-05 - 2016-12-20 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BT-435 - Tug boat / 2010-04-02 - 2012-07-02 (2 года)
AB / Motorman: BT-435 - Tug boat / 2006-03-15 - 2010-04-01 (4 года)
Master: ZALIV ANIVA - Bunkering Vessel / 2016-11-26 - 2021-01-10 (4 года)
Chief Officer: AFRICAN WILDCAT - Bulk Carrier / 2011-09-09 - 2012-02-23 (5 месяцев)
Master: TABERNACLE PRINCE - Bulk Carrier / 2011-02-10 - 2011-07-10 (5 месяцев)
Master: CITRINE-1 - Bulk Carrier / 2010-05-07 - 2010-09-26 (5 месяцев)
Master: JET - Bulk Carrier / 2010-05-07 - 2010-09-26 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Okhta Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-03-16 - 2011-08-03 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Okhta Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-06-26 - 2010-11-17 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Okhta Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-10-13 - 2010-02-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Okhta Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-02-01 - 2009-06-08 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Okhta Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2008-05-24 - 2008-09-27 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: CITY OF GUANGZHOU - Container Ship / 2010-12-18 - 2011-01-07 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: HYUNDAI STRIDE - Container Ship / 2010-06-16 - 2010-10-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: APL VIRGINIA - Container Ship / 2007-12-16 - 2008-03-19 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: CSAV PANAMBY - Container Ship / 2007-03-25 - 2007-08-06 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: PATRICIA SCHULTE - Container Ship / 2006-07-21 - 2006-12-09 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Glory - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-04-29 - 2010-08-10 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Glory - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-01-12 - 2010-01-23 (11 дней)
3rd Officer: Rudderman - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-11-09 - 2010-01-12 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Northern Spirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2009-08-18 - 2009-10-23 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Norient Star - Chemical tanker / 2009-03-14 - 2009-06-10 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Marsa Pride - Container Ship / 2024-04-16 - 2024-09-12 (5 месяцев)
Master: Pan GG - CONTAINER / 2024-02-04 - 2024-04-07 (2 месяца)
Master: PAN GG - Container Ship / 2023-10-03 - 2023-12-05 (2 месяца)
Master: PAN GG - Container Ship / 2023-09-14 - 2023-09-23 (9 дней)
Master: PAN GG - Container Ship / 2023-05-12 - 2023-07-23 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Vetra - LPG / LNG / 2024-05-10 - 2024-09-10 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Vetra - LPG / LNG / 2023-11-14 - 2024-01-20 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Danubegas - LPG / LNG / 2023-08-17 - 2023-11-13 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Dagmar - LPG / LNG / 2023-01-09 - 2023-05-31 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Gaschem Dollart - LPG / LNG / 2022-05-22 - 2022-10-26 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Satya - Chemical tanker / 2024-05-04 - 2024-09-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ata Beket - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-07-01 - 2023-12-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: YAZ - Chemical tanker / 2022-11-03 - 2023-03-02 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Astoria - Chemical tanker / 2022-06-07 - 2022-08-23 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: SIG - Chemical tanker / 2022-04-08 - 2022-05-23 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Sif W - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2024-05-20 - 2024-08-26 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: SIF W - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-12-05 - 2024-03-11 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: PERSEUS - Container Ship / 2023-06-13 - 2023-09-21 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: PERSEUS - Container Ship / 2022-10-02 - 2023-03-28 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: PERSEUS - Container Ship / 2022-02-09 - 2022-07-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Peyton Lynn C - Container Ship / 2024-04-20 - 2024-08-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Peyton Lynn C - Container Ship / 2023-07-17 - 2023-12-25 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Peyton Lynn C - Container Ship / 2022-11-24 - 2023-03-13 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Peyton Lynn C - Container Ship / 2022-01-10 - 2022-09-05 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Baltic Tern - Container Ship / 2021-03-22 - 2021-07-30 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Cielo di NewYork - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-04-29 - 2024-08-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Cielo Di Salerno - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-08-22 - 2024-01-29 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: High Voyager - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-01-25 - 2023-05-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: High Seas - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-17 - 2021-12-29 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: High Loyalty - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-04 - 2021-03-05 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Focha - General cargo / 2023-10-14 - 2024-08-09 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Focha - General cargo / 2021-10-11 - 2022-05-22 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Janet - General cargo / 2020-09-27 - 2021-05-14 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: WINSEN - General cargo / 2020-02-05 - 2020-07-15 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: MARIN - General cargo / 2016-12-15 - 2017-07-01 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: MONJASA SPRINTER - Chemical tanker / 2024-04-01 - 2024-08-06 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: MONJASA SPRINTER - Chemical tanker / 2023-09-02 - 2023-12-15 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: MONJASA TRADER - Chemical tanker / 2023-02-10 - 2023-05-24 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: MONJASA TRADER - Chemical tanker / 2022-06-05 - 2022-10-09 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: MONJASA TRADER - Chemical tanker / 2021-10-05 - 2022-01-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Golroo - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-03-12 - 2024-08-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Liwa-V - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-10-06 - 2024-02-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mezaira`a - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-03-12 - 2023-07-30 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Alkhtam - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-11-20 - 2022-06-22 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Harad - VLCC / 2020-06-03 - 2021-04-08 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Dmitry Mendeleev - LPG / LNG / 2024-05-31 - 2024-08-01 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Dmitry Mendeleev - LPG / LNG / 2021-06-01 - 2024-04-30 (2 года)
2nd Officer: Shturman Shcherbinin - Shuttle Tanker / 2021-04-02 - 2021-04-30 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Lagorta - Shuttle Tanker / 2021-02-01 - 2021-02-10 (9 дней)
2nd Officer: Lagorta - Shuttle Tanker / 2018-11-07 - 2021-01-31 (2 года)
Chief Officer: World Perfomance - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-03-22 - 2024-07-24 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: STI Finchley - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-07-10 - 2023-11-05 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: STI Finchley - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-09-16 - 2023-02-12 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: STI Finchley - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-12-04 - 2022-04-23 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: STI Excellence - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-19 - 2021-09-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Manisa Sofia - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2024-03-14 - 2024-07-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Manisa Sofia - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-08-04 - 2023-11-07 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Manisa Sofia - General cargo / 2023-05-25 - 2023-08-03 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: MANISA STAR - General cargo / 2022-08-19 - 2023-01-20 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Kadri - General cargo / 2021-12-12 - 2022-04-14 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Merita - General cargo / 2024-04-30 - 2024-07-13 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Merita - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-10-29 - 2024-01-12 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Merita - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-10-11 - 2023-10-28 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Merita - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-04-04 - 2023-06-06 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Merita - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-12-10 - 2023-02-10 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: CMA CGM CALLAO - Container Ship / 2024-02-27 - 2024-07-12 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: MSC Tiphaine II - Container Ship / 2023-01-27 - 2023-08-12 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: MSC Katalin 2 - Container Ship / 2022-02-20 - 2022-09-15 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Swedish Streem - Reefer / 2021-09-18 - 2022-01-20 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Water Phoenix - Reefer / 2020-12-27 - 2021-04-27 (4 месяца)