Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Voorneborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-05-23 - 2016-07-26 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Voorneborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-03-16 - 2016-05-23 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Flevoborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-06-25 - 2015-11-29 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Victoriaborg - General cargo / 2014-11-21 - 2015-03-21 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Marfaam - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-07-30 - 2014-10-11 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: SANTA URSULA - Container Ship / 2016-05-16 - 2016-07-25 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: SANTA CRUZ - Container Ship / 2013-06-30 - 2013-10-09 (3 месяца)
Master: MAERSK NOLANVILLE - Container Ship / 2011-09-15 - 2011-10-21 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: MAERSK STRALSUND - Container Ship / 2010-12-23 - 2011-05-08 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: MAERSK SEOUL - Container Ship / 2010-09-06 - 2010-09-26 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Rawabi 15 - AHTS / 2016-03-29 - 2016-07-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Rawabi 11R - AHTS / 2015-06-30 - 2015-12-18 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Rawabi 13 - AHTS / 2014-06-24 - 2014-12-03 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Rawabi 16 - AHTS / 2013-10-24 - 2014-04-11 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Sv.Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2012-06-22 - 2013-05-23 (11 месяцев)
Master: SFL EUROPA - Container Ship / 2016-07-04 - 2016-10-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: SFL EUROPA - Container Ship / 2016-03-20 - 2016-07-03 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: SAN FERNANDO - Container Ship / 2015-08-09 - 2015-12-13 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: SAN FERNANDO - Container Ship / 2015-01-06 - 2015-04-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: SFL FALCON - Container Ship / 2014-01-27 - 2014-06-02 (4 месяца)
Master: ALMUNTAZAH - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-04-12 - 2020-06-28 (3 месяца)
Master: ROSCHEM-2 - Chemical tanker / 2020-01-20 - 2020-04-11 (3 месяца)
Master: POLKOVNIK FESENKO V.K. - Dry Cargo / 2018-07-07 - 2019-07-04 (12 месяцев)
Master: POLKOVNIK FESENKO V.K. - Dry Cargo / 2017-09-27 - 2018-04-17 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: CREDO - Dry Cargo / 2016-03-01 - 2016-07-01 (4 месяца)
Master: Kapitan Dranitsyn - Icebreaker / 2016-06-20 - 2016-07-14 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Kapitan Dranitsyn - Icebreaker / 2015-12-06 - 2016-06-19 (6 месяцев)
Master: Kapitan Dranitsyn - Icebreaker / 2015-06-20 - 2015-08-02 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Kapitan Dranitsyn - Icebreaker / 2014-12-01 - 2015-06-13 (6 месяцев)
Master: Kapitan Dranitsyn - Icebreaker / 2014-06-21 - 2014-09-05 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Venetiko - Container Ship / 2016-04-07 - 2016-05-17 (1 месяц)
3rd Officer: Sealand Washington - Container Ship / 2015-07-21 - 2016-01-23 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Lady of Luck - Container Ship / 2015-01-14 - 2015-03-30 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Bella J - Container Ship / 2014-10-07 - 2015-01-13 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Taurus - Dry Cargo / 2013-11-02 - 2014-03-24 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: NPCC SAADIAYT - AHT / 2016-03-05 - 2016-05-10 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: NPCC SAADIAYT - AHT / 2015-09-23 - 2015-12-15 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: NPCC YAS - AHT / 2015-05-23 - 2015-07-31 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: NPCC SAADIAYT - AHT / 2015-02-22 - 2015-04-22 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: NARWHAL - AHTS / 2014-10-05 - 2014-11-14 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Max Carrier - Container Ship / 2015-12-11 - 2016-05-02 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: X-Press Tigris - Container Ship / 2014-10-25 - 2015-02-26 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Chief - Container Ship / 2013-06-21 - 2013-11-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Merian - Container Ship / 2012-09-28 - 2013-02-02 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Macuba - Container Ship / 2012-02-11 - 2012-06-05 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Omskiy-117 - General cargo / 2015-12-09 - 2016-04-29 (5 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Bourbon Liberty 241 - AHTS / 2015-06-11 - 2015-09-13 (3 месяца)
AB Seaman: Bourbon Liberty 315 - AHTS / 2014-10-23 - 2015-01-09 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Winterfell - General cargo / 2014-06-18 - 2014-10-16 (4 месяца)
AB Seaman: Azeri Gas - LPG / LNG / 2013-09-16 - 2014-02-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Leon - Chemical tanker / 2015-12-03 - 2016-04-16 (4 месяца)
Master: Norvarg - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-09-22 - 2014-10-02 (10 дней)
Master: Norvarg - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-01-05 - 2014-05-23 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Norvarg - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-05-18 - 2013-08-29 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Norvarg - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-07-16 - 2012-10-29 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Simona - General cargo / 2015-12-14 - 2016-04-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Goodness - General cargo / 2015-08-01 - 2015-12-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Goodness - General cargo / 2014-08-07 - 2015-04-15 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Neptune - General cargo / 2013-10-18 - 2014-05-27 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Corvus - Dry Cargo / 2012-12-27 - 2013-09-30 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Triades - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-19 - 2016-04-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Starway - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-19 - 2015-02-02 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: AMUR 2527 - Dry Cargo / 2014-04-07 - 2014-07-24 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: C.ENDEAVOUR - Coaster / 2014-01-23 - 2014-02-10 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: NIKAT - Bulk Carrier / 2007-06-06 - 2007-07-29 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: TROITSKIY BRIDGE - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-11-22 - 2016-03-22 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: TROITSKIY BRIDGE - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-02-16 - 2015-06-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: TRANSSIB BRIDGE - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-05-14 - 2014-11-10 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BERING SEA - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-02-21 - 2013-07-09 (1 год)
Chief Officer: AZOV SEA - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-10-22 - 2012-04-07 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sea Cheetah - AHTS / 2015-12-14 - 2016-03-10 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Sea Jaguar - AHTS / 2015-06-29 - 2015-08-28 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Sea Jaguar - AHTS / 2015-03-11 - 2015-05-06 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Sea Jaguar - AHTS / 2014-11-17 - 2015-01-16 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Bourbon Liberty 319 - AHTS / 2014-06-20 - 2014-08-30 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Coneste - Container Ship / 2017-06-19 - 2017-10-31 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Samskip Endeavour - Container Ship / 2016-08-12 - 2016-12-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: BIANCA RAMBOW - Container Ship / 2015-12-07 - 2016-03-07 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: BIANCA RAMBOW - Container Ship / 2015-07-20 - 2015-10-05 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: HENNEKE RAMBOW - Container Ship / 2014-10-28 - 2015-03-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Baltic Trader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-01-11 - 2016-03-01 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Baltic Trader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-11-14 - 2015-12-20 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Baltic Trader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-09-11 - 2015-10-22 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Baltic Trader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-09-11 - 2014-12-20 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Baltic Trader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-03-19 - 2014-05-04 (1 месяц)
Master: CAMILLA - Container Ship / 2017-12-15 - 2018-07-25 (7 месяцев)
Master: CAMILLA - Container Ship / 2016-12-23 - 2017-05-25 (5 месяцев)
Master: URSULA - Container Ship / 2016-03-16 - 2016-07-29 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: FIONA - Container Ship / 2015-09-06 - 2016-02-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SAGITTA - Container Ship / 2014-11-14 - 2015-04-03 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: JRS Merkur - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-08-28 - 2016-01-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: JRS Merkur - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-12-21 - 2015-04-26 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: JRS Mira - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-01-28 - 2014-06-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: JRS Mira - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-06-03 - 2013-10-08 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: JRS Merkur - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-05-12 - 2013-01-24 (8 месяцев)
Master: Pyotr Gusenkov - Reefer / 2017-06-08 - 2017-10-06 (4 месяца)
Master: Markus - General cargo / 2017-04-04 - 2017-06-07 (2 месяца)
Master: Markus - General cargo / 2016-10-23 - 2017-02-02 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Frio Vladivostok - Reefer / 2014-03-03 - 2014-09-21 (7 месяцев)