Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Deck Cadet: Golar Kelvin - LPG / LNG / 2022-08-09 - 2023-01-07 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Golar Celsius - LPG / LNG / 2021-09-12 - 2022-04-09 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Zim Luanda - Container Ship / 2022-01-09 - 2022-11-15 (10 месяцев)
OS: Charleston - Container Ship / 2020-11-14 - 2021-06-21 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Clipper Talent - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-02 - 2022-08-14 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: ESL America - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-08-31 - 2021-12-07 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: rayen - Container Ship / 2021-09-16 - 2022-05-31 (8 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: barzin - Container Ship / 2020-01-20 - 2020-12-15 (11 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MT.TIGER TENACITY - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-18 - 2022-05-26 (11 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: M/T ATLANTIC EAGLE - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-11 - 2022-03-28 (9 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: M/T MARLIN MAGIC - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-08-17 - 2020-03-02 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: LPG/C LUBERSAC - LPG / LNG / 2018-03-21 - 2018-10-01 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: UTRISH - Tug boat / 2019-09-02 - 2022-01-19 (2 года)
Chief Officer: GZS-1 - Other vessels / 2019-05-01 - 2019-06-15 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: LEO-1 - General cargo / 2017-09-12 - 2018-01-17 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: NIKOLAY GAMAYUNOV - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-01 - 2017-07-10 (3 месяца)
OS: FRONT COMMODORE - VLCC / 2008-05-13 - 2008-11-13 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Sea icon - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-22 - 2021-12-12 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Mv Monica P - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-12 - 2021-06-21 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Unity Spirit - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-16 - 2023-11-13 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Glovis Melody - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-14 - 2022-07-22 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Global Prime - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-21 - 2021-05-13 (10 месяцев)
OS: Thanasis - Chemical tanker / 2020-08-19 - 2021-03-03 (6 месяцев)
OS: REYD 10 - Dry Cargo / 2019-07-02 - 2019-11-30 (5 месяцев)
OS: Nevskiy 23 - General cargo / 2016-05-11 - 2016-11-08 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: SKS MOSEL - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-10-18 - 2020-08-31 (10 месяцев)
2nd Officer: TB Marina 32 - Tug boat / 2019-11-20 - 2020-07-16 (8 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: KM Indah Fajar - General cargo / 2018-01-08 - 2019-01-14 (1 год)
3rd Officer: Goldeneye - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-13 - 2019-10-06 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Hawk 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-26 - 2019-02-16 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: M.V. JAG AARATI - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-05 - 2019-05-15 (8 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: M.T. JAG LEELA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-11-17 - 2017-11-19 (2 дня)
Junior officer: mt Leon Hermes - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-06-05 - 2018-11-04 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: mt Leon Hermes - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-05-06 - 2018-06-05 (1 месяц)
OS: mv Hazar - General cargo / 2017-08-15 - 2018-01-22 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: mv Hazar - General cargo / 2016-10-20 - 2017-04-16 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: MT.RAHMAT - Bunkering Vessel / 2016-02-15 - 2020-09-30 (4 года)
3rd Officer: DEEPWATER ASGARD - Drilling platform / 2014-01-09 - 2015-01-22 (1 год)
2nd Officer: Katerina - Dry Cargo / 2012-01-24 - 2012-07-06 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Kirklareli - Bulk Carrier / 2011-01-28 - 2011-07-30 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Mykola Slavov - Bulk Carrier / 2010-07-01 - 2010-10-15 (3 месяца)
OS: Conqueror - Bulk Carrier / 2008-06-15 - 2009-02-16 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Patria - Bulk Carrier / 0010-12-25 - 0026-12-25 (16 лет)
2nd Officer: Stride - Container Ship / 0014-08-25 - 0017-09-25 (3 года)
3rd Officer: Express Black Sea - Container Ship / 0001-01-23 - 0008-08-23 (7 лет)
2nd Officer: Progress C - Container Ship / 0031-01-26 - 0008-07-26 (22 года)
3rd Officer: Oranjeborg - RO-RO / 2024-04-17 - 2024-09-10 (5 месяцев)