Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
3rd Officer: CROWN TOPAZ - Reefer / 2023-02-15 - 2023-11-01 (9 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Mv Karunia Gemilang II - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-21 - 2023-09-22 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Tirrta samudra XIX - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-04 - 2022-08-08 (2 года)
2nd Officer: City of Westminster - Dredger / 2024-04-19 - 2024-05-15 (1 месяц)
3rd Officer: Wind Star - Passenger vessel / 2023-06-01 - 2023-09-10 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Wind Surf - Passenger vessel / 2022-11-23 - 2023-03-07 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: HAMMER - General cargo / 2023-04-21 - 2023-05-29 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: MERIOS - Container Ship / 2023-01-20 - 2023-03-07 (1 месяц)
3rd Officer: JABRAYIL DOVLATZADEH - Chemical tanker / 2022-04-16 - 2022-09-10 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: VIKA - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-08 - 2022-02-02 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: BIRTE SELMER - Bulk Carrier / 2022-04-10 - 2022-10-22 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: aries - Dry Cargo / 2021-11-01 - 2022-02-01 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: aries - General cargo / 2020-10-16 - 2021-08-16 (10 месяцев)
2nd Officer: aries - General cargo / 2020-03-01 - 2020-09-01 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Port Kyushu - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-24 - 2022-05-28 (8 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Port Estrela - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-25 - 2021-02-21 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Universal Barcelona - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-26 - 2019-06-27 (7 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Universal Barcelona - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-12 - 2018-04-09 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Kashan - Container Ship / 2021-05-24 - 2021-11-25 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: GRANIT - Tug boat / 2021-09-01 - 2021-10-30 (2 месяца)
Deck Cadet: NEPTUNE HORIZON - RO-RO / 2021-04-29 - 2021-08-28 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: NEPTUNE ITHAKI - RO-RO / 2020-07-21 - 2021-01-14 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: OCTOPUS - Tug boat / 2019-07-02 - 2019-09-03 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Silver Gwen - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-24 - 2021-10-14 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Rose M - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-18 - 2020-06-29 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Rose m - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-10-06 - 2019-02-16 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Alpine Duke - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-11-02 - 2016-06-08 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Vasiliy Poleshchuk - Reefer / 2020-12-09 - 2021-08-30 (9 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MT LADY VIK - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-08 - 2021-07-10 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: MT-UNDINE - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-18 - 2020-11-18 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Wislaborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-02-16 - 2021-06-27 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Amurborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-06-10 - 2020-10-04 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Amurborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-09-07 - 2020-01-08 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Vechtborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-08-01 - 2018-12-16 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Mt oluwaseun - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-29 - 2020-12-01 (10 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Gaz Serenity - LPG / LNG / 2020-05-20 - 2020-09-21 (4 месяца)
Junior officer: Gaz Imperial - LPG / LNG / 2019-08-27 - 2020-01-18 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Seagas Governor - LPG / LNG / 2018-04-23 - 2019-01-08 (9 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: TSV "Druzhba" - Sailing Vessel / 2020-07-20 - 2020-08-16 (1 месяц)
3rd Officer: Nordic London - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-07 - 2019-11-04 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Nordic Beijing - Container Ship / 2018-06-26 - 2018-10-19 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Nordic Stockholm - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-15 - 2018-04-18 (3 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Sapura Topazio - Pipe laying vessel / 2018-06-30 - 2019-10-03 (1 год)
Deck Cadet: Vicente Pinzon - Container Ship / 2017-08-01 - 2017-10-01 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mangystau-3 - Tug boat / 2021-12-24 - 2023-05-12 (1 год)
2nd Officer: Mangystau-3 - Tug boat / 2019-03-16 - 2021-12-23 (2 года)
3rd Officer: Mangystau-3 - Tug boat / 2017-01-15 - 2019-03-15 (2 года)
AB Seaman: mv GULF PEARL - Well-stimulation vessel / 2018-02-01 - 2018-08-26 (7 месяцев)
AB Seaman: mv Mecta S - General cargo / 2014-08-30 - 2015-03-31 (7 месяцев)