Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
2nd Officer: SHEILA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-02 - 2019-05-27 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: M/V ANOGYRA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-03 - 2018-09-03 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ELISA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-11 - 2017-11-17 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ELISA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-19 - 2017-03-02 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: M/V ELSABETH C - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-13 - 2016-03-31 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: DAY - Dry Cargo / 2017-06-28 - 2017-11-14 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: SNL Colombo - Container Ship / 2015-05-05 - 2015-09-19 (4 месяца)
OS: Monika Muller - Cement Carrier / 2014-09-20 - 2015-04-02 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ED-2 - Dredger / 2014-04-10 - 2014-12-10 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Antoine - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-15 - 2016-01-06 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Kaimoku - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-20 - 2015-04-20 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: GORA - Bulk Carrier / 2014-04-04 - 2014-08-14 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: AK Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2013-07-15 - 2014-01-09 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Kalga - General cargo / 2013-01-04 - 2013-04-27 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: GATUN - General cargo / 2009-10-16 - 2010-01-21 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Sea Power - General cargo / 2009-05-08 - 2009-10-16 (5 месяцев)
Junior officer: Leone - Oil Products Tanker / 2007-07-11 - 2008-02-16 (7 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Strofades 2 - RO-RO / 2005-02-21 - 2005-06-11 (4 месяца)
No Experience
2nd Officer: CAP BLANCHE - Container Ship / 2010-10-21 - 2011-02-26 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: CAP BLANCHE - Container Ship / 2010-02-26 - 2010-06-27 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: CAP BLANCHE - Container Ship / 2009-04-23 - 2009-08-18 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: CAP PASADO - Container Ship / 2008-07-25 - 2009-01-13 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MAI - Fishing vessel / 2006-04-04 - 2006-08-05 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Vivit thuban - LPG / LNG / 2023-11-25 - 2024-04-12 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Vivit thuban - LPG / LNG / 2023-01-06 - 2023-07-06 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: VIVIT THUBAN - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-03-18 - 2022-07-22 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: VIVIT THUBAN - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-14 - 2021-12-01 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MT Sinar Minahasa - Chemical tanker / 2023-09-14 - 2024-03-13 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Venus Glory - LPG / LNG / 2023-11-05 - 2024-03-05 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Iris Glory - LPG / LNG / 2023-04-05 - 2023-08-30 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Navigator Pegasus - LPG / LNG / 2022-08-05 - 2022-12-09 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Ronald N - LPG / LNG / 2021-09-01 - 2022-03-19 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Mehmet Aga - General cargo / 2023-02-11 - 2023-08-23 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Bers - General cargo / 2022-04-19 - 2022-10-14 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: PACIFIC ENDEAVOUR - Heavy lift vessel / 2023-06-22 - 2023-07-23 (1 месяц)
Junior officer: ZAGREB - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-02 - 2022-11-27 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Sakar - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-07 - 2021-09-30 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Khadzhibey - Passenger vessel / 2020-08-10 - 2021-02-16 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: mt blue stars - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-07-08 - 2023-06-21 (11 месяцев)
Master: mt golden sea - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-30 - 2022-07-07 (1 месяц)
Deck Cadet: mv andhika kanishka - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-08 - 2021-08-12 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: mt sun live - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-10 - 2021-01-12 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Pazifik - LPG / LNG / 2022-12-20 - 2023-04-11 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Pazifik - LPG / LNG / 2022-03-19 - 2022-08-10 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Pazifik - LPG / LNG / 2021-06-26 - 2021-11-12 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Polar - LPG / LNG / 2020-06-27 - 2020-10-27 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Yara Kara - LPG / LNG / 2019-09-14 - 2019-12-10 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Gheba - Chemical tanker / 2022-10-12 - 2023-02-18 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: MISS PEGGY - General cargo / 2022-01-28 - 2022-09-25 (8 месяцев)
AB Seaman: MISS PEGGY - General cargo / 2021-07-09 - 2022-01-27 (7 месяцев)
OS: Catherine Bright - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-11 - 2021-03-29 (8 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Gandini - Shuttle Tanker / 2021-12-14 - 2022-09-24 (9 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Nusa Merdeka - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-09-10 - 2021-08-12 (1 год)
Safety Officer: Jumbo Javelin - Construction vessel / 2023-10-02 - 2023-12-02 (2 месяца)
Safety Officer: Yacht Servant - Semi-submersible platform / 2023-04-09 - 2023-06-29 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Speyk - General cargo / 2022-11-30 - 2023-02-10 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Krakesandt - Dredger / 2022-07-07 - 2022-08-25 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Fairmaster - Construction vessel / 2022-02-21 - 2022-06-11 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Nabucco - Chemical tanker / 2022-11-06 - 2023-01-07 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Nabucco - Chemical tanker / 2022-07-04 - 2022-09-07 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Verdi - Chemical tanker / 2022-03-14 - 2022-05-09 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Verdi - Chemical tanker / 2021-11-17 - 2022-01-13 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Verdi - Chemical tanker / 2021-07-19 - 2021-09-22 (2 месяца)
AB Seaman: MSC SUEZ - Container Ship / 2021-09-19 - 2022-04-01 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: EEMS Traveller - General cargo / 2021-07-29 - 2022-02-20 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: EEMS Traveller - General cargo / 2020-11-03 - 2021-03-14 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: EEMS Traveller - General cargo / 2019-12-03 - 2020-05-30 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Asvira - General cargo / 2019-08-20 - 2019-10-28 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Asvira - General cargo / 2019-02-10 - 2019-07-13 (5 месяцев)