Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Engineer: Azov - Reefer / 2011-09-22 - 2012-03-28 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Pusan Reefer - Reefer / 2011-02-15 - 2011-09-06 (7 months)
2nd Engineer: ALIMAR - Bulk Carrier / 2010-09-18 - 2011-06-03 (9 months)
Stewardess: Ferrety 550 - Yacht / 2010-06-03 - 2010-09-02 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Borçalı. Palchem. и. т. д. - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-05-23 - 2009-11-24 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Front Champion - VLCC / 2008-01-19 - 2008-08-19 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Patria - Bulk Carrier / 0010-12-25 - 0026-12-25 (16 years)
2nd Officer: Stride - Container Ship / 0014-08-25 - 0017-09-25 (3 years)
3rd Officer: Express Black Sea - Container Ship / 0001-01-23 - 0008-08-23 (7 years)
2nd Officer: Progress C - Container Ship / 0031-01-26 - 0008-07-26 (22 years)
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience