Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Habjibey - Yacht / 2016-02-12 - 2016-04-13 (2 months)
Master: Moen Island - Container Ship / 2015-11-29 - 2016-04-07 (4 months)
Master: Ulsnis - Container Ship / 2015-05-10 - 2015-08-07 (3 months)
Master: Glueksburg - Container Ship / 2015-01-23 - 2015-03-20 (2 months)
Master: Falshoeft - General cargo / 2014-08-14 - 2014-11-07 (3 months)
Master: Lindaunis - Container Ship / 2014-03-24 - 2014-07-18 (4 months)
OS: KHADJIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2015-12-16 - 2016-02-19 (2 months)
Motorman: URSULA - Container Ship / 2015-08-05 - 2016-01-19 (5 months)
Boatswain: Norne - AHTS / 2013-04-01 - 2015-10-03 (2 years)
Motorman-electrician: Kados - General cargo / 2014-11-14 - 2015-05-29 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: ZENA C - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-11 - 2015-03-16 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: MATISSE - Bulk Carrier / 2013-11-12 - 2014-04-14 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: MATISSE - Bulk Carrier / 2013-01-20 - 2013-07-05 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: AFRICAN STAR - Bulk Carrier / 2012-10-10 - 2012-12-20 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: MATISSE - Bulk Carrier / 2012-02-11 - 2012-07-14 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: m/t TEC-1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-09-15 - 2015-02-23 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: m/v Grif - Other vessels / 2013-08-21 - 2013-09-19 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: m/t Tur - Icebreaker / 2012-04-21 - 2013-01-27 (9 months)
Motorman: ttert - Chemical tanker / 2014-05-05 - 2014-09-11 (4 months)
Motorman: RED TIAL - Chemical tanker / 2014-01-07 - 2014-07-09 (6 months)
Motorman: JUPITER - Chemical tanker / 2013-03-05 - 2013-08-21 (6 months)
Cook: eurogalaxy - General cargo / 2014-03-01 - 2014-07-24 (5 months)
Mess Boy: dry cargo - Bulk Carrier / 2012-03-07 - 2012-08-23 (6 months)
Messman: Tess - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-01-08 - 2014-06-08 (5 months)
Cook: Работа на берегу в ресторанной сфере - Training Ship / 2008-02-15 - 2013-02-09 (4 years)
Engine Cadet: НВС - Other vessels / 2014-04-28 - 2014-06-06 (1 month)
OS: Pintail - Bulk Carrier / 2013-06-24 - 2014-03-25 (9 months)
OS: Le Diamont - Cruise Liner / 2013-11-04 - 2013-11-27 (1 month)
OS: Stark - Bulk Carrier / 2012-09-09 - 2013-02-28 (6 months)
OS: Yeditepe - Bulk Carrier / 2012-03-07 - 2013-03-24 (1 year)
OS: OSHEN WEY - Crane vessel / 2012-02-12 - 2012-11-18 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Sborshik-401 - Bunkering Vessel / 2012-06-26 - 2012-08-31 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Katerina - Dry Cargo / 2012-01-24 - 2012-07-06 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Kirklareli - Bulk Carrier / 2011-01-28 - 2011-07-30 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Mykola Slavov - Bulk Carrier / 2010-07-01 - 2010-10-15 (3 months)
OS: Conqueror - Bulk Carrier / 2008-06-15 - 2009-02-16 (8 months)