Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Officer: Sombeke - LPG / LNG / 2013-01-01 - 2013-05-05 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Libramont - LPG / LNG / 2012-02-03 - 2012-02-15 (12 days)
Deck Cadet: Neptune Okeanis - RO-RO / 2007-03-14 - 2007-08-29 (5 months)
AB / Welder: ddddddddddddd - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-01 - 2013-05-04 (3 days)
Motorman: Konstruktor Baybakov - Fishing vessel / 2013-01-25 - 2013-04-27 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Vega - Dry Cargo / 2013-01-18 - 2013-03-20 (2 months)
Motorman: m/v OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2012-09-01 - 2013-02-22 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v Tur - Tug boat / 2011-06-04 - 2011-12-29 (7 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Vale Max - Bulk Carrier / 2010-07-08 - 2012-07-10 (2 years)
Engine Cadet: Brigalir - Other vessels / 2011-05-04 - 2011-07-18 (2 months)
Cook: Caledonia - Ferry / 2007-08-30 - 2010-12-30 (3 years)
OS: Calisha - Fishing vessel / 2010-08-28 - 2010-10-19 (2 months)
Master: Warnow Porpoise - Container Ship / 2009-02-13 - 2009-06-18 (4 months)
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
Fitter / Welder: Shipyard - Bulk Carrier / 2007-09-01 - 2009-05-20 (1 year)
Fitter / Welder: Shipyard - Bulk Carrier / 2004-04-17 - 2006-02-03 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Afican sea - RO-RO / 2005-04-20 - 2005-11-11 (7 months)
Buffet Steward: R5 Blue Dream - Cruise Liner / 2004-03-01 - 2004-06-01 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Капитан Кононов - Fishing vessel / 2002-06-13 - 2003-01-20 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Капитан Горбачёв - Fishing vessel / 2001-05-08 - 2001-11-10 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Заволжск - Fishing vessel / 2000-12-04 - 2001-04-06 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Профессор Миняев - Dry Cargo / 1989-04-12 - 1989-07-10 (3 months)