Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB-Cook: MV BHJ Express - Container Ship / 2013-11-10 - 2014-09-18 (10 months)
OS: alessandra 1 - General cargo / 2014-07-14 - 2014-08-28 (1 month)
OS: himalai - Passenger vessel / 2006-04-01 - 2006-09-01 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Energy Chancellor - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-03-13 - 2014-08-23 (5 months)
Waiter: MSC SPLENDIDA - Cruise Liner / 2013-12-10 - 2014-08-06 (8 months)
OS: Burun - Tug boat / 2014-06-20 - 2014-07-03 (13 days)
Deck Cadet: Spring - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-02-17 - 2014-04-19 (2 months)
AB / Welder: ljkhkl - Chemical tanker / 2014-01-10 - 2014-06-18 (5 months)
AB Seaman: africa 23 - Chemical tanker / 2014-01-01 - 2014-05-14 (4 months)
Cook: OCTOPUS - Tug boat / 2013-06-24 - 2014-02-22 (8 months)
Cook: FEOFAN SHOKHIREV - General cargo / 2012-04-17 - 2012-08-14 (4 months)
Cook: fauna - General cargo / 2010-11-26 - 2011-05-26 (6 months)
Cook: EFTIHIA - Dry Cargo / 2009-09-10 - 2010-05-06 (8 months)
Fitter / Welder: CARNIVAL DESTINY - Cruise Liner / 2013-02-21 - 2013-11-14 (9 months)
Fitter / Welder: CARNIVAL DESTINY - Cruise Liner / 2013-02-21 - 2013-11-14 (9 months)
Fitter / Welder: CARNIVAL DESTINY - Cruise Liner / 2013-02-21 - 2013-11-14 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: Ice Hawk - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-05-17 - 2013-09-17 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: DON - Offshore Supply vessel / 2012-06-18 - 2012-12-18 (6 months)
Motorman: ПМР-183 - Repair Vessel / 2010-02-22 - 2010-04-22 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Swiber Torunn - AHTS / 2012-12-01 - 2013-02-10 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: "Khadzhibey" - Passenger vessel / 2012-10-03 - 2013-01-15 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: "Khadzhibey" - Passenger vessel / 2012-08-02 - 2012-10-02 (2 months)
Electrician: Cristin - Bulk Carrier / 2012-11-21 - 2013-01-14 (2 months)
Electrician: Sider Poros - Bulk Carrier / 2012-06-14 - 2012-08-26 (2 months)
Electrician: ACM Delta - Container Ship / 2011-05-08 - 2011-12-28 (8 months)
Electrician: Lemeshev - Bulk Carrier / 2010-04-27 - 2010-11-18 (7 months)
Motorman: SZ-503 - Dredger / 2012-06-13 - 2012-11-07 (5 months)
Motorman: ekaterina - General cargo / 2012-01-12 - 2012-05-16 (4 months)
Motorman: krishna deva raya 1 - Dredger / 2011-06-14 - 2011-10-07 (4 months)
Motorman: stepanida - General cargo / 2009-11-30 - 2010-06-25 (7 months)
Motorman: dynay - Dredger / 2009-05-22 - 2009-11-27 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Seaboxer - Container Ship / 2012-04-06 - 2012-05-14 (1 month)
Motorman-electrician: Trader - General cargo / 2011-12-07 - 2012-03-13 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Azov - Fishing vessel / 2011-03-20 - 2011-07-22 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Gorizont - Training Ship / 2011-01-13 - 2011-03-11 (2 months)
OS: Kerchensky-2 - Ferry / 2012-03-04 - 2012-05-07 (2 months)
OS: AMALIA - General cargo / 2009-07-07 - 2010-01-15 (6 months)
OS: MV STAR ONE - General cargo / 2008-07-08 - 2009-07-07 (12 months)
AB Seaman: Кабаргин - Passenger vessel / 2009-06-30 - 2009-10-04 (3 months)
Motorman: Святая Русь - Passenger vessel / 2008-04-08 - 2008-10-31 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Tase - General cargo / 2008-09-01 - 2009-03-01 (6 months)
Motorman: Al-Mansoor 1 - General cargo / 2008-07-30 - 2009-02-05 (6 months)
Motorman: AL-MANSOOR-1 - General cargo / 2008-08-02 - 2009-02-05 (6 months)