Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Ocean Pride - RO-RO / 2016-12-24 - 2017-06-06 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: ship tug - Tug boat / 2017-03-26 - 2017-05-26 (2 months)
Motorman: BOSCO GILAN - General cargo / 2016-09-16 - 2017-05-22 (8 months)
Motorman: STARDALE - General cargo / 2015-06-16 - 2016-01-13 (7 months)
Motorman: MYKOLA BOBROYNYKOV - General cargo / 2013-05-24 - 2014-03-10 (9 months)
Motorman: Babilon - General cargo / 2016-08-26 - 2017-05-14 (9 months)
Motorman: Graf Voroncov - Fishing vessel / 2015-12-25 - 2016-04-02 (3 months)
AB Seaman: NEREUS - General cargo / 2016-05-20 - 2017-04-29 (11 months)
OS: TIRAS - General cargo / 2013-12-24 - 2014-05-15 (5 months)
OS: Skylark - General cargo / 2013-04-29 - 2013-07-22 (3 months)
OS: Martyn Laeys - General cargo / 2011-02-10 - 2011-08-17 (6 months)
OS: Semen Rudnev - General cargo / 2010-08-30 - 2010-12-28 (4 months)
Electrician: Neshat - General cargo / 2016-07-20 - 2017-01-28 (6 months)
Steward: Marco Polo - Passenger vessel / 2016-06-16 - 2017-01-05 (7 months)
Steward: Berlin - Passenger vessel / 2014-08-08 - 2015-02-15 (6 months)
Steward: MSC Poesia - Passenger vessel / 2013-05-23 - 2014-02-05 (8 months)
Steward: Aegean Paradise - Passenger vessel / 2012-05-19 - 2012-10-03 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2016-08-01 - 2017-01-01 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2015-06-22 - 2015-07-17 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Northern Decision - Container Ship / 2016-06-22 - 2016-11-10 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Northern Vivacity - Container Ship / 2015-11-18 - 2016-03-19 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Northern Practise - Container Ship / 2015-04-18 - 2015-09-11 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Horizon Electra - Chemical tanker / 2016-10-01 - 2016-10-28 (1 month)
2nd Engineer: DON REEFER - Reefer / 2015-12-23 - 2016-08-30 (8 months)
2nd Engineer: BOULIS - Dry Cargo / 2012-05-07 - 2012-08-13 (3 months)
Electric Cadet: Brigadir Koviza - Crane vessel / 2016-06-21 - 2016-08-10 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: MAGELANA - General cargo / 2015-09-07 - 2016-05-06 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: LEDA - General cargo / 2015-06-11 - 2015-08-30 (3 months)
El. Engineer: MOMA - RO-RO / 2015-06-24 - 2015-11-14 (5 months)
El. Engineer: Генадий Водолазский - Reefer / 2015-01-18 - 2015-06-19 (5 months)
El. Engineer: Орион - Reefer / 2014-07-01 - 2014-11-19 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Stinnes Passat - General cargo / 2015-08-30 - 2015-11-01 (2 months)
Motorman: BBC Ganges - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-01-18 - 2015-07-16 (6 months)
Motorman: Vela - General cargo / 2012-01-20 - 2012-06-11 (5 months)
Motorman: Minotaur - tanker / 2011-10-11 - 2011-12-31 (3 months)
Motorman: GRAFF - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-26 - 2015-01-15 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Александр Житник - General cargo / 2014-09-15 - 2014-12-24 (3 months)