Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Engineer: Santa Bella - Bulk Carrier / 2015-11-10 - 2016-01-30 (3 months)
Pumpman: Matilda - Chemical tanker / 2014-02-20 - 2014-11-15 (9 months)
Activities Supervisor: Fair Player - Heavy lift vessel / 2012-10-09 - 2013-04-15 (6 months)
Cook: Volga-4006 - Dry Cargo / 2015-07-08 - 2015-11-27 (5 months)
Cook: Pal-6 - Dry Cargo / 2012-08-03 - 2013-07-27 (12 months)
AB-Cook: Volgobaде 225 - Dry Cargo / 2010-03-03 - 2012-11-15 (2 years)
Cook: Gloriya - Dry Cargo / 2011-02-10 - 2011-04-14 (2 months)
Cook: Volgo-balt 225 - Dry Cargo / 2010-01-07 - 2010-11-18 (10 months)
DP Officer: Bourbon Liverty 241 - AHTS / 2015-09-10 - 2015-11-10 (2 months)
DP Officer: Bourbon Liberty 241 - AHTS / 2015-05-15 - 2015-07-03 (2 months)
DP Officer: Bourbon Liberty 241 - AHTS / 2015-02-06 - 2015-03-27 (2 months)
Junior DP Officer: Bourbon Liberty 303 - AHTS / 2014-10-15 - 2014-12-09 (2 months)
AB Seaman: HALONG BAY - General cargo / 2015-03-20 - 2015-11-04 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: juiiii - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-08 - 2015-10-23 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: ghhjk - Bulk Carrier / 2013-03-14 - 2015-06-11 (2 years)
3rd Engineer: giihkj - Fishing vessel / 2012-04-12 - 2015-04-04 (2 years)
4th Engineer: Tinkeer - RO-RO / 2010-01-30 - 2010-06-13 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Portoroz - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-18 - 2015-07-12 (1 month)
OS: т/х«Капитан Глушко» - толкач -бускир 2-031177 - Other vessels / 2015-05-02 - 2015-06-03 (1 month)
OS: Genuya - Passenger vessel / 2015-01-19 - 2015-03-20 (2 months)
OS: BLACK WOOD - General cargo / 2014-04-22 - 2014-10-16 (6 months)
OS: BLACK WOOD - General cargo / 2013-07-18 - 2014-01-09 (6 months)
OS: Taganrogskiy Zaliv - Reefer / 2011-12-06 - 2012-05-25 (6 months)
OS: ZEFYROS - Reefer / 2011-07-06 - 2011-09-02 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Новая земля - Dry Cargo / 2014-02-05 - 2014-09-05 (7 months)
Cook: tobol - Chemical tanker / 2014-04-30 - 2014-09-03 (4 months)
Cook: tobol - Chemical tanker / 2014-04-30 - 2014-09-03 (4 months)
Cook: Eirini - OBO / 2013-09-20 - 2014-03-29 (6 months)
Cook: Ocean star - Bulk Carrier / 2012-06-12 - 2012-12-29 (7 months)
Electrician: Aleksandria - Other vessels / 2013-06-28 - 2014-07-02 (1 year)
3rd Officer: Alexander B - Container Ship / 2013-11-11 - 2014-06-27 (8 months)
Mess Boy: mineral tianjin - Bulk Carrier / 2013-10-14 - 2014-05-14 (7 months)
Chief Officer: IONIAN SEA - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-21 - 2013-12-25 (7 months)
Motorman: SALACGRIVA - Chemical tanker / 2013-05-07 - 2013-10-12 (5 months)
Master: WAPPEN VON FRANKFURT - Chemical tanker / 2013-04-08 - 2013-08-24 (5 months)
Master: TOUR MARGAUX - Chemical tanker / 2012-08-15 - 2012-11-20 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: ALEXANER V - General cargo / 2013-04-17 - 2013-07-04 (3 months)
Chief Officer: HORIZON SURVEYOR - ROV Support vessel / 2012-12-22 - 2013-03-22 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Fedor Uriupin - AHTS / 2012-11-17 - 2012-12-07 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Fedor Uriupin - AHTS / 2012-09-14 - 2012-10-15 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Naftogaz-68 - Offshore Supply vessel / 2012-07-16 - 2012-08-22 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Chernomorets-15 - Crane vessel / 2012-06-13 - 2012-07-15 (1 month)
2nd Officer: Christopher - Container Ship / 2012-10-13 - 2013-02-12 (4 months)
2nd Officer: SMARAGD - Container Ship / 2011-11-07 - 2012-04-02 (5 months)
2nd Officer: SMARAGD - Container Ship / 2011-02-16 - 2011-07-06 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Niledutch Kuito - Container Ship / 2010-06-03 - 2010-10-30 (5 months)
2nd Officer: MSC FINLAND - Container Ship / 2009-11-27 - 2010-02-23 (3 months)