Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Buffet Steward: Akademik Mstislav Keldysh - Research vessel / 2018-06-15 - 2018-11-14 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Sienna - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-09-14 - 2018-11-08 (2 months)
Wiper : AMINEH M - General cargo / 2018-04-19 - 2018-11-03 (6 months)
Cook: ikryaninskiy - Research vessel / 2017-12-25 - 2018-10-20 (10 months)
Cook: nefterudovoz 47-m - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-08-12 - 2017-11-27 (3 months)
Cook: baltiyskaya - Other vessels / 2017-06-07 - 2017-07-21 (1 month)
Cook: volgoneft 109 - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-05-17 - 2017-06-08 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Mein Schiff 5 - Cruise Liner / 2018-06-08 - 2018-09-09 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Mein Schif 2 - Cruise Liner / 2017-12-14 - 2018-03-13 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: "Bunkerovshik-8" - Other vessels / 2018-06-02 - 2018-08-30 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: TSV "DRUZHBA" - Training Ship / 2017-07-24 - 2017-08-20 (1 month)
Motorman: Saipem 10000 Drill Ship DP3 - Drilling platform / 2016-06-22 - 2018-08-25 (2 years)
Mechanic: Crane/ Pipe lay barge DLB S-355 - Cable laying vessel / 2015-05-05 - 2015-10-10 (5 months)
Motorman: Castoro 7 Semi-submersible pipe lay barge - Pipe laying vessel / 2012-05-20 - 2015-01-07 (2 years)
2nd Engineer: Andre Mishel-1 - General cargo / 2018-02-25 - 2018-07-20 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Sormovskiy 121 - General cargo / 2017-02-06 - 2018-01-21 (11 months)
2nd Engineer: Sormovskiy 121 - General cargo / 2016-01-30 - 2017-02-12 (1 year)
Cook: Carme - General cargo / 2017-12-12 - 2018-07-14 (7 months)
Cook: SHOVELER - General cargo / 2016-11-23 - 2017-06-22 (7 months)
Cook: SMEW - General cargo / 2016-04-06 - 2016-07-17 (3 months)
Cook: CINNAMON - General cargo / 2014-10-03 - 2015-06-07 (8 months)
AB / Welder: TIINA TOO - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-05-15 - 2018-06-15 (1 month)
Chief Cook: SAILING YACHT GULET NOSTALGIJA - Yacht / 2017-06-14 - 2018-05-14 (11 months)
Cook: FORWARD - General cargo / 2017-09-15 - 2018-03-17 (6 months)
Cook: FUTURA CARRIER - General cargo / 2015-09-09 - 2016-03-15 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: M.V.SSL KOCHI - Container Ship / 2017-08-10 - 2018-03-07 (7 months)
Electrician: Gelico - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-02 - 2018-02-18 (5 months)
Electrician: LMZ PLUTO - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-15 - 2017-04-25 (6 months)
Electrician: Magnum Energy - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-29 - 2016-05-05 (8 months)
Electrician: Marina-F - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-23 - 2015-06-01 (1 year)
Electrician: Magnum Force - Bulk Carrier / 2012-12-15 - 2013-09-05 (9 months)
Assistant Cook: St.Andrew - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-15 - 2018-02-13 (6 months)
Cook: m/v "Whisper, General CARGO, Zanzibar" - General cargo / 2017-10-21 - 2018-01-21 (3 months)
OS: MT TARA - Tug boat / 2017-07-15 - 2018-01-15 (6 months)
Motorman: Rubus - General cargo / 2017-08-02 - 2018-01-09 (5 months)
Motorman: Brigadir - Tug boat / 2017-03-20 - 2017-05-20 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Enerdgy Chellenger - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-06-25 - 2017-12-23 (6 months)
2nd Electrical Engineer: Bedford Castle - General cargo / 2017-03-17 - 2017-12-19 (9 months)