Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
4th Engineer: Akademik Boris Petrov - Other vessels / 2021-09-03 - 2022-02-15 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Bari - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-09-01 - 2021-04-27 (8 months)
Fitter / Welder: Adler - RO-RO / 2019-10-26 - 2020-03-04 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Sea Discovery - General cargo / 2017-09-29 - 2019-01-29 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Rumailah - Jack-up Platform / 2021-11-25 - 2022-01-19 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Al safliya - Jack-up Platform / 2021-09-09 - 2021-10-28 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Al safliya - Jack-up Platform / 2021-04-21 - 2021-06-09 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Al Safliya - Jack-up Platform / 2021-01-18 - 2021-03-14 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Al Safliya - Jack-up Platform / 2020-08-07 - 2020-11-20 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: M/v Everwin 15 - General cargo / 2020-12-31 - 2022-01-13 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: T.s. Meenakshi - General cargo / 2021-06-01 - 2021-12-22 (7 months)
4th Engineer: ANNE - General cargo / 2021-06-21 - 2021-12-21 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Lisa - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-06-07 - 2020-11-13 (5 months)
2nd Officer: M/V Aurora - Dry Cargo / 2021-08-22 - 2021-12-20 (4 months)
2nd Officer: M/V Alice Star - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-05 - 2021-05-15 (8 months)
2nd Officer: M/V Konak - Dry Cargo / 2019-08-17 - 2020-07-12 (11 months)
2nd Officer: M/V Konak - Dry Cargo / 2018-12-02 - 2019-06-30 (7 months)
2nd Officer: M/V Aigaion - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-30 - 2018-08-03 (6 months)
2nd Officer: MV ISKANDER - General cargo / 2021-07-24 - 2021-12-20 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: SAROST 5 - AHTS / 2020-06-22 - 2020-08-05 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: MV ISKANDER - General cargo / 2019-09-27 - 2019-12-26 (3 months)
OS: Saratov - NAVY / 2019-12-18 - 2021-12-18 (2 years)
Chief Engineer: Ocean Spirit - Bulk Carrier / 2020-04-15 - 2021-12-15 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: Seaspan Greatness - Container Ship / 2018-01-10 - 2019-06-10 (1 year)
Chief Officer: MSC Alexandra - Container Ship / 2015-07-01 - 2016-03-01 (8 months)
Cook: Atlantic Hermes - Fishing vessel / 2021-06-02 - 2021-12-15 (6 months)
3rd Officer: MV BF TIGER - Container Ship / 2021-06-06 - 2021-12-15 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MV NEW GLORY - Container Ship / 2019-10-23 - 2020-04-11 (6 months)
2nd Cook: Eagle bintulu - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-07-23 - 2021-12-12 (5 months)
Chief Officer: STI Hammersmith - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-06 - 2021-12-09 (5 months)
2nd Officer: STI Hammersmith - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-15 - 2021-02-15 (4 months)
Galley Cleaner: Majestic Princess - Cruise Liner / 2021-06-22 - 2021-12-04 (5 months)
Galley Cleaner: Grand Princess - Cruise Liner / 2019-11-17 - 2020-03-16 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Cabo San Antonio - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-16 - 2021-11-25 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Celsius manila - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-23 - 2020-11-25 (5 months)
Messman: START - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-25 - 2021-11-25 (0 days)
AB / Crane Operator: Vladivostok 2000 - Fishing vessel / 2021-03-17 - 2021-11-19 (8 months)
AB / Motorman: Albatross 5 - AHTS / 2021-06-29 - 2021-11-19 (5 months)
Motorman: Alessandra M - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-08 - 2021-11-08 (0 days)
Deck Cadet: Reni - General cargo / 2021-07-11 - 2021-11-04 (4 months)