Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Fitter / Welder: Mein schiff - Cruise Liner / 2017-12-11 - 2022-06-30 (4 years)
ETO: SL Labuan - DSV (Diving Support) / 2022-04-11 - 2022-06-14 (2 months)
ETO: SL Labuan - DSV (Diving Support) / 2021-12-02 - 2022-02-07 (2 months)
ETO: SL Labuan - DSV (Diving Support) / 2021-06-26 - 2021-09-15 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: msc Apolline - Container Ship / 2022-01-03 - 2022-06-12 (5 months)
OS: Mygan - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-14 - 2022-06-11 (11 months)
AB Seaman: Radomir - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-02 - 2021-05-10 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Radomir - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-03 - 2020-05-19 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Agile - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-15 - 2019-09-07 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Arnika - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-23 - 2019-03-11 (3 months)
3rd Officer: MV RT LEO - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-15 - 2022-06-08 (6 months)
3rd Officer: MV MARA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-16 - 2021-12-09 (6 months)
OS: Commodore Goodwil - RO-RO / 2021-12-08 - 2022-06-08 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Kaunas - RO-RO / 2021-02-03 - 2021-04-07 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Kaunas - RO-RO / 2020-10-03 - 2021-02-02 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Hadgibey - Passenger vessel / 2020-05-08 - 2020-08-18 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: “Hadgibey” Odessa, Ukraine - Passenger vessel / 2019-06-03 - 2019-08-26 (3 months)
Cook: Princessa Anastasia - Cruise Liner / 2022-04-28 - 2022-05-31 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Gold Dust - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-02 - 2022-05-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: BBC Missouri - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-06-16 - 2021-10-10 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Johanna C - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-11-25 - 2021-03-23 (4 months)
2nd Officer: MSC BILBAO - Container Ship / 2021-12-06 - 2022-05-15 (5 months)
2nd Officer: MELINA - Container Ship / 2021-02-17 - 2021-07-19 (5 months)
2nd Officer: MELINA - Container Ship / 2020-07-07 - 2020-09-15 (2 months)
3rd Officer: MELINA - Container Ship / 2020-02-29 - 2020-07-06 (4 months)
3rd Officer: IAN H - Container Ship / 2019-06-20 - 2019-10-29 (4 months)
Oiler: Rawabi 23 - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-01-28 - 2022-05-13 (3 months)
Oiler: Am Avid - Sailing Vessel / 2020-09-14 - 2021-09-28 (1 year)
Oiler: Dolphin 89 - General cargo / 2019-03-21 - 2019-10-03 (6 months)
Trainee Wiper: Tara - Tug boat / 2018-02-10 - 2018-08-25 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v - Porada - General cargo / 2021-07-18 - 2022-05-06 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: Сфинкс - Tug boat / 2022-02-21 - 2022-04-27 (2 months)
4th Engineer: MT. TOTAL ENERGY - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-16 - 2022-04-27 (1 year)
Chief Engineer: Vermont trader - Container Ship / 2021-07-18 - 2022-04-18 (9 months)
Chief Engineer: Colette - Container Ship / 2020-12-10 - 2021-04-12 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Moonchild - Container Ship / 2020-06-24 - 2020-09-15 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: King Crimson - Container Ship / 2019-10-07 - 2020-02-07 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: King Crimson - Container Ship / 2019-01-31 - 2019-05-31 (4 months)
OS: Rodion Oslyabya - Dry Cargo / 2021-10-19 - 2022-04-10 (6 months)
OS: "Captain Markin" - Tug boat / 2013-09-01 - 2013-12-31 (4 months)
El. Engineer: Elandra Corallo - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-18 - 2022-04-06 (7 months)
El. Engineer: Elandra Corallo - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-12-31 - 2021-05-18 (5 months)
El. Engineer: Ainazi - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-10 - 2020-09-13 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Danae R - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-22 - 2022-04-05 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Good Luck - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-17 - 2021-01-29 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: KATERINA ll - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-09 - 2022-03-24 (1 year)
2nd Engineer: M/T “LERRIX” - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-11-23 - 2022-03-24 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: ISLAND TRADER - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-10 - 2021-01-21 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: ISLAND TRADER - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-06-30 - 2019-12-04 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: ISLAND TRADER - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-05-15 - 2018-12-22 (7 months)
2nd Engineer: ISLAND TRADER - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-07-19 - 2018-02-15 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Avra Miteras - Container Ship / 2021-12-20 - 2022-02-23 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Belfast - General cargo / 2020-07-27 - 2021-02-20 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Tiyam - General cargo / 2019-08-18 - 2020-03-03 (6 months)
2nd Officer: MSC ISHYKA - Container Ship / 2017-05-04 - 2017-11-26 (7 months)
2nd Officer: MSC NORA - Container Ship / 2015-09-21 - 2016-03-12 (6 months)