Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Irbis - Tug boat / 2021-06-26 - 2021-10-17 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Neftegaz-55 - Tug boat / 2020-02-02 - 2020-03-02 (1 month)
AB Seaman: typhoon - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-03-26 - 2021-10-12 (7 months)
Chief Cook: Saronic Spire - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-28 - 2021-10-12 (2 months)
Chief Cook: Saronic Spire - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-13 - 2020-12-23 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Pilot-3 - Pilot boat / 2021-04-09 - 2021-10-08 (6 months)
Cook Assistant: kaunas - RO-RO / 2021-04-04 - 2021-10-07 (6 months)
Gas Engineer: Tilos - LPG / LNG / 2021-06-01 - 2021-10-06 (4 months)
Gas Engineer: Symi - LPG / LNG / 2020-10-06 - 2021-01-06 (3 months)
Gas Engineer: Symi - LPG / LNG / 2020-01-02 - 2020-05-18 (5 months)
Gas Engineer: Anafi - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-20 - 2019-08-08 (5 months)
Gas Engineer: Anafi - LPG / LNG / 2018-06-30 - 2018-11-26 (5 months)
Trainee OS: MT BON ATLANICO - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-12 - 2021-09-21 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: ARNICA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-05-26 - 2021-09-18 (4 months)
Electric Cadet: M/b Naše more - Research vessel / 2017-09-25 - 2021-09-10 (3 years)
Junior officer: STI Battersea - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-30 - 2021-09-09 (2 months)
AB Seaman: STI Jardins - Chemical tanker / 2020-09-24 - 2021-04-01 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Kalamas - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-15 - 2020-03-03 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Nestos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-06-26 - 2018-12-30 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Asopos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-06-02 - 2017-11-29 (6 months)
OS: AVRA MITERAS - Container Ship / 2021-02-24 - 2021-09-07 (6 months)
OS: Sborschik-387 - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-15 - 2019-08-31 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Lake Kivu - Other vessels / 2021-04-17 - 2021-09-06 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Lake Taupo - Other vessels / 2020-05-08 - 2021-02-02 (9 months)
3rd Officer: Lake Kivu - Other vessels / 2019-05-02 - 2019-12-12 (7 months)
Motorman: Комунна - Other vessels / 2021-07-05 - 2021-09-05 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Moguchiy - Tug boat / 2021-06-16 - 2021-08-31 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Ilyichevsk Shipyard - Other vessels / 2021-06-29 - 2021-08-31 (2 months)
OS: Crucestar - Passenger vessel / 2021-04-29 - 2021-08-29 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V PROPUS - General cargo / 2021-04-15 - 2021-08-28 (4 months)
OS: MV.Minnath - General cargo / 2020-12-05 - 2021-08-21 (9 months)
OS: MV.Niumath - General cargo / 2019-09-13 - 2020-08-25 (11 months)
2nd Engineer: Epic Samos - LPG / LNG / 2021-03-31 - 2021-08-12 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Epic Cobrador - LPG / LNG / 2020-07-11 - 2020-12-13 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: M V VANIA - Container Ship / 2020-11-07 - 2021-08-08 (9 months)