Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Istra - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-24 - 2021-08-24 (2 months)
1st Officer: Буксир класса А Эсерден - NAVY / 2019-07-19 - 2021-08-13 (2 years)
Engine Cadet: MV FILIPINAS DAPITAN - Passenger vessel / 2021-02-02 - 2021-08-10 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MV FILIPINAS DAPITAN - Passenger vessel / 2019-11-26 - 2020-09-10 (9 months)
Trainee Engineer: Gefer Jabbarly - General cargo / 2021-06-30 - 2021-08-08 (1 month)
AB Seaman: M/V Melissus - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-30 - 2021-08-01 (4 months)
OS: Ekoservis - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-02 - 2021-07-27 (4 months)
AB Seaman: bumi narian mar - MRSV / 2017-09-27 - 2021-07-11 (3 years)
AB Seaman: topaz jurong - AHTS / 2016-05-30 - 2017-08-02 (1 year)
AB Seaman: topaz legend - AHTS / 2014-08-07 - 2015-06-17 (10 months)
Chief Cook: Sibur Tobol - LPG / LNG / 2021-02-25 - 2021-07-10 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: CMA CGM Tancredi - Container Ship / 2020-08-11 - 2021-07-08 (11 months)
Engineer Assistant: Astoria - Passenger vessel / 2019-11-07 - 2019-12-08 (1 month)
Engineer Assistant: CSL Tacoma - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-02 - 2019-06-06 (4 months)
Motorman: Columbus - Cruise Liner / 2018-08-11 - 2018-12-30 (5 months)
OS: Cape Baxley - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-09-04 - 2018-03-07 (6 months)
OS: SEA HEART - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-02-07 - 2021-07-06 (1 year)
Motorman: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2016-12-03 - 2021-07-05 (4 years)
Engine Cadet: Kashtan - Passenger vessel / 2021-06-21 - 2021-06-22 (1 day)
2nd Officer: Ssi dignity - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-09 - 2021-06-16 (9 months)
2nd Officer: İdc pearl - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-18 - 2020-05-15 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Halil sahin - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-27 - 2019-07-02 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Halil sahin - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-10 - 2018-11-15 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Idc diamond - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-30 - 2018-03-22 (4 months)
Stewardess: Commodore Clipper - RO-RO / 2021-03-03 - 2021-06-06 (3 months)
Stewardess: Commodore Clipper - RO-RO / 2019-12-12 - 2020-09-09 (9 months)
Stewardess: Commodore Clipper - RO-RO / 2018-06-06 - 2018-09-09 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: BBC Texas - General cargo / 2021-02-08 - 2021-06-06 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: SB-5 - NAVY / 2021-02-01 - 2021-05-28 (4 months)
Boatswain: Eagle Toledo - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-01-14 - 2021-05-28 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: ILYA MUROMETS - Icebreaker / 2017-03-01 - 2021-05-20 (4 years)
Chief Engineer: МБ 38 - Survey vessel / 2013-03-01 - 2017-02-28 (3 years)
Motorman: Dokovec - Passenger vessel / 2021-03-13 - 2021-05-13 (2 months)
Electrician: COMANCHE - General cargo / 2020-08-06 - 2021-05-10 (9 months)
Electrician: CHEYENNE - General cargo / 2019-05-25 - 2019-12-19 (7 months)
Electrician: NAVAHO - General cargo / 2018-10-18 - 2019-03-28 (5 months)