Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: ALORA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-25 - 2021-11-03 (9 months)
OS: ARVIN - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-27 - 2020-07-13 (7 months)
OS: ARTIN - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-03 - 2019-10-20 (8 months)
OS: ALVA N - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-20 - 2018-10-11 (8 months)
AB / Motorman: Kamskiy-601 - Dredger / 2021-07-20 - 2021-11-01 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: M/v Mehmet Bey - General cargo / 2021-04-09 - 2021-10-24 (6 months)
Trainee Engineer: Harbour Pioneer - Chemical tanker / 2021-05-17 - 2021-10-15 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Else Marie Theresa - Chemical tanker / 2020-12-08 - 2021-02-08 (2 months)
Motorman: karina theresa - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-11 - 2020-10-25 (4 months)
Motorman: skyFrost - Reefer / 2019-11-03 - 2020-03-16 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Great Eastern - Chemical tanker / 2018-12-02 - 2019-04-10 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V Soldoy - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-27 - 2021-10-09 (5 months)
Gas Engineer: Aleksey Slobodchikov - Fishing vessel / 2020-09-20 - 2021-10-07 (1 year)
3rd Officer: Aral - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-11 - 2021-09-30 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Salina Bay - Bunkering Vessel / 2019-09-10 - 2020-01-11 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Salina Bay - Bunkering Vessel / 2019-03-03 - 2019-07-07 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Kapitan Barmin - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-30 - 2021-09-28 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Kapitan Barmin - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-12 - 2021-07-04 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: ABAI - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-11-13 - 2021-04-15 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: BAVLY - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-15 - 2020-10-20 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: ABAI - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-18 - 2020-06-11 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Delsa - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-02-25 - 2021-09-16 (7 months)
Cook Assistant: Ioanna D - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-29 - 2021-09-15 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v Fehn Cape - General cargo / 2021-04-01 - 2021-09-15 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V CADET - Training Ship / 2021-03-10 - 2021-09-10 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Sea Queen - General cargo / 2020-08-17 - 2021-09-09 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: STS Nadezhda - Sailing Vessel / 2021-06-29 - 2021-09-05 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Быстрая - Other vessels / 2017-07-02 - 2021-09-02 (4 years)
Deck Cadet: BULAT - Tug boat / 2021-06-16 - 2021-08-31 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Bulat - Tug boat / 2021-06-16 - 2021-08-31 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Капитан Незавитин - Tug boat / 2021-06-16 - 2021-08-30 (2 months)
Chief Officer: SCF SUEK - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-15 - 2021-08-25 (3 months)
2nd Officer: NORDSKY - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-02-10 - 2019-04-30 (3 months)
Oiler: Sacs - Construction vessel / 2021-08-25 - 2021-08-25 (0 days)