Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Piret - Ferry / 2022-06-16 - 2022-09-16 (3 months)
Cook: Oban - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-14 - 2022-09-15 (1 month)
Wiper: Spirit of Chennai - Container Ship / 2022-01-24 - 2022-09-05 (7 months)
Wiper: Spirit of Chennai - Container Ship / 2021-03-07 - 2021-09-22 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: CADET - Training Ship / 2022-03-07 - 2022-09-04 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: т/x "Дельфин" - Other vessels / 2022-05-23 - 2022-09-04 (3 months)
Stewardess: Topaz Driller - Jack-up Platform / 2022-07-21 - 2022-08-31 (1 month)
Stewardess: Kattegat - Ferry / 2019-07-20 - 2019-09-03 (1 month)
Stewardess: Santa Ana - Drilling vessel / 2018-12-10 - 2019-02-17 (2 months)
Stewardess: Tanger Express - Ferry / 2018-06-01 - 2018-09-01 (3 months)
Stewardess: E&E - Yacht / 2015-05-15 - 2015-07-15 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: INS - Research vessel / 2021-01-01 - 2022-08-22 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Atlas Double Crane vessel - Crane vessel / 2022-07-06 - 2022-08-19 (1 month)
AB / Crane Operator: Atlas Double Crane vessel - Crane vessel / 2022-02-15 - 2022-06-22 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: VF TANKER-14 - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-06-03 - 2022-08-13 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: STS "MIR" - Training Ship / 2022-06-10 - 2022-08-10 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Pola-Dudinka - General cargo / 2022-03-03 - 2022-08-08 (5 months)
Boatswain: Sestroretsk - General cargo / 2020-03-06 - 2020-08-21 (5 months)
Oiler: MSC ESHA - Container Ship / 2021-12-02 - 2022-08-01 (8 months)
Oiler: MSC GIOVANNA - Container Ship / 2021-03-05 - 2021-11-09 (8 months)
Oiler: MSC KANOKO - Container Ship / 2019-11-07 - 2020-09-14 (10 months)
Oiler: MSC EDIT - Container Ship / 2019-01-23 - 2019-07-29 (6 months)
Oiler: MSC BRIDGE - Container Ship / 2018-05-21 - 2018-11-25 (6 months)
OS: Rusha - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-03-09 - 2022-07-20 (4 months)
OS: FWN PAULA - General cargo / 2021-11-24 - 2022-07-18 (8 months)
OS: Basel S3 - General cargo / 2020-10-17 - 2021-08-16 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: M/T MED PACIFIC - Chemical tanker / 2021-11-09 - 2022-07-18 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Galileusz - RO-RO / 2021-12-13 - 2022-07-13 (7 months)
OS: PEGAS - Training Ship / 2022-04-24 - 2022-06-29 (2 months)
Oiler: Gaz Concord - LPG / LNG / 2021-09-23 - 2022-06-22 (9 months)
Oiler: Luke - LPG / LNG / 2021-01-29 - 2021-06-21 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: MSc JEONGMIN - Container Ship / 2021-11-20 - 2022-06-21 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: MSC Brianna - Container Ship / 2021-01-17 - 2021-08-17 (7 months)
4th Engineer: MSC Gianna - Container Ship / 2020-02-02 - 2020-10-20 (9 months)
4th Engineer: MSC Gianna - Container Ship / 2019-01-02 - 2019-08-29 (8 months)
AB / Motorman: MSC Clea - Container Ship / 2017-05-02 - 2018-01-27 (9 months)
Motorman: MV MAHA ROOS - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-08 - 2022-06-19 (10 months)
Wiper: MV SAFESEA ANYA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-14 - 2021-03-13 (7 months)
Oiler: MV TUNA 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-16 - 2019-02-01 (10 months)
Wiper: MV SHAHEEN 1 - General cargo / 2016-08-24 - 2017-08-08 (11 months)