Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Master: African Vision - MRSV / 2021-08-24 - 2023-07-21 (1 year)
Master: Picasso - DSV (Diving Support) / 2019-06-03 - 2020-11-07 (1 year)
Master: Vinnice - DSV (Diving Support) / 2017-07-11 - 2018-11-16 (1 year)
Master: Surf Supporter - MRSV / 2015-06-18 - 2016-11-15 (1 year)
Wiper: STI Battersea - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-02-03 - 2023-07-20 (6 months)
Wiper: STI Pimlico - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-04-23 - 2022-10-24 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: STI Pimlico - Chemical tanker / 2021-08-11 - 2022-02-14 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: - - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-07-13 - 2023-07-20 (7 days)
Deck Cadet: "GRANIT" - Tug boat / 2023-06-08 - 2023-07-19 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: HANOVER SQUARE - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-01-02 - 2023-07-18 (7 months)
Wiper: Volgo-Don 5005 - Dry Cargo / 2023-04-12 - 2023-07-10 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: LJA Maritime School ''Pontons'' - Repair Vessel / 2023-07-10 - 2023-07-10 (0 days)
Engine Cadet: BBC Rheiderland - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-02-02 - 2023-07-09 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Amoenitas - Heavy lift vessel / 2023-01-11 - 2023-07-05 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Amoenitas - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-04-08 - 2021-11-25 (8 months)
4th Engineer: Angus - Container Ship / 2020-08-26 - 2021-01-17 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Elandra Osprey - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-01-11 - 2023-07-03 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Elandra Bay - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-01-23 - 2022-08-11 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Elandra Bay - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-17 - 2021-10-07 (6 months)
3rd Officer: E Mei San - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-12-30 - 2020-09-23 (9 months)
3rd Officer: Tai Hung San - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-03-26 - 2019-08-02 (4 months)
2nd Officer: HERMANN SCHEPERS - Container Ship / 2022-12-04 - 2023-06-27 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Contship Lex - Container Ship / 2021-12-12 - 2022-08-04 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: STS "MIR" - Sailing Vessel / 2023-04-20 - 2023-06-26 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: T.S bagavathy training center - Other vessels / 2022-06-09 - 2023-06-22 (1 year)
2nd Officer: mt blue stars - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-07-08 - 2023-06-21 (11 months)
Master: mt golden sea - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-30 - 2022-07-07 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: mv andhika kanishka - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-08 - 2021-08-12 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: mt sun live - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-10 - 2021-01-12 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Navigator XXI - Research vessel / 2023-06-05 - 2023-06-18 (13 days)
OS: M/T TURBA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-12-05 - 2023-06-15 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Staryy Arbat - Fishing vessel / 2020-07-08 - 2020-10-31 (4 months)
OS: Szare Szeregi - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-26 - 2023-06-12 (5 months)
OS: Kociewie - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-24 - 2022-11-07 (4 months)
OS: Hanover Square - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-12 - 2022-04-18 (7 months)
OS: Encore - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-12 - 2021-07-05 (1 month)
OS: Legacy - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-31 - 2021-05-12 (4 months)
Messman: Cape Henry - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-04 - 2023-06-10 (11 months)
Oiler: Fortune Supreme - General cargo / 2017-11-28 - 2018-06-25 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Fortune Legacy - General cargo / 2016-08-23 - 2017-08-30 (1 year)
2nd Engineer: Tiara - General cargo / 2022-09-26 - 2023-05-30 (8 months)
2nd Engineer: Ramus - General cargo / 2021-11-25 - 2022-06-14 (7 months)
2nd Engineer: Alfa Orionis - General cargo / 2021-07-14 - 2021-09-06 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Odessa 1 - General cargo / 2018-08-08 - 2019-04-21 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Sormovskiy 121 - General cargo / 2017-09-15 - 2018-04-26 (7 months)
AB Seaman: blue marlin - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-08-19 - 2023-05-25 (9 months)
OS: seamec gallant - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-08 - 2021-05-23 (1 year)
OS: an trung 168 - General cargo / 2017-10-03 - 2018-06-30 (9 months)
OS: m.v seafortune - General cargo / 2012-01-20 - 2013-03-06 (1 year)